Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Barr Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Insource, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, Express Scripts Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45766
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 1:19-cv-00544. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2019 Case electronically transferred to Ohio Northern. (aott) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 Certified Copy of Transfer Order Entered by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (aott, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of re #25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support Notice of Waiver of Hearing by Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc Hedblom Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 24, 2019 ***Motion Hearing terminated (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED that the hearing in the matter scheduled for Friday, May 31, 2019 at 10:00 am is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/24/2019. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay pending the final decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation as to transfer of this action to the Multidistrict Litigation pending in Northern District of Ohio, In Re: Nat'l Prescription Opiate Litig., No. 1: 17-md-02804 (Polster, J.). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/16/2019. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc re #10 MOTION to Stay Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Johan Conrod, Jr on behalf of Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors re #3 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date re #3 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #4 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC,, Specgx LLC. (Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc re #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lcre, ) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6623117.), filed by Mallinckrodt LLC,, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 8/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?