County of Oneida, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Oneida, New York
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Perry Fine, John Doe, Scott Fishman, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company Inc., #1-10 John Does, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., John Doe Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc., Lynn Webster, Actavis plc, Watson Pharma, Inc., Anda, Inc., Associated Pharmacies, Inc., Indivior, Inc., Mylan Institutional, Inc., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Stuart D. Baker, CVS Albany, LLC, Walgreen Co., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Mortimer D. A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Jonathan D. Sackler, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Theresa Sackler, David A. Sackler, Endo Generics Holding, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Rhodes Technology, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technology, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Beverly Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Sandoz, Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., CVS Indiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Omnicare of New York, LLC, Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Omnicare, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center
Case Number: 1:2018op45338
Filed: April 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 137 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. filed by Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 30, 2019 Filing 136 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co. filed by Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 30, 2019 Filing 135 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 22, 2019 Filing 134 Attorney Appearance by Sara E. Silva filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Silva, Sara)
July 17, 2019 Filing 133 Attorney Appearance by Safa W. Osmani filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Osmani, Safa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 132 Attorney Appearance by Maria R. Durant filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Durant, Maria)
June 23, 2019 Filing 131 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Indivior, Inc. on 6/10/2019, filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 130 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 129 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 128 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 127 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Omnicare, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 126 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Omnicare of New York, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 125 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 124 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 123 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 122 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 121 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Sandoz, Inc. waiver sent on 4/20/2019, answer due 6/19/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 120 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 119 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 118 Stipulated Service Acknowledged by Sackler Defendants & Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family on 5/31/19 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 117 Stipulated Service Acknowledged by Defendant Stuart D. Baker on 5/23/19 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 116 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Rite Aid of New York, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 115 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 114 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 113 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Allergan USA, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 112 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 111 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Mylan Institutional, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 110 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 109 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Theresa Sackler waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 108 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Mortimer D. A. Sackler waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 107 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Kathe A. Sackler waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 106 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Ilene Sackler Lefcourt waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 105 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Specgx, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 104 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 103 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 102 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 101 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 100 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 99 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Rhodes Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 98 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Rhodes Technology waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 20, 2019 Filing 97 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Associated Pharmacies, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 9, 2019 Filing 96 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 9, 2019 Filing 95 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Walgreen Co. waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 28, 2019 Filing 94 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 28, 2019 Filing 93 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Anda, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 28, 2019 Filing 92 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 28, 2019 Filing 91 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Cardinal Health 110, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 28, 2019 Filing 90 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 28, 2019 Filing 89 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. CVS RX Services, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 28, 2019 Filing 88 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 28, 2019 Filing 87 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. CVS Indiana, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 28, 2019 Filing 86 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. CVS Albany, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 17, 2019 Filing 85 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 17, 2019 Filing 84 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 17, 2019 Filing 83 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 16, 2019 Filing 82 Attorney Appearance by Zachary M. Mattison filed by on behalf of KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Mattison, Zachary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 81 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 25, 2019 Filing 80 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon amended defendants. (P,R)
March 13, 2019 Filing 79 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Associated Pharmacies, Inc., CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Indivior, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, Omnicare of New York, LLC, Omnicare, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (P,R)
