Muscogee (Creek) Nation v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Muscogee (Creek) Nation
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Anda, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Couch Pharmacy on Sheridan, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pharmacy Buying Association, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Olympia Pharmacy, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., May's Drug Store, Actavis LLC, Med-Econ Drug, Inc., City Drug of Coweta, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Purdue Frederick Company, Freeland Brown Pharmacy, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Drug Warehouse, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Spoon Drugs, Inc., Pippenger Pharmacies LLC, Smith Drug Company, Rogers Drug Co., Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., GCP Pharma LLC, Economy Discount Pharmacy, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Med-X Corporation, H.D. Smith LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Economy Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, KVK-Tech, Inc., Langsam Health Services, LLC, Getman Apothecary Shoppe, Inc., Economy Pharmacy Express, Reasor's LLC, Manufacturer Defendants, SAJ Distributors, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Cityplex Pharmacy, Carefirst Pharmacy, Purdue Pharma Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City Drug Co. and M & D Star Drug, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45459
Filed: April 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 180 Attorney Appearance by Martin F. Cunniff filed on behalf of Muscogee (Creek) Nation. (P,R)
August 20, 2019 Filing 179 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses filed by Morris & Dickson Co LLC. (Spruiell, Frank)
August 16, 2019 Filing 178 First Amended Answer to #19 Amended complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC. (Benoit, Sarah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 177 First Amended Answer to #19 Amended complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Benoit, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 176 First Amended Answer to #19 Amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by KVK-Tech, Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
August 15, 2019 Filing 175 Amended Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 9, 2019 Filing 174 Notice of Filing of Corrected Answer filed by Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Answer to Muscogee (Creek) Nation's First Amended Complaint)Related document(s) #137 .(Hardin, Ashley)
August 9, 2019 Filing 173 Notice of Filing of Corrected Answer to Muscogee (Creek) Nation's First Amended Complaint filed by Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Answer to Muscogee (Creek) Nation's First Amended Complaint)Related document(s) #136 .(Hardin, Ashley)
July 26, 2019 Filing 172 Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Related document(s) #19 . (Morris, Sean)
July 26, 2019 Filing 171 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Cityplex Pharmacy. (Streza, Ralph)
July 26, 2019 Filing 170 Attorney Appearance by Ralph Streza filed by on behalf of Cityplex Pharmacy. (Streza, Ralph)
July 26, 2019 Filing 169 Answer to First Amended Complaint (Doc 731) filed by Olympia Pharmacy. (McGough, Jim)
July 26, 2019 Filing 168 Answer to the Muscogee Creek Nation's First Amended Complaint filed by Pharmacy Buying Association. Related document(s) #19 . (Fries, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Filing 167 Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allergan Finance, LLC. Related document(s) #19 . (Welch, Donna)
July 26, 2019 Filing 166 Answer to the Muscogee Creek Nation's First Amended Complaint filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. Related document(s) #19 . (Benoit, Sarah)
July 26, 2019 Filing 165 Answer to the Muscogee Creek Nation's First Amended Complaint filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC. Related document(s) #19 . (Benoit, Sarah)
July 26, 2019 Filing 164 Answer to First Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses filed by Smith Drug Company. Related document(s) #19 . (Haggerty, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 163 Attorney Appearance by John J. Haggerty filed by on behalf of Smith Drug Company. (Haggerty, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 162 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Reed, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 161 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Reed, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 160 Attorney Appearance by Kathleen L. Matsoukas filed by on behalf of H.D. Smith LLC. (Matsoukas, Kathleen)
July 26, 2019 Filing 159 Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by H.D. Smith LLC. Related document(s) #19 . (Padgett, William)
July 26, 2019 Filing 158 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand and with Affiirmative Defenses filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Nicholas, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 157 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith LLC filed by H.D. Smith LLC. (Padgett, William)
July 26, 2019 Filing 156 Attorney Appearance by William E. Padgett filed by on behalf of H.D. Smith LLC. (Padgett, William)
