City of Bristol, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Bristol, Virginia
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Insource, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Express Scripts Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Caremark, L.L.C., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Does 1-100, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Actavis LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45719
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
August 24, 2019 Filing 42 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 41 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 1:19-cv-00011. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from District of Northern Ohio; MDL No. 2804. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers terminated. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/01/2019. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Hedblom Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Stay Case and denying as moot #11 Motion to Expedite. This case is STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether the case will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/16/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #21 Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by City of Bristol, Virginia re #9 , #10 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Stay . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Stay . filed by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #21 Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORAL ORDER granting #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian David Boone for Optum, Inc.,Bri OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORAL ORDER granting #19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kimberly Kisabeth Chemerinsky for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORAL ORDER granting #18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Herman Jordan for Optum, Inc.,OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 24 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #10 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 22 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Stay . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122716. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122040. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122030. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court City of Bristol, Virginia, CL19000324-00, consisting of Original State Court Complaint and State Court Civil Cover Sheet, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachments: #1 State Court Records, #2 State Court Records, #3 State Court Records, #4 State Court Records, #5 State Court Records, #6 State Court Records)(ejs) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Briefing Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/4/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Cook Hedblom on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Circuit Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Certificate of Service)(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re #1 Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Circuit Court, City of Bristol, Virginia. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/29/19. (ejs) Modified on 4/1/2019 - corrected signing judge to reflect Judge Dillon instead of Judge Sargent (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (ejs) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court City of Bristol, Virginia, case number CL 18-240. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00; Rec # 0423-3108845), filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ejs) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Bristol, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Bristol, Virginia
Represented By: Randall Cameron Eads
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?