Ellis County v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ellis County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Abbott Laboratories, McKesson Corporation, Allergan Sales, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Dr Nicolas Padron, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., CVS Health, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Walgreen Co., Insys Manufacturing LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Richard Andrews, Cephalon Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation, Walmart Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Theodore E. Okechuku, Activis Inc, Actavis plc and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45860
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying Plaintiff's Motion for leave to File Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand to the JPML (Related Doc #39 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/8/20.(P,R)
April 3, 2020 Filing 39 Motion for leave to File Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand to the JPML filed by Plaintiff Ellis County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 - Original Petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Amd. Petition, #4 Exhibit 3 - Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 - Motion to Lift Stay, #6 Exhibit 5 - Motion to Vacate CTO 102, #7 Exhibit 6 - In re Texas Opioid Litigation Opinion, #8 Exhibit 7 - Ltr re Selective Remands, #9 Exhibit 8 - Johnson County Order Granting Remand, #10 Exhibit 9 - City of Boston Order on Motion to Remand, #11 Exhibit 10 - City of Worcester Order and Memorandum on Pl.'s Emergency Motion to Remand, #12 Exhibit 11 - Opp. to Mot. for Entry of Order Establishing Common Benefits Fund, #13 Exhibit 12 - Pl.'s Supp. Submission Re Continuing Litigation, #14 Proposed Order Suggestion of Remand)(McCarley, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 38 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-02256. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 3, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 37 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 36 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by CVS Health, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Simon, Joel) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Lift Stay, Or in The Alternative, Motion for Reconsideration of Stay Orders re: #32 MOTION to Lift Stay by Ellis County, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Lift Stay by Ellis County, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Remand, filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Simon, Joel) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL #12 MOTION to Remand. Case terminated on July 24, 2019 (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Simon, Joel) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Joel) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed.(Simon, Joel) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Correct.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Correct #7 Order by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., SpecGX LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Inc., filed.(Durfee, Laura) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Health, filed.(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., filed.(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., filed.(Patterson, Nancy) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allergan Finance, LLC, filed.(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC identifying Mallinckrodt plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(McCleary, Roger) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed.(Smyser, Craig) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, filed.(Mengis, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Ann Saucer on behalf of Ellis County, filed. (Saucer, S) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Remand re: #12 MOTION to Remand by Ellis County, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Arlington County v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Ellis County, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Reassignment. Parties notified, filed. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Sim Lake recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner for all further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition by CVS Health, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Ellis County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ellis County, case number 100921 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22662896) filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Simon, Joel) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis County v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Represented By: Stephen Michael Fernelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Represented By: Roger L. McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Nicolas Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Mark E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Represented By: Stephen Michael Fernelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Manufacturing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Laura Jane Durfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore E. Okechuku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activis Inc
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Nancy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis County
Represented By: S. Ann Saucer
Represented By: Bryan Fears
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: Matthew R. McCarley
Represented By: Matthew S. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?