July 26, 2019 Filing 155 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Reasor's LLC. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 154 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Spoon Drugs, Inc.. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 153 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by City Drug Co., City Drug of Coweta, Inc.. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 152 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc.. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 151 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by M & D Star Drug, Inc.. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 150 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Med-Econ Drug, Inc.. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 149 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Carefirst Pharmacy. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 148 Answer to Complaint to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 26, 2019 Filing 147 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc.. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 146 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Freeland Brown Pharmacy. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 145 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Economy Discount Pharmacy, Economy Pharmacy Express, Economy Pharmacy, Inc.. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 144 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Delinsky, Eric)
July 26, 2019 Filing 143 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Pippenger Pharmacies LLC. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 142 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by GCP Pharma LLC. (Simcoe, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 141 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
July 26, 2019 Filing 140 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.. (Matthews, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 139 Answer to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint filed by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 138 Answer Defendant McKesson Corporation's Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by McKesson Corporation. (Hobart, Geoffrey)
July 26, 2019 Filing 137 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand to First Amended Complaint of Muscogee Creek Nation filed by Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.. (Hardin, Ashley)
July 26, 2019 Filing 136 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand to First Amended Complaint of Muscogee Creek Nation filed by Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc.. (Hardin, Ashley)
July 26, 2019 Filing 135 Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant NRF, Inc. d/b/a Couch Pharmacy to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Couch Pharmacy on Sheridan. (Papp, Edward)
July 26, 2019 Filing 134 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer of Defendant Rogers Drug Co., Inc. to the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 731) (Trial by Jury Demanded)) filed by Rogers Drug Co., Inc.. (O'Brien, Gregory)
July 18, 2019 Filing 133 Attorney Appearance by Katherine S. Davies filed on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc. (P,R)
July 12, 2019 Filing 132 Attorney Appearance by Megan Sterchi Lammert filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Lammert, Megan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 131 Attorney Appearance by Jessica B. Cozart filed on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc. (P,R)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) - On July 5, 2019, the Court granted Manufacturer Defendants' Consent Motion for extension of time until July 26, 2019 to answer Complaints in Muscogee (Creek) Nation and the Blackfeet Tribe Actions.(Doc. No. 1810 ). In order to efficiently manage the pretrial proceedings in this MDL, the Court prefers to keep the deadlines for answers from all named defendants in these two actions the same. Therefore, the Court Orders that all named defendants in Muscogee (Creek) Nation v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al., Case No. 1:18-op-45459 and The Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporations, et al., Case No. 1:18-op-45749 shall have until July 26, 2019 to answer complaints in the Muscogee (Creek) Nation and the Blackfeet Tribe actions. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/9/19. (P,R)
July 8, 2019 Filing 130 Consent Motion for extension of time until July 26, 2019 to answer Complaint filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 129 Attorney Appearance by Lisa A. Larkin filed by behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc. (P,R)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #128 Manufacturing Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time until 7/26/19 to Answer. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/8/19.(P,R)
July 3, 2019 Filing 128 Motion for extension of time until July 26, 2019 to answer Complaints in Muscogee (Creek) Nation and the Blackfeet Tribe Actions filed by Defendant Manufacturer Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rendon, Carole)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order - Defendants' answers due by 12:00 PM on 7/11/19. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/24/19. (P,R)
June 19, 2019 Filing 126 Attorney Appearance by Steven W. Simcoe filed by on behalf of Economy Pharmacy, Inc.. (Simcoe, Steven)
June 19, 2019 Filing 125 Attorney Appearance by Benjamin D. Reed filed by on behalf of Economy Pharmacy, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 124 Attorney Appearance by Sean H. McKee filed by on behalf of Economy Pharmacy, Inc.. (McKee, Sean)
June 19, 2019 Filing 123 Attorney Appearance by Matthew B. Free filed by on behalf of Economy Pharmacy, Inc.. (Free, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Opinion and Order re #109 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/13/2019. (W,CM)
June 12, 2019 Filing 121 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel on behalf of Economy Pharmacy, Inc. filed by Economy Discount Pharmacy. (McDonald, C.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 120 First Attorney Appearance by Jim C. McGough filed by on behalf of Olympia Pharmacy. (McGough, Jim)
May 23, 2019 Filing 119 Attorney Appearance by Jim McGough filed on behalf of Olympia Pharmacy. (P,R)
May 21, 2019 Filing 118 Notice by David C. Youll to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant Olympia Pharmacy. (Youll, David) Modified on 5/22/2019 (P,R).
