County of Carbon v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Carbon
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Kroger Co., Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., McKesson Corporation, Allergan PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Rhodes Technologies, Rite Aid Corporation, David A. Sackler, Stuart D. Baker, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Miami-Luken Inc, Walgreen Eastern Co., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45337
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 55 Remand Order - Case remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Delaware County, Pennsylvania. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/2/19. (P,R)
July 1, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Consent to Remand filed by Walgreen Eastern Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
May 23, 2019 Filing 53 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case number 2:18-cv-05625. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 7, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 2/7/19 (Document #47) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for the following reason: Return to Sender. Not at this Address. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 3/12/19 (Document #51) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for the following reason: Return to Sender. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 52 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO. 5/22/19 ENTERED. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/7/19 (Document #11) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for the following reason: Return to Sender. Unable to Forward. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 2/25/19 (Document #49) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for the following reason: Return to Sender. Not at this address. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT ALL PROCEEDINGS IN THIS CASE ARE STAYED PENDING A FINAL DECISION BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ON WHETHER TO TRANSER THIS ACTION TO THE OPIATE MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/12/19.3/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED, AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by COUNTY OF CARBON As To The Kroger Co. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAPPELLI, JOSEPH) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT H.D. SMITH, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSES, SHALL HAVE THROUGH & INCLUDING 45 DAYS AFTER THIS COURT'S RULING ON PLFF'S OR ANY OTHER PARTY'S MOTION TO REMAND TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/25/19. 2/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED, AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/30/19 (Document #44) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for the following reason: Return to Sender. Not at this address. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 48 Supplemental Post-Conference Memorandum of law on the motion to remand and motion to stay, filed by DEFT WALGREEN EASTERN CO.. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT DEFT WALGREEN EASTERN CO.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE ATTACHED SUPPLEMENTAL POST-CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON THE MOTION TO REMAND & MOTION TO STAY IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ATTACHED SUPPLEMENTAL POST-CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON THE MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION TO STAY IS HEREBY FILED OF RECORD. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/7/19. 2/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, FAXED, AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/24/19 (Document #'s 34, 35, 36 & 37) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for the following reason: Return to Sender. Not at this address. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 46 Minute Entry/Report of Telephone Conference for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ on 2/4/19. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Post-Conference Memorandum of Law on the Motion to Remand and Motion to Stay filed by WALGREEN EASTERN CO... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(BIXLER, ALBERT) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE by WAL-MART INC. re #19 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Opiate Multidistrict Litigation Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(KITCHEN, JAMES) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Letter to Attorney George P. Noel, Esq. re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF CONOR B. O'CROININ, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2((b) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/30/19. 1/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, FAXED, AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 1/31/19) (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. OCroinin, Esq. by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13318555.). (VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by WILL W. SACHSE on behalf of PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC. (SACHSE, WILL) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE FOR 2/4/2019 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/30/2019. 1/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(stwe, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Copy of Order dated 1/7/19 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. for the following reason: MLNA - Unable to Forward. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Copy of Order dated 1/10/19 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. for the following reason: MLNA - Unable to Forward. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request For Expedited Consideration filed by WALGREEN EASTERN CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(BIXLER, ALBERT) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Opiate Multidistrict Litigation filed by COUNTY OF CARBON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(CAPPELLI, JOSEPH) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF ALEX J. HARRIS, ESQ., TO PRACIN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/23/19. 1/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, FAXED, AND E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 1/25/19) (kw, ) Modified on 1/25/2019 (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFT BAKER, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSE, SHALL HAVE THROUGH AND INCLUDING 45 DAYS AFTER THIS COURT'S RULING ON PLFF'S OR ANY OTHER PARTY'S MOTION TO REMAND TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/11/19. 1/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED, AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR THE SACKLER DEFTS TO MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED FORTY-FIVE DAYS AFTER THIS COURT'S RULING ON PLFF'S OR ANY OTHER PARTY'S MOTION TO REMAND, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/23/19. 1/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED, AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ANDA, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSE, SHALL HAVE UNTIL FORTY-FIVE DAYS FOLLOWING THIS COURT'S RULING ON PLFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO ANSWER, MOVE OR RESPOND TO THE FAC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/23/19. 1/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED, AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MANUFACTURER DEFTS, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSE, SHALL HAVE UNTIL FORTY-FIVE DAYS FOLLOWING THIS COURT'S RULING ON PLFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO ANSWER, MOVE OR RESPOND TO THE FAC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/23/19. 1/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED, AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT J. ETISH on behalf of INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC. with Certificate of Service(ETISH, SCOTT) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN ANDRISANI on behalf of ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, CEPHALON, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANDRISANI, NATHAN) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by HARVEY BARTLE, IV on behalf of ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, CEPHALON, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(BARTLE, HARVEY) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER R. BOISVERT on behalf of PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BOISVERT, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Letter sent to Alex J. Harris, Esq. on 1/24/2019. (kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Alex J. Harris filed by WALGREEN CO., WALGREEN EASTERN CO., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC..Certificate of Service.