Board of County Commissioners for Dewey County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners for Dewey County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Physicians Total Care Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Allergan PLC, Keysource Medical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Perry Fine, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Anda Inc, McKesson Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., GCP Pharma LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., Walgreen Co., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc. and Lynn Webster
Case Number: 1:2019op45801
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00736. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 28, 2019 Filing 31 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Sharpe, G) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Docket Annotation: Case electronically sent to the Northern District of Ohio. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 30 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #21 Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and #23 Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/22/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan H Way on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Way, Evan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company . (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/19/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Payment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance (Cardinal), #5 Exhibit 5 - Appearance (Harvard), #6 Exhibit 6 - Appearance (McKesson), #7 Exhibit 7 - Motion and Special Appearance, #8 Exhibit 8 - Appearance (Quest), #9 Exhibit 9 - Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #10 Exhibit 10 - Order Granting Motion (Quest), #11 Exhibit 11 - Appearance (ABDC), #12 Exhibit 12 - Motion for Enlargement (CVS), #13 Exhibit 13 - Order Granting Motion (McKesson), #14 Exhibit 14 - Appearance (Anda), #15 Exhibit 15 - Motion for Enlargement (Anda), #16 Exhibit 16 - Order Granting Motion (CVS), #17 Exhibit 17 - Motion for Extension (MFs), #18 Exhibit 18 - Order Granting Motion (Anda), #19 Exhibit 19 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2976767. (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Dewey County, case number CJ-19-5 filed by Actavis Pharma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 St of OK - BOCC Dewey County - Actavis Pharma, Inc (S518736xAEC9B), #2 Exhibit 02 2019-08-13 Dewey County DOCKET, #3 Exhibit 03 2019-02-22 BOCDewey County Petition (S490909xAEC9B)., #4 Exhibit 04 2019-07-29 McKesson EOA, #5 Exhibit 05 2019-07-29 McKesson Dfts Motion for Enlargement, #6 Exhibit 06 2019-07-29 Cardinal EOA, #7 Exhibit 07 2019-07-29 Harvard Drug EOA, #8 Exhibit 08 2019-07-31 Quest EOA, #9 Exhibit 09 2019-07-31 Quest Motion for Enlargement, #10 Exhibit 10 2019-08-01 Amerisourcebergen EOA, #11 Exhibit 11 2019-08-01 Order Granting Quest Motion, #12 Exhibit 12 2019-08-02 Order Granting McKesson Dfts Motion, #13 Exhibit 13 2019-08-02 Distributors Motion for Enlargement, #14 Exhibit 14 2019-08-05 Anda EOA, #15 Exhibit 15 2019-08-05 Anda Motion for Enlargement, #16 Exhibit 16 2019-08-06 Order Granting Distributors Motion, #17 Exhibit 17 2019-08-07 Manf Dfts Motion for Enlargement, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 9/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners for Dewey County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Evan H. Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Joe Michael Hampton
Represented By: Amy Jo Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Evan H. Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Evan H. Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners for Dewey County
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Represented By: Harrison C. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?