May 15, 2019 Filing 117 Response to Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz filed by Muscogee (Creek) Nation. (Ulrich, Tyler)
May 7, 2019 Filing 116 Attorney Appearance by Tyler Ulrich filed by on behalf of Muscogee (Creek) Nation. (Ulrich, Tyler)
April 29, 2019 Filing 115 Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, KVK-Tech, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Related document(s) #109 . (Rice, Thomas)
April 29, 2019 Filing 114 Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Related document(s) #109 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stern, Jonathan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 113 Objection to Report and Recommendation Regarding Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Pharmacy Defendants filed by Walgreen Co.. Related document(s) #109 . (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
April 29, 2019 Filing 112 Objection to Report and Recommendation of Distributors Regarding Motion to Dismiss Muscogee (Creek) Nation's First Amended Complaint filed by Cardinal Health Inc.. Related document(s) #109 . (Hardin, Ashley)
April 16, 2019 Filing 111 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave and Motion to substitute parties (Related Doc #83 ), and denying as moot Amneal's Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. (Related Doc #50 ). Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 4/12/19.(P,R)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] clarifying the objection language in the Report and Recommendations (R&Rs) issued by Magistrate Judge Ruiz on April 1, 2019. (ECF Nos. #109 ). Both R&Rs include instructions regarding the filing of objections, and state that the PEC shall file a single document addressing objections common to all plaintiffs. With respect to these R&Rs, the court intended the PEC to include Plaintiffs Executive Committee, Plaintiffs Tribal Leadership Committee as well as the individual tribal plaintiff in their respective case (i.e. Muscogee (Creek) nation or Blackfeet tribe), all of whom should work together to file a single document addressing all relevant objections and, to the extent necessary, responses.. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 4/12/19. (P,R)
April 1, 2019 Filing 109 Report and Recommendation that the Manufacturer, Distributor, Pharmacy, and Generic Manufacturing Defendants' separate Motions to Dismiss ( #49 , #51 , #55 , #52 , #56 , #79 , #80 , #100 ) be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 4/29/2019. Responses due by 5/9/2019. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 4/1/2019 (P,R)
March 29, 2019 Filing 108 Notice of Withdrawal as counsel of Kelly Calder Mowen for Freeland Brown Pharmacy. (P,R)
March 29, 2019 Filing 107 Notice of Withdrawal as counsel of Edward A. Smallwood for Freeland Brown Pharmacy. (P,R)
March 1, 2019 Filing 106 Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Allen Dismissal Order)(Reed, Steven)
December 21, 2018 Filing 105 Notice of Withdrawal filed by Muscogee (Creek) Nation. (Hudson, Jenna)
December 5, 2018 Filing 104 Response to #103 Plaintiff's Motion Correct Clerical Error filed by Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc. (Hardin, Ashley)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] - Plaintiffs Motion to Correct Clerical Error (R. #103 ) is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, the order attached to Plaintiffs Motion to Correct Clerical Error is accepted as the substituted Exhibit L to Plaintiffs Consolidated Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss the Nations First Amended Complaint, (R. #84 ). Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 12/4/18.(P,R)
November 30, 2018 Filing 103 Motion Correct Clerical Error filed by Plaintiff Muscogee (Creek) Nation. Related document(s) #84 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L - Okla. State v. R.J. Reynolds MTD Order/Opinion, #2 Proposed Order Correct Clerical Error)(Hudson, Jenna)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to File Motion to Correct Clerical Error (Related Doc #101 ). Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 11/28/18.(P,R)
November 7, 2018 Filing 102 Opposition to #100 Olympia Pharmacy's Motion to dismiss filed by Muscogee (Creek) Nation. (Hudson, Jenna) Modified on 11/8/2018 (P,R).
November 6, 2018 Filing 101 Motion for leave to File Motion to Correct Clerical Error filed by Plaintiff Muscogee (Creek) Nation. Related document(s) #84 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Motion to Correct Clerical Error, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Hudson, Jenna)
November 6, 2018 Filing 100 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Olympia Pharmacy. Related document(s) #52 . (Youll, David) Modified on 11/8/2018 (P,R).
