Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corp., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., McKesson Corp., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Thrifty Payless Inc., Richard S. Sackler, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, CVS Health, David A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Co., Jonathan D. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Sandoz Inc. and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019op45582
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. The Purdue Frederick Company waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. McKesson Corp. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Amerisourcebergen Corp. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation (Dolejsi, Holly)
August 26, 2019 Party AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health, KVK-Tech, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz Inc., SpecGX LLC, Thrifty Payless Inc., Walgreen Co., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Richard S. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, David A. Sackler and Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family added. filed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. (Purdon, Timothy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Amended complaint against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corp., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation; CVS Health; KVK-Tech, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Sandoz Inc.; SpecGx LLC; Thrifty Payless Inc.; Walgreen Co.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.; Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; and Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family a/k/a The "Raymond Sackler Trust". Filed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. (Purdon, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corp., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9399322. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-028044-DAP. Filed by Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Purdon, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sycuan Band of Kumeyaay Nation
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Holly H. Dolejsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?