March 12, 2019 Filing 78 Amended complaint against Richard S. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, David A. Sackler, Rhodes Technology, Rhodes Technology, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Stuart D. Baker, Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Indivior, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Institutional, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Sandoz, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Anda, Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Albany, LLC, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS RX Services, Inc., Omnicare, Inc., Omnicare of New York, LLC, Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, Associated Pharmacies, Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer, D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Rhodes Technology; Rhodes Technology, Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.; Stuart D. Baker; Endo Generics Holding, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; SpecGX, LLC; Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC; Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Allergan USA, Inc.; Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.; Indivior, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Institutional, Inc.; Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC; Sandoz, Inc.; Cardinal Health 110, LLC; McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.; McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC; McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation; H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company; Anda, Inc.; Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Rite Aid of New York, Inc.; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center; Walgreen Co.; Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.; Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.; Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.; KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; CVS Albany, LLC; CVS Indiana, LLC; CVS Rx Services, Inc.; Omnicare, Inc.; Omnicare Of New York, LLC; Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC; Associated Pharmacies, Inc.. Filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Attachments: #1 Summons Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #2 Summons Allergan USA, Inc., #3 Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals Of New York, LLC, #4 Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #5 Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, #6 Summons Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #7 Summons Anda, Inc., #8 Summons Associated Pharmacies, Inc., #9 Summons Beverly Sackler, Trustee - Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, #10 Summons Beverly Sackler, #11 Summons Cardinal Health 110, LLC, #12 Summons CVS Albany, LLC, #13 Summons CVS Indiana, LLC, #14 Summons CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #15 Summons CVS RX Services, Inc., #16 Summons David A. Sackler, #17 Summons Endo Generics Holding, Inc., #18 Summons H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, #19 Summons Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., #20 Summons Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, #21 Summons Indivior, Inc., #22 Summons Jonathan D. Sackler, Trustee - Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, #23 Summons Jonathan D. Sackler, #24 Summons Kathe A. Sackler, #25 Summons KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., #26 Summons Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #27 Summons Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., #28 Summons Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, #29 Summons McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., #30 Summons McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, #31 Summons McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, #32 Summons Mortimer D. A. Sackler, #33 Summons Mylan Institutional, Inc., #34 Summons Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #35 Summons Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, #36 Summons Omnicare of New York, LLC, #37 Summons Omnicare, Inc., #38 Summons Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., #39 Summons Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., #40 Summons Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #41 Summons Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., #42 Summons Rhodes Technology, Inc., #43 Summons Rhodes Technology, #44 Summons Richard S. Sackler, Trustee - Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, #45 Summons Richard S. Sacker, #46 Summons Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. dba Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, #47 Summons Rite Aid of New York, Inc., #48 Summons Sandoz, Inc., #49 Summons SpecGX, LLC, #50 Summons Stuart D. Baker, #51 Summons The P.F. Laboratories Inc., #52 Summons Theresa Sackler, #53 Summons Walgreen Co., #54 Summons Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., #55 Summons Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #56 Summons Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., #57 Summons West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.) (Pearlman, Eva)
February 11, 2019 Filing 77 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 1/21/2019, answer due 3/22/2019 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
July 18, 2018 Filing 76 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 7/16/2018, answer due 9/14/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
July 18, 2018 Filing 75 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Purdue Frederick Company Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2018, answer due 9/14/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
July 18, 2018 Filing 74 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2018, answer due 9/14/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 26, 2018 Filing 73 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 26, 2018 Filing 72 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 25, 2018 Filing 71 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 5/23/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 22, 2018 Filing 70 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 22, 2018 Filing 69 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 22, 2018 Filing 68 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 22, 2018 Filing 67 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 19, 2018 Filing 66 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2018, answer due 8/17/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 19, 2018 Filing 65 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2018, answer due 8/17/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 19, 2018 Filing 64 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2018, answer due 8/17/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 63 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc nka Actavis Inc on 05/10/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 62 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Lynn Webster waiver sent on 5/20/2018, answer due 7/19/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 61 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 60 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 59 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Russell Portenoy waiver sent on 4/4/2018, answer due 6/4/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 58 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 57 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Insys Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 56 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Scott Fishman waiver sent on 5/20/2018, answer due 7/19/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 55 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Perry Fine waiver sent on 5/20/2018, answer due 7/19/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 54 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 53 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 5, 2018 Filing 52 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Oneida, New York. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 14, 2018 Filing 51 Return of Service by Personal Service executed upon Lynn Webster on 04/30/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 11, 2018 Filing 50 Return of Service by registered mail return receipt requested executed upon Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 04/18/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Pearlman, Eva)
May 11, 2018 Filing 49 Return of Service by re executed upon Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 04/18/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Pearlman, Eva)
May 11, 2018 Filing 48 Return of Service by registered mail return receipt requested executed upon Purdue Pharma L.P. on 04/18/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Pearlman, Eva)
May 11, 2018 Filing 47 Return of Service by registered mail return receipt requested executed upon Mallinckrodt LLC on 04/30/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Pearlman, Eva)
May 11, 2018 Filing 46 Return of Service by registered mail return receipt requested executed upon INSYS Therapeutics Inc on 04/30/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Pearlman, Eva)
May 11, 2018 Filing 45 Return of Service by registered mail return receipt requested executed upon Endo Health Solutions, Inc. on 04/30/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Pearlman, Eva)
May 11, 2018 Filing 44 Return of Service by registered mail return receipt requested executed upon Allergan PLC fka Actavis PLC on 04/18/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Pearlman, Eva)