November 6, 2018 Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Olympia Pharmacy. (Youll, David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 98 Reply in support of #55 Motion to dismiss (Generic Defendants) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Reed, Steven)
November 2, 2018 Filing 97 Reply in support of #56 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean Morris In Support of Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit A People of the State of Cal. v. A Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.)(Stern, Jonathan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 96 Reply in support of #52 Motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants CareFirst Pharmacy, City Drug, Cityplex Pharmacy, Couch Pharmacy, CVS, Economy Pharmacy, Ernie's Pharmacy, Freeland Brown Pharmacy, Gaddy Discount Drug, M&D Star Drug, Med-Econ Drug , Olympia Pharmacy, Ominicare, Pippenger Pharmacies, Reasor's, Roger's Drug Co., Spoon Drugs, Walgreens, and Walmart filed by Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
November 2, 2018 Filing 95 Reply in support of #49 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Distributors' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs. Joint Mot. to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in State of Oklahoma ex rel. Hunter v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Hardin, Ashley)
November 2, 2018 Filing 94 Reply in support of #50 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cosgrove, Paul)
November 2, 2018 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
November 1, 2018 Filing 92 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
October 30, 2018 Filing 91 Attorney Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood, II filed by on behalf of Freeland Brown Pharmacy. (Smallwood, Edward)
October 30, 2018 Filing 90 Attorney Appearance by Kelly Calder Mowen filed by on behalf of Freeland Brown Pharmacy. (Mowen, Kelly)
October 19, 2018 Filing 89 Reply in support of #83 Motion for leave to File Motion Substituting Amneal Defendants filed by Muscogee (Creek) Nation. (Hudson, Jenna)
October 12, 2018 Filing 88 Response to #83 Motion for leave to File Motion Substituting Amneal Defendants filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cosgrove, Paul)
October 10, 2018 Filing 87 Attorney Appearance by David C. Youll filed on behalf of Olympia Pharmacy. (B,R)
October 5, 2018 Filing 86 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to dismiss Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Related Doc #82 ). In addition, the motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. on August 31, 2018 (ECF No. #48 ) is hereby rendered moot. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/5/18.(P,R)
October 5, 2018 Filing 85 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to dismiss CVS Health Corporation. (Related Doc #81 ). In addition, the motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed by Defendant CVS Health Corp. on August 31, 2018 (ECF No. #43 ) is hereby rendered moot. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/5/18.(P,R)
September 28, 2018 Filing 84 Opposition to #51 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #80 Motion to dismiss , #52 Motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants CareFirst Pharmacy, City Drug, Cityplex Pharmacy, Couch Pharmacy, CVS, Economy Pharmacy, Ernie's Pharmacy, Freeland Brown Pharmacy, Gaddy Discount Drug, M&D Star Drug, Med-Econ Drug, #56 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , #79 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , #49 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Distributors' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #55 Motion to dismiss (Generic Defendants) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #50 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , #43 Motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #48 Motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Defendants' Arguments, #2 Exhibit B - Index of Holdings by Other Courts, #3 Exhibit C - Okla. MTD Order/Opinion, #4 Exhibit D - N.H. MTD Order/Opinion, #5 Exhibit E - O.H. MTD Order/Opinion, #6 Exhibit F - Alaska MTD Order/Opinion, #7 Exhibit G - N.Y. Counties MTD Order/Opinion, #8 Exhibit H - WA. MTD Order/Opinion, #9 Exhibit I - Mo. MTD Order/Opinion, #10 Exhibit J - WV I MTD Order/Opinion, #11 Exhibit K - W.V. II MTD Order/Opinion, #12 Exhibit L - Okla. State v. R.J. Reynolds MTD Order/Opinion)(Hudson, Jenna)
September 28, 2018 Filing 83 Motion for leave to File Motion Substituting Amneal Defendants filed by Plaintiff Muscogee (Creek) Nation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Motion to Substitute, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Hudson, Jenna)
September 27, 2018 Filing 82 Unopposed Motion to dismiss party Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Muscogee (Creek) Nation. (Hudson, Jenna)
September 27, 2018 Filing 81 Unopposed Motion to dismiss party CVS Health Corporation filed by Plaintiff Muscogee (Creek) Nation. (Hudson, Jenna)
September 27, 2018 Filing 80 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Morris & Dickson Co LLC. Related document(s) #49 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion to Dismiss)(Spruiell, Frank)
September 26, 2018 Filing 79 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant GCP Pharma LLC. Related document(s) #49 . (Simcoe, Steven)
September 26, 2018 Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by GCP Pharma LLC. (Simcoe, Steven)
September 26, 2018 Filing 77 Attorney Appearance by Steven W. Simcoe filed by on behalf of GCP Pharma LLC. (Simcoe, Steven)
September 26, 2018 Filing 76 Attorney Appearance by Sean H. McKee filed by on behalf of GCP Pharma LLC. (McKee, Sean)
September 26, 2018 Filing 75 Attorney Appearance by Matthew B. Free filed by on behalf of GCP Pharma LLC. (Free, Matthew)