(BIXLER, ALBERT) (Filing fee paid on 1/25/19) Modified on 1/28/2019 (kw, ). [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE FOR 1/25/2019 AT 11:30 AM BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/22/2019. 1/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(stwe, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK D. VILLANUEVA on behalf of CVS HEALTH CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JAMES T. KITCHEN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/17/19.1/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES. (kw, ) Modified on 1/18/2019 (kw, ). [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS KEITH ROSENBLUM on behalf of CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MANUFACTURER DEFTS, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSES, SHALL HAVE THROUGH AND INCLUDING 45 DAYS AFTER THIS COURT'S RULING ON PLFF'S OR ANY OTHER PARTY'S MOTION TO REMAND TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**. (TOLIN, ADAM) Modified on 1/16/2019 (tjd). [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by COUNTY OF CARBON.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(CAPPELLI, JOSEPH) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of James T. Kitchen ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13283607.) filed by WAL-MART INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, KIMBERLY) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WAL-MART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, KIMBERLY) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Opiate Multidistrict Litigation filed by WAL-MART INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Memorandum, #4 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, KIMBERLY) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY A. BROWN on behalf of WAL-MART INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, KIMBERLY) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by STUART D. BAKER, STUART D. BAKER, STUART D. BAKER. Certificate of Service.**(FILED IN ERROR, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**(LURIE, STUART) Modified on 1/14/2019 (tjd). Modified on 1/14/2019 (tjd). [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART D. LURIE on behalf of STUART D. BAKER with Certificate of Service(LURIE, STUART) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DISTRIBUTOR DEFTS, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSES, SHALL HAVE THROUGH AND INCLUDING 45 DAYS AFTER THIS COURT'S RULING ON PLFF'S OR ANY OTHER PARTY'S MOTION TO REMAND TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/9/19. 1/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. LIMBACHER on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(LIMBACHER, ROBERT) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM S. TOLIN on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(TOLIN, ADAM) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Order for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, BEVERLY SACKLER, DAVID A. SACKLER, JONATHAN D. SACKLER, KATHE A. SACKLER, MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, RICHARD S. SACKLER, THERESA SACKLER, TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY..(JASONS, CATHERINE) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN KENDALL on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with Certificate of service(KENDALL, CAROLYN) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ABRAHAM J. REIN on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with Certificate of service(REIN, ABRAHAM) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN N. JOSEPH on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with Certificate of service(JOSEPH, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE RETAIL PHARMACY DEFTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 45 DAYS AFTER ANY RULING BY THE COURT ON PLFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/7/19. 1/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by COUNTY OF CARBON.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**.(CAPPELLI, JOSEPH) Modified on 1/8/2019 (tjd). [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, BEVERLY SACKLER, DAVID A. SACKLER, JONATHAN D. SACKLER, KATHE A. SACKLER, MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, RICHARD S. SACKLER, THERESA SACKLER, TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA TRELA on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(TRELA, REBECCA) Modified on 1/8/2019 (tjd). [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. ABERNETHY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC with Certificate of Service(ABERNETHY, DAVID) Modified on 1/8/2019 (tjd). [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY TO CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 01/03/2019. 01/04/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nd, ) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nd, ). [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. by WALGREEN EASTERN CO..(BIXLER, ALBERT) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WALGREEN EASTERN CO. from DELAWARE COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 17-008095. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190082) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas) [Transferred from paed on 5/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Carbon v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Trela
Represented By: David F. Abernethy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Hagedorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Represented By: Catherine N. Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Boisvert
Represented By: Will W. Sachse
Represented By: Judy L. Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Catherine N. Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: James T. Sandnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By: Scott J. Etish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Albert G. Bixler
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: James T. Kitchen
Represented By: Kimberly A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Abraham J. Rein
Represented By: John N. Joseph
Represented By: Carolyn Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: George P. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Nathan J. Andrisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Nathan J. Andrisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: Catherine N. Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Trela
Represented By: David F. Abernethy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Nathan J. Andrisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Represented By: James T. Sandnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Coleen M. Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Represented By: Catherine N. Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Represented By: Stuart D. Lurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Nathan J. Andrisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Harvey Bartle, IV
Represented By: Nathan J. Andrisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Boisvert
Represented By: Will W. Sachse
Represented By: Judy L. Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Coleen M. Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Albert G. Bixler
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Represented By: James T. Sandnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: Catherine N. Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Douglas K. Rosenblum
Represented By: Marc S. Raspanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Represented By: Albert G. Bixler
Represented By: Alex J. Harris
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Limbacher
Represented By: Adam S. Tolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Rebecca Trela
Represented By: David F. Abernethy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Robert A. Limbacher
Represented By: Adam S. Tolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: Catherine N. Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Louis W. Schack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Tolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Steven N. Herman
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Mark D. Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Represented By: Catherine N. Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Represented By: Catherine N. Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Represented By: Catherine N. Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David F. Abernethy
Represented By: Rebecca Trela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Boisvert
Represented By: Will W. Sachse
Represented By: Judy L. Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: James T. Sandnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Tolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Leah R. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Carbon
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Degisi
Represented By: Joseph J. Cappelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?