Greensville County, VA v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Greensville County, VA
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Insource, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, OptumRX, Inc., Express Scripts Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, KVK-Tech Inc, CVS TN Distribution, Caremark, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Walgreen Co., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Purdue Pharma L P, Barr Laboratories, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Henry Schein Inc., SpecGX LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., CVS Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Actavis LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, AbbVie Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45848
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 3:19-cv-00459. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. (Case sent electronically by Clerk) (jsau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 MDL TRANSFER ORDER. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL No. 2804. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair. (jsau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
October 2, 2019 **TEXT ENTRY ONLY** MINUTE ORDER -- TO THE TRANSFEROR JUDGES/CLERKS OF THE ASSOCIATED CASES: This transmittal is for informational purposes only. No action is required at this time. A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states. An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court.You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/2/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, HI/1:19-cv-00377, MIE/2:19-cv-11681, MIE/2:19-cv-11685, MIE/2:19-cv-11687, MOE/4:19-cv-01654, MOE/4:19-cv-01722, MOE/4:19-cv-01911, NJ/1:19-cv-13684, NYE/2:19-cv-03800, NYN/1:19-cv-00789, NYN/8:19-cv-00782, NYW/6:19-cv-06490, OKN/4:19-cv-00380, TXS/4:19-cv-02181, TXS/4:19-cv-02256, TXS/4:19-cv-02504, VAE/1:19-cv-00778, VAE/2:19-cv-00331, VAE/3:19-cv-00457, VAE/3:19-cv-00458, VAE/3:19-cv-00459, VAE/3:19-cv-00513, VAW/3:19-cv-00037, VAW/4:19-cv-00029 (CMD) (jsau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by PURDUE PHARMA, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Massie, Wade) Modified docket text on 9/17/2019 (jsau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff Greensville County, Virginia, ("Plaintiff') and Defendants Actavis LLC and Express Scripts, Inc.'s (collectively, "Defendants") Status Updates. (ECF Nos. #11 , #12 ). Because both Plaintiff and Defendants represent that this matter will likely be transferred to the MDL, the Court STAYS this matter until October 21, 2019.The Parties SHALL file a status report explaining whether this matter will be transferred to MDL no later than October 14, 2019. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/21/19. (jsau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Actavis LLC, Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (MDL No. 2804 CTO 101), #2 Exhibit 2 (City of Alexandria Order re: Stay), #3 Exhibit 3 (MDL 2804 Transfer Order), #4 Exhibit 4 (List of 2nd Wave Virginia Opioid Cases), #5 Exhibit 5 (Compilation of Virginia Stay Orders))(Fee, James) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by Greensville County, VA. (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. ON THIS DAY came Plaintiff, by counsel, and moved for the withdrawal of attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers, Esquire from the case. Effective July 31, 2019, Lauren Tallent Rogers, Esquire is no longer associated with the law firm Kaufman & Canales, P.C. For good cause shown, it is hereby ADJUDGED, ORDERED and DECREED that Lauren Tallent Rogers, Esquire is permitted to withdraw from the case and is hereby deemed WITHDRAWN. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/1/19. (jsau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by Greensville County, VA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand with Memorandum in Support by Greensville County, VA. (Rogers, Lauren) Modified docket text on 7/1/2019 (jsau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that because Actavis represents that this matter is related to those cases in the MDL, the Court STAYS this matter for sixty (60) days. The Parties SHALL file a status report explaining whether this matter will be transferred to MDL no later than August 14, 2019. It is SO ORDERED. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/21/19. (jsau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis LLC. (Fee, James) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/21/2019) (jsau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6702362.), filed by Actavis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Circuit Court Records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement State Notice of Notice of Removal)(Fee, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/21/2019) (jsau, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/21/2019) (jsau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 10/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greensville County, VA v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greensville County, VA
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?