September 26, 2018 Filing 74 Attorney Appearance by Benjamin D. Reed filed by on behalf of GCP Pharma LLC. (Reed, Benjamin)
September 13, 2018 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Cardinal Health 110, LLC filed by Cardinal Health 110, LLC. (Pyser, Steven)
September 13, 2018 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Pyser, Steven)
September 11, 2018 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmerisourceBergen Corporation filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Zerrusen, Sandra)
September 10, 2018 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cosgrove, Paul)
September 7, 2018 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by City Drug Co.. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by City Drug of Coweta, Inc.. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Freeland Brown Pharmacy. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Reasor's LLC. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Spoon Drugs, Inc.. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Med-Econ Drug, Inc.. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by M & D Star Drug, Inc.. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc.. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc.. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Carefirst Pharmacy. (Free, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pippenger Pharmacies LLC. (Free, Matthew)
September 6, 2018 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Economy Pharmacy, Inc.. (McDonald, C.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pharmacy Buying Association. (Fries, Brian)
August 31, 2018 Filing 56 Joint Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Pleading Declaration of Sean Morris, #3 Exhibit A FDA Response, #4 Exhibit B Acoma Pueblo Memorandum, #5 Proposed Order)(Stern, Jonathan) .
August 31, 2018 Filing 55 Motion to dismiss (Generic Defendants) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Related document(s) #19 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(Reed, Steven)
August 31, 2018 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stern, Jonathan)
August 31, 2018 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Tabacchi, Tina)
August 31, 2018 Filing 52 Motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants CareFirst Pharmacy, City Drug, Cityplex Pharmacy, Couch Pharmacy, CVS, Economy Pharmacy, Ernie's Pharmacy, Freeland Brown Pharmacy, Gaddy Discount Drug, M&D Star Drug, Med-Econ Drug, Omnicare, Pippenger Pharmacies, Reasor's, Rogers Drug Co., Spoon Drugs, Walgreens, and Walmart filed by Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. Related document(s) #19 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 31, 2018 Filing 51 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Pharmacy Buying Association. Related document(s) #49 . (Fries, Brian)
August 31, 2018 Filing 50 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Related document(s) #19 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of S.V. Hirt)(Cosgrove, Paul)
August 31, 2018 Filing 49 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Distributors' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation. Related document(s) #19 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Distributors' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Hardin, Ashley)
August 31, 2018 Filing 48 Motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. Related document(s) #19 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit A - Decl. or Mark Weisz)(Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 31, 2018 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 31, 2018 Filing 46 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 31, 2018 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 31, 2018 Filing 44 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 31, 2018 Filing 43 Motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Delinsky, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 41 Attorney Appearance by Eric R. Delinsky filed by on behalf of CVS Health Corporation. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 39 Attorney Appearance by Eric R. Delinsky filed by on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Omnicare Distribution Center LLC. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 37 Attorney Appearance by Eric R. Delinsky filed by on behalf of Omnicare Distribution Center LLC. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 35 Attorney Appearance by Eric R. Delinsky filed by on behalf of Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Couch Pharmacy on Sheridan. (Papp, Edward)
August 30, 2018 Filing 33 Attorney Appearance by Steven W. Simcoe filed by on behalf of Carefirst Pharmacy, City Drug Co., City Drug of Coweta, Inc., Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc., Freeland Brown Pharmacy, Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc., M & D Star Drug, Inc., Med-Econ Drug, Inc., Pippenger Pharmacies LLC, Reasor's LLC, Spoon Drugs, Inc. (B,R)
August 30, 2018 Filing 32 Attorney Appearance by Benjamin D. Reed filed by on behalf of Carefirst Pharmacy, City Drug Co., City Drug of Coweta, Inc., Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc., Freeland Brown Pharmacy, Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc., M & D Star Drug, Inc., Med-Econ Drug, Inc., Pippenger Pharmacies LLC, Reasor's LLC, Spoon Drugs, Inc. (B,R)
August 30, 2018 Filing 31 Attorney Appearance by Sean H. McKee filed by on behalf of Carefirst Pharmacy, City Drug Co., City Drug of Coweta, Inc., Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc., Freeland Brown Pharmacy, Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc., M & D Star Drug, Inc., Med-Econ Drug, Inc., Pippenger Pharmacies LLC, Reasor's LLC, Spoon Drugs, Inc.(B,R)
