Jefferson County et al v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Taney County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, City of Joplin, Dunklin County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Washington County, Iron County, Dent County, Texas County, Greene County, Franklin County, Butler County, Christian County, Crawford County, Madison County, Jasper County, Stone County, Jefferson County and Cape Girardeau County
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Insys Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Richard S. Sackler, Watson Laboratories Inc., Missouri CVS LLC, Allergan PLC, Target Corporation, OptumRX, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Express Scripts Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Mylan N.V., DepoMed Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Actiavis Pharma, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Cephalon, Inc., Caremark LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Optum, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Wal-Mart Inc., United Health Group, Incorporated, The Purdue Frederick Company, Walgreen Company, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Dannie E. Williams, Delmar Primary Care Associates, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45371
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 27 Certified copy of order of severance and remand mailed to the 22nd Judicial Circuit Court of Missouri with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (P,R)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order of Severance and Remand of Plaintiffs Jefferson and Franklin Counties' claims to the 22nd Judicial Circuit of Missouri. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/24/19. (P,R)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 Response by Plaintiffs Jefferson County and Franklin County to Certain Defendants' Objection to the Request by Judge Burlison to Sever and Remand filed by Franklin County, Jefferson County. Related document(s) #24 . (Garvey, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 Objection By Certain Defendants To The Request By Judge Burlison To Sever and Remand Claims of Jefferson County and Franklin County, Missouri filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., Caremark LLC, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Missouri CVS LLC. (Delinsky, Eric)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Scheduling Order - The Court DIRECTS any party who opposes remand to file an objection by 12:00 noon on Monday, July 22, 2019. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Judge Burlison Letter)(P,R)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:19-cv-00157. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by F. Scott Galt for Defendants Delmar Primary Care Associates, LLC, Dannie E. Williams. (Galt, F.) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Fred Jacob Kohut, III for Defendants Delmar Primary Care Associates, LLC, Dannie E. Williams. (Kohut, Fred) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #12 MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose filed by Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose [Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose] filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay for a Limited Purpose by Plaintiffs Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay: The Moving Defendant's motion is GRANTED. Litigation is STAYED pending the JPML's decision on Plaintiffs' motion to vacate the conditional transfer order. The parties must notify this Court within three days of the JPML's decision on the motion to vacate the conditional transfer order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/7/2019. (AFC) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by John Francis Garvey, Jr for Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Garvey, John) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Alyson Marie Petrick for Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Petrick, Alyson) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah Shoemake Doles for Plaintiffs Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Independence, Missouri, City of, Iron County, Jasper County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County. (Doles, Sarah) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Stay [Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.] filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Conditional Transfer Order dtd 2-6-19, #2 Exhibit 2, Transfer Order dtd 2-7-19)(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay [Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.] by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc Sent To: State Court - Executed (Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Direct-Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Crawford County, Taney County, Ste Genevieve County, Washington County, Franklin County, Greene County, Iron County, Perry County, Texas County, Butler County, Stone County, Jefferson County, Madison County, Jasper County, City of Joplin, Cape Girardeau County, Dunklin County, Dent County, Christian County, Independence, Missouri, City of.(BAK) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc Sent To: Plaintiff (Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc. Parent companies: CVS Health Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: CVS Health Corporation,. (Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC00203, with receipt number 0865-7012240, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2, State Court File, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment A & B to Civil Cover Sheet)(Greiman, Gerald) [Transferred from moed on 6/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson County et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri CVS LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DepoMed Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actiavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Group, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannie E. Williams
Represented By: Fred Jacob Kohut, III
Represented By: F. Scott Galt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmar Primary Care Associates, LLC
Represented By: Fred Jacob Kohut, III
Represented By: F. Scott Galt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taney County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ste Genevieve County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Joplin
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunklin County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Independence, Missouri, City of
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dent County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greene County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butler County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crawford County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape Girardeau County
Represented By: John Francis Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Alyson Marie Petrick
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?