City of Lackawanna, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Lackawanna, New York
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Beverly Sackler, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., CVS RX Services, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Omnicare, Inc., McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Omnicare of New York, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., David A. Sackler, Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Stuart D. Baker, Cephalon Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, CVS Albany, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Associated Pharmacies Inc, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Rhodes Technology, Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Indivior Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Rhodes Technology, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., Jonathan D. Sackler, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Sandoz Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Allergan USA, Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45303
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2019 Filing 69 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Walgreen Co. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 30, 2019 Filing 68 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 26, 2019 Filing 67 Stipulated Service Acknowledged by Sackler Defendants & Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family on 6/25/19 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 66 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Omnicare Distribution Center LLC waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 65 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Omnicare, Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 64 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Omnicare of New York, LLC waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 63 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 62 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 61 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 60 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 59 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 58 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 57 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 56 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 55 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 54 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 53 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 10, 2019 Filing 52 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Associated Pharmacies Inc waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 51 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Rite Aid of New York, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 50 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 49 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 48 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 47 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 46 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 45 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 44 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Allergan USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Keysource Medical, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Cardinal Health 110, LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Anda Inc waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Insys Therapeutics Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 30 Stipulated Service Acknowledged by Defendant Stuart D. Baker on 5/23/19 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Mylan Institutional, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Theresa Sackler waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Ilene Sackler Lefcourt waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Mortimer D.A. Sackler waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Kathe A. Sackler waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Rhodes Technology waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Rhodes Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. CVS Albany, LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. CVS Indiana L.L.C. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. CVS RX Services, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. CVS Pharmacy Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Lackawanna, New York. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 5/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 filed on behalf of City of Lackawanna, New York (Pearlman, Eva)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Western. Case number 1:19-cv-00485. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the District of Northern Ohio. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 5/3/19. (MD) [Transferred from nywd on 5/8/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (KM) [Transferred from nywd on 5/8/2019.]
April 18, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(KM) [Transferred from nywd on 5/8/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM) [Transferred from nywd on 5/8/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KM) [Transferred from nywd on 5/8/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3420764, filed by City of Lackawanna, New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., #3 Exhibit Summons Actavis LLC, #4 Exhibit Summons Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #5 Exhibit Summons Allergan Plc f/k/a Actavis, Plc, #6 Exhibit Summons Allergan USA, Inc., #7 Exhibit Summons AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #8 Exhibit Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #9 Exhibit Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, #10 Exhibit Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals Of New York, LLC, #11 Exhibit Summons Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #12 Exhibit Summons Anda, Inc., #13 Exhibit Summons Associated Pharmacies, Inc., #14 Exhibit Summons Beverly Sackler, Trustee, #15 Exhibit Summons Beverly Sackler, #16 Exhibit Summons Cardinal Health 110, LLC, #17 Exhibit Summons Cardinal Health, Inc., #18 Exhibit Summons Cephalon, Inc., #19 Exhibit Summons CVS Albany, LLC, #20 Exhibit Summons CVS Indiana, LLC, #21 Exhibit Summons CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #22 Exhibit Summons CVS Rx Services, Inc., #23 Exhibit Summons CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, #24 Exhibit Summons David A. Sackler, #25 Exhibit Summons Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., #26 Exhibit Summons Endo Generics Holding, Inc., #27 Exhibit Summons Endo Health Solutions Inc., #28 Exhibit Summons Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #29 Exhibit Summons H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, #30 Exhibit Summons Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., #31 Exhibit Summons Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, #32 Exhibit Summons Indivior, Inc., #33 Exhibit Summons Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #34 Exhibit Summons Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #35 Exhibit Summons Janssen Pharmceuticals, Inc., #36 Exhibit Summons Johnson & Johnson, #37 Exhibit Summons, Jonathan D. Sackler, Trustee, #38 Exhibit Summons Jonathan D. Sackler, #39 Exhibit Summons Kathe A. Sackler, #40 Exhibit Summons Keysource Medical, Inc., #41 Exhibit Summons Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #42 Exhibit Summons Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., #43 Exhibit Summons Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, #44 Exhibit Summons Mallinckrodt Plc, #45 Exhibit Summons Mallinckrodt, LLC, #46 Exhibit Summons Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., #47 Exhibit Summons McKesson Corporation, #48 Exhibit Summons McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., #49 Exhibit Summons McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, #50 Exhibit Summons McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, #51 Exhibit Summons Mortimer D.A. Sackler, #52 Exhibit Summons Mylan Institutional, Inc., #53 Exhibit Summons Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #54 Exhibit Summons Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC, #55 Exhibit Summons Omnicare of New York, LLC, #56 Exhibit Summons Omnicare, Inc., #57 Exhibit Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #58 Exhibit Summons Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., #59 Exhibit Summons Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., #60 Exhibit Summons Purdue Pharma, Inc., #61 Exhibit Summons Purdue Pharma, L.P., #62 Exhibit Summons Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, #63 Exhibit Summons Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #64 Exhibit Summons Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., #65 Exhibit Summons Rhodes Technology, Inc., #66 Exhibit Summons Rhodes Technology, #67 Exhibit Summons Richard S. Sackler, Trustee, #68 Exhibit Summons Richard S. Sackler, #69 Exhibit Summons Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, #70 Exhibit Summons Rite Aid of New York, Inc., #71 Exhibit Summons Sandoz, Inc., #72 Exhibit Summons SpecGX, LLC, #73 Exhibit Summons Stuart D. Baker, #74 Exhibit Summons Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd, #75 Exhibit Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #76 Exhibit Summons The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., #77 Exhibit Summons The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #78 Exhibit Summons Theresa Sackler, #79 Exhibit Summons Walgreen Co., #80 Exhibit Summons Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., #81 Exhibit Summons Walmart Inc. f/ka/ Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #82 Exhibit Summons Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., #83 Exhibit Summons Watson Laboratories, Inc., #84 Exhibit Summons West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.)(Pearlman, Eva) [Transferred from nywd on 5/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Lackawanna, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Albany, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Pharmacies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitest Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Lackawanna, New York
Represented By: Eva Brindisi Pearlman
Represented By: Louis T. Brindisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?