August 30, 2018 Filing 30 Attorney Appearance by C. Richard McDonald, Sr filed by on behalf of Economy Pharmacy, Inc.. (McDonald, C.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 29 Attorney Appearance by Matthew B. Free filed by on behalf of Carefirst Pharmacy, City Drug Co., City Drug of Coweta, Inc., Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc., Freeland Brown Pharmacy, Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc., M & D Star Drug, Inc., Med-Econ Drug, Inc., Pippenger Pharmacies LLC, Reasor's LLC, Spoon Drugs, Inc.. (Free, Matthew)
August 28, 2018 Filing 28 Attorney Appearance by Brian C. Fries, Taryn A. Nash filed on behalf of Pharmacy Buying Association. (P,R)
August 22, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cityplex Pharmacy. (Streza, Ralph)
August 21, 2018 Filing 26 Attorney Appearance by Ralph Streza filed by on behalf of Cityplex Pharmacy. (Streza, Ralph)
August 20, 2018 Filing 25 Attorney Appearance by Edward D. Papp Brian D. Kerns and William A. Peseski filed by on behalf of Couch Pharmacy on Sheridan. (Papp, Edward)
August 17, 2018 Filing 24 Attorney Appearance by Gregory E. O'Brien filed by on behalf of Rogers Drug Co., Inc.. (O'Brien, Gregory)
July 26, 2018 Filing 23 Attorney Appearance by Tina M. Tabacchi filed by on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Tabacchi, Tina)
July 26, 2018 Filing 22 Attorney Appearance by Tara A. Fumerton filed by on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
July 26, 2018 Filing 21 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R)
July 12, 2018 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance by Lloyd B Miller , Donald J Simon and Whitney A Leonard filed by on behalf of Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The. (Miller, Lloyd)
July 9, 2018 Filing 19 First Amended complaint against Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The and adding new party defendant(s) Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Carefirst Pharmacy, Inc., City Drug Company, City Drug of Coweta, Inc., Cityplex Pharmacy, Inc., Couch Pharmacy on Sheridan, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Economy Discount Pharmacy, Economy Pharmacy Express, Economy Pharmacy, Inc., Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc., Freeland-Brown Pharmacy, Inc., Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc., GCP Pharma LLC, Getman-Apothecary Shoppe, Inc., H.D.Smith, LLC, KVK TECH, Inc., Langsam Health Services, LLC, M & D Star Drug, Inc., May's Drug Stores, Inc., Med-Econ Drug, Inc., Med-X Corporation, Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Olympia Pharmacy, Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, Pharmacy Buying Association, Pippenger Pharmacies, L.L.C., Reasor's LLC, Rogers Drug Co. Inc., SAJ Distributors, Smith Drug Company, Spoon Drugs, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Drug Warehouse, The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, Walgreen Co., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Filed by Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The. (Attachments: #1 Summons Actavis LLC, #2 Summons Actavis Pharma, Inc., #3 Summons Allergan Finance LLC, #4 Summons AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #5 Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #6 Summons Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #7 Summons Anda, Inc., #8 Summons Cardinal Health 110, LLC, #9 Summons Carefirst Pharmacy, Inc., #10 Summons City Drug Company, #11 Summons City Drug of Coweta, Inc., #12 Summons Cityplex Pharmacy, Inc., #13 Summons Couch Pharmacy on Sheridan, #14 Summons CVS Pharmacy Inc., #15 Summons Economy Discount Pharmacy, #16 Summons Economy Pharmacy Express, #17 Summons Economy Pharmacy, Inc., #18 Summons Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc., #19 Summons Freeland-Brown Pharmacy, Inc., #20 Summons Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc., #21 Summons GCP Pharma LLC, #22 Summons Getman-Apothecary Shoppe, Inc., #23 Summons H.D. Smith, LLC, #24 Summons KVK-TECH, Inc., #25 Summons Langsam Health Services, #26 Summons M & D Star Drug, Inc., #27 Summons May's Drug Stores, Inc., #28 Summons McKesson Corporation, #29 Summons Med-Econ Drug, Inc., #30 Summons Med-X Corporation, #31 Summons Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, #32 Summons Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, #33 Summons Olympia Pharmacy, #34 Summons Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, #35 Summons Pharmacy Buying Association, #36 Summons Pippenger Pharmacies, L.L.C., #37 Summons Reasor's LLC, #38 Summons Rogers Drug Co. Inc., #39 Summons SAJ Distributors, #40 Summons Smith Drug Company, #41 Summons Spoon Drugs, Inc., #42 Summons TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #43 Summons The Drug Warehouse, #44 Summons The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, #45 Summons Walgreen Co., #46 Summons Watson Laboratories, Inc.) (Callow, Joseph)
July 9, 2018 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Joseph M. Callow, Jr filed by on behalf of Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The. (Callow, Joseph)
April 26, 2018 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Northern. Case number 4:18-cv-00180. