Alleghany County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Alleghany County, Virginia
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Barr Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Insource, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Express Scripts Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Caremark, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Does 1-100, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45700
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 39 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 7:19-cv-00275. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order transferring case to Northern Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 08/01/2019. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from District of Northern Ohio; MDL No. 2804. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 07/31/2019. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by Alleghany County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Hedblom Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Cancellation of PTM 5/28/19 (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (mka) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/1/19. (sas) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand, #23 MOTION to Stay , #5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2019 09:00 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Stay . filed by Alleghany County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Alleghany County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Alleghany County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 26 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Unitedhealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 25 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Massie, Wade) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 24 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Stay . filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Unitedhealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit A, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Unitedhealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian David Boone for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., and Unitedhealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/17/19. (sas) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Herman Jordan for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., and Unitedhealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/16/19. (sas) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kimberly Kisabeth Chemerinsky for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Unitedhealth Group Incorporated added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/16/19. (sas) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122712. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Unitedhealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122025. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Unitedhealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122017. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Unitedhealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER regarding Supplemental MOTION to Remand #6 and MOTION to Remand #5 filed by Alleghany County, Virginia, Set Motion Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand and #6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand:( Responses due by 4/18/2019, Replies due by 4/25/2019.). Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/15/19. (sas) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Correction re #13 State Court Records - Paper: attached PDF of scanned state court records (regenerated NEF to provide copies to parties). (ams) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Cook Hedblom on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 Paper State Court Records received from Alleghany County Circuit Court, CL19000183-00, consisting of 1 case folder, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (sas) (ams). [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) Modified on 4/12/2019 to add corporate parents OptumRX Holdings, LLC and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (sas). [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) Modified on 4/12/2019 to add corporate parents United HealthCare Services, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (sas). [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unitedhealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand . filed by Alleghany County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Treatment of Motion to Remand. filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Briefing Order)(Massie, Wade) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Alleghany County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Alleghany County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Alleghany County, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Unitedhealth Group Incorporated Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Alleghany County Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/2/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alleghany County Circuit Court, case number CL19000183-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400), filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alleghany County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alleghany County, Virginia
Represented By: Jim H. Guynn, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?