May 7, 2018 Filing 43 Return of Service by Waiver of Service of Summons executed upon Mallinckrodt, PLC on 05/01/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 30, 2018 Filing 42 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 04/13/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 19, 2018 Filing 41 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 03/27/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #13 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 19, 2018 Filing 40 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Actavis Inc. on 03/26/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #23 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 39 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Watson Laboratories Inc. on 03/22/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #11 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 38 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon The Purdue Frederick Company Inc on 03/22/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #10 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 37 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc on 03/26/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #20 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 36 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Purdue Pharma L.P. on 03/22/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #9 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 35 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Purdue Pharma Inc on 03/26/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #19 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 34 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon McKesson Corporation on 03/23/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #8 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 33 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Mallinckrodt LLC on 03/27/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #15 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 32 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #14 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 31 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Insys Therapeutics Inc on 03/23/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #7 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 30 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc on 03/23/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 29 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Endo Health Solutions, Inc. on 03/23/2018 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #6 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 28 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Cephalon Inc. on 03/23/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #5 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 27 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Cardinal Health Inc. on 03/26/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #18 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 26 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation on 03/27/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #12 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 25 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Allergan PLC fka Actavis PLC on 03/26/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #17 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 24 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Actavis Pharma Inc fka Watson Pharma Inc on 03/22/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York Related document(s) #4 . (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2018 Filing 23 Return of Service by NYS Secretary of State executed upon Actavis Inc. on 03/22/18 filed on behalf of County of Oneida, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
April 4, 2018 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Northern. Case number 6:18-cv-00314. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 4, 2018 Filing 21 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #18. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Dan A. Polster, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Teva Pharmacueticals USA Inc on 03/26/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Purdue Pharma Inc. on 03/26/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Cardinal Health Inc. on 03/26/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Allergan PLC fka Actavis PLC on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutical Inc nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Mallinckrodt LLC on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation on 03/27/18, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
April 2, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Allergan PLC answer due 4/16/2018; AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation answer due 4/17/2018; Cardinal Health, Inc. answer due 4/16/2018; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. answer due 4/17/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 4/17/2018; Mallinckrodt, LLC answer due 4/17/2018; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 4/17/2018; Purdue Pharma, Inc. answer due 4/16/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 4/16/2018. (see) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Watson Laboratories, Inc. on 03/22/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. on 03/22/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Purdue Pharma, L.P. on 03/22/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on McKesson Corporation on 03/23/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Insys Therapeutics, Inc. on 03/23/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Endo Health Solutions, Inc. on 03/23/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Cephalon, Inc. on 03/23/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet & Order with Case Management Plan served on Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. on 03/22/2018, filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Brindisi, Louis) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 27, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Actavis Pharma, Inc. answer due 4/12/2018; Cephalon, Inc. answer due 4/13/2018; Endo Health Solutions Inc. answer due 4/13/2018; Insys Therapeutics, Inc. answer due 4/13/2018; McKesson Corporation answer due 4/13/2018; Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. answer due 4/12/2018; Purdue Pharma, L.P. answer due 4/12/2018; Watson Laboratories, Inc. answer due 4/12/2018. (see) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 15, 2018 TEXT NOTICE Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, John Does, or John Doe Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2018 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/18/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Purdue Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #3 Summons for Cephalon, Inc., #4 Summons for Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #5 Summons for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Summons for Johnson & Johnson, #7 Summons for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #8 Summons for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., #9 Summons for Endo Health Solutions Inc., #10 Summons for Endo Pharaceuticals, Inc., #11 Summons for Mallinckrodt PLC, #12 Summons for Mallinckrodt LLC, #13 Summons for Allergan PLC, #14 Summons for Watson Pharaceuticals, Inc, #15 Summons for Watson Laboratories, Inc., #16 Summons for Actavis LLC, #17 Summons for Actavis Pharma, Inc., #18 Summons for Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #19 Summons for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #20 Summons for Cardinal Health, Inc., #21 Summons for McKesson Corporation, #22 Summons for Russell Portenoy, #23 Summons for Perry Fine, #24 Summons for Scott Fishman, #25 Summons for Lynn Webster, #26 Summons for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharaceuticals, Inc.)(see) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4320569) filed by County of Oneida, New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) [Transferred from nynd on 4/4/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Oneida, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Oneida, New York
Represented By: Eva Brindisi Pearlman
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Represented By: Louis T. Brindisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: #1-10 John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Represented By: Maria R. Durant
Represented By: Safa W. Osmani
Represented By: Sara E. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Albany, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D. A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary M. Mattison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?