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 18, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #16 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the MDL Panel, transferring case (terminates case) (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 15 ***Remark: Received Minute Order from MDL re: transferee clerk to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Order to transfer to the district court from which the action is being transferred. (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 14 ***Remark: Received Conditional Transfer Order from MDL re: stay is lifted (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Whitney A Leonard by on behalf of Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The (Leonard, Whitney) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 12 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The (Weintraub, Adam) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge James H Payne : granting plaintiff's motion as to Whitney Leonard provided that within 7 days they submit their CM/ECF Registration form pursuant to the Courts Administrative Guide ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge James H Payne : granting plaintiff's motion as to Donald Simon ; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Whitney A. Leonard to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1899355) by Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The (With attachments) (Weintraub, Adam) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald J. Simon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1899340) by Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The (With attachments) (Weintraub, Adam) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lloyd B Miller on behalf of Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The (Miller, Lloyd) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Terry Scott O'Donnell on behalf of Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The [Note: Attorney Terry Scott O'Donnell added to party Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The(pty:pla).] (O'Donnell, Terry) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Michael Affeldt on behalf of Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The [Note: Attorney Thomas Michael Affeldt added to party Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The(pty:pla).] (Affeldt, Thomas) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Adam Scott Weintraub on behalf of Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The (Weintraub, Adam) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1898173) by Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The (Weintraub, Adam) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Muscogee (Creek) Nation, The (Weintraub, Adam) [Transferred from oknd on 4/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muscogee (Creek) Nation v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey E. Hobart
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Couch Pharmacy on Sheridan
Represented By: Edward D. Papp
Represented By: William A. Peseski
Represented By: Brian D. Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Buying Association
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Represented By: Taryn A. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Miller Benoit
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympia Pharmacy
Represented By: Jim C. McGough
Represented By: David C. Youll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Sarah Miller Benoit
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie's Pharmacy & Wellness Center, Inc.
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May's Drug Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med-Econ Drug, Inc.
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Drug of Coweta, Inc.
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeland Brown Pharmacy
Represented By: Kelly Calder Mowen
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Warehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ashley W. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spoon Drugs, Inc.
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pippenger Pharmacies LLC
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Drug Co., Inc.
Represented By: Gregory E. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ashley W. Hardin
Represented By: Steven M. Pyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Discount Pharmacy
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Sandra K. Zerrusen
Represented By: Robert A. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Ashley W. Hardin
Represented By: Steven M. Pyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaddy Discount Drug, Inc.
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Tara A. Fumerton
Represented By: Tina M. Tabacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med-X Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Represented By: William E. Padgett
Represented By: Kathleen L. Matsoukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Robert A. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Represented By: C. Richard McDonald, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica B. Cozart
Represented By: Lisa A. Larkin
Represented By: Megan Sterchi Lammert
Represented By: Katherine S. Davies
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langsam Health Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getman Apothecary Shoppe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Pharmacy Express
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reasor's LLC
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturer Defendants
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cityplex Pharmacy
Represented By: Ralph Streza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carefirst Pharmacy
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Drug Co.
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & D Star Drug, Inc.
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Matthew B. Free
Represented By: Steven W. Simcoe
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muscogee (Creek) Nation
Represented By: Richard D. Shore
Represented By: Joseph M. Callow, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Affeldt
Represented By: Kevin W. Dellinger
Represented By: Tyler Ulrich
Represented By: Donald J. Simon
Represented By: Michael B. Rush
Represented By: Terry Scott O'Donnell
Represented By: Mark A. Packman
Represented By: Whitney A. Leonard
Represented By: Lloyd B Miller
Represented By: Scott D. Gilbert
Represented By: William S. Ohlemeyer
Represented By: Richard W. Fields
Represented By: Martin F. Cunniff
Represented By: Jenna A. Hudson
Represented By: Adam Scott Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?