Washington County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Washington County, Virginia
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Barr Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Insource, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, OptumRX, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Express Scripts Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, KVK-Tech Inc, Caremark, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Does 1-100, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45254
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 67 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 1:18-cv-00046. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 3, 2019 Filing 66 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from Northern District of Ohio; MDL No. 2804 (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Expedite and granting #23 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re #6 , #23 of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re #6 , #23 of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE by Washington County, Virginia re #6 (EDVA Decision) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by Washington County, Virginia re #6 (Additional Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re #6 , #23 of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2019 re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Washington County, Virginia, #23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., #11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by Washington County, Virginia. (Court Reporter: M. Butenschoen) (bwd) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #56 (NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.S RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORAL ORDER granting #53 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Herman Jordan for Optum, Inc.,OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/16/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 56 Response re #35 Notice (Other) . filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 54 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal. filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3049301. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORAL ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to File. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand at #45 Exhibit A is deemed filed. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORAL ORDER granting #44 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian David Boone for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORAL ORDER granting #43 MOTION for Jake R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jake R. Miller for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORAL ORDER granting #42 MOTION for Matthew I. Menchel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew I. Menchel for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORAL ORDER granting #40 MOTION for Steven G. Kobre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Steven G. Kobre for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORAL ORDER granting #38 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kimberly Chemerinsky for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/14/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 46 Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal Filed By Endo Defendants and in Support of Motion to Remand. filed by Washington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Memorandum of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3048377. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Jake R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047793. by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Matthew I. Menchel to appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047369 by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/10/2019 to reflect Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice instead of Motion to Amend (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Steven G. Kobre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047369. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Steven G. Kobre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3047367. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Washington County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3046875. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 34 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Cheryl Mandel on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mandel, Rebecca) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 32 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #20 Response in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Statement of Interest)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORAL ORDER granting #28 MOTION for Adriana Riviere-Badell to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adriana Riviere-Badell for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/7/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORAL ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Julian W. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Julian W. Park for Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/7/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Adriana Riviere-Badell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3043936. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Julian W. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3043935. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed, #11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand : (CR) Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 10:00 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: This hearing has been set for two hours. If you think the hearing will take longer than two hours, please contact the Courtroom Deputy as soon as possible. Parties may appear telephonically if coordinated with chambers beforehand. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
January 1, 2019 Filing 25 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Washington County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 24 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3- Lac Courtes Oreilles Opinion, #4 Exhibit 4- Rancheria Order, #5 Exhibit 5- Kentucky Order, #6 Exhibit 6- City of Portland Order, #7 Exhibit 7- San Mateo Order, #8 Exhibit 8- Combined Orders Granting Stays, #9 Exhibit 9- Noble County Order, #10 Exhibit 10- Jefferson County Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc(Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/2/2019 to remove referral at direction of chambers (ck). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Cancellation of 1/2/2019 Motion Hearing (Cancel Court Reporter) (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Amending Briefing Order. The previously scheduled hearing in Roanoke at 2:00 p.m. on January 2, 2019, is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/21/2018. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan, N.V., Corporate Parent Mylan, Inc. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Myer Talotta on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Talotta, Jon) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 State Court Records received from Washington County Circuit Court, CL18-1769 (Attachments: #1 State Court Record - Part 2)(lml) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Tag-Along, #2 Exhibit B- Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit C- JPML Rules)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand : (CR) Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2019 02:00 PM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Parties may appear telephonically if coordinated with chambers beforehand.(ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/20/2018. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Washington County, Virginia.(Conrod, Richard) Modified on 1/8/2019 - referral text removed (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Washington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Washington County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/13/2018. (ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number CL18-1769. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3033377), filed by Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Original Complaint and Motion for Leave, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ab) [Transferred from vawd on 4/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Represented By: Steven G. Kobre
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Represented By: Julian W. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Represented By: Steven G. Kobre
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Represented By: Julian W. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Jake Redon Miller
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rebecca Cheryl Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Jake Redon Miller
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington County, Virginia
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?