City of Fredericksburg, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Fredericksburg, Virginia
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Insource, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, Express Scripts Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45898
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 3:19-cv-00457. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRANSFER ORDER re: pldg. (34 in HI/1:19-cv-00377, 5259 in MDL No. 2804), (38 in HI/1:19-cv-00377, 5282 in MDL No. 2804, 39 in MIE/2:19-cv-11681, 39 in MIE/2:19-cv-11685, 37 in MIE/2:19-cv-11687, 14 in MOE/4:19-cv-01654, 37 in MOE/4:19-cv-01722, 14 in MOE/4:19-cv-01911, 46 in NJ/1:19-cv-13684, 51 in NYE/2:19-cv-03800, 52 in NYN/1:19-cv-00789, 52 in NYN/8:19-cv-00782, 51 in NYW/6:19-cv-06490, 33 in OKN/4:19-cv-00380, 42 in TXS/4:19-cv-02181, 43 in TXS/4:19-cv-02256, 27 in TXS/4:19-cv-02504, 38 in VAE/1:19-cv-00778, 36 in VAE/2:19-cv-00331, 38 in VAE/3:19-cv-00457, 38 in VAE/3:19-cv-00458, 38 in VAE/3:19-cv-00459, 38 in VAE/3:19-cv-00513, 38 in VAW/3:19-cv-00037, 38 in VAW/4:19-cv-00029), ( 5187 in MDL No. 2804, 12 in TXS/4:19-cv-02504), ( 4955 in MDL No. 2804, 18 in VAE/3:19-cv-00457, 18 in VAE/3:19-cv-00458, 18 in VAE/3:19-cv-00459, 18 in VAW/3:19-cv-00037, 18 in VAW/4:19-cv-00029), ( 5133 in MDL No. 2804, 18 in NYN/1:19-cv-00789, 18 in NYN/8:19-cv-00782), ( 5062 in MDL No. 2804, 40 in TXS/4:19-cv-02256), ( 4970 in MDL No. 2804, 23 in MOE/4:19-cv-01722), ( 4811 in MDL No. 2804, 34 in MIE/2:19-cv-11681, 34 in MIE/2:19-cv-11685, 32 in MIE/2:19-cv-11687), ( 4867 in MDL No. 2804, 10 in VAE/1:19-cv-00778), ( 4979 in MDL No. 2804, 5 in MOE/4:19-cv-01911), ( 5061 in MDL No. 2804, 39 in TXS/4:19-cv-02181), ( 4937 in MDL No. 2804, 11 in VAE/2:19-cv-00331), ( 4876 in MDL No. 2804, 12 in NJ/1:19-cv-13684), ( 5131 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in OKN/4:19-cv-00380), ( 5064 in MDL No. 2804, 44 in NYE/2:19-cv-03800, 44 in NYW/6:19-cv-06490), ( 5211 in MDL No. 2804, 17 in VAE/3:19-cv-00513), ( 4709 in MDL No. 2804, 8 in MOE/4:19-cv-01654) Transferring 24 action(s) - MDL No. 2804, HI/1:19-cv-00377, MIE/2:19-cv-11681, MIE/2:19-cv-11685, MIE/2:19-cv-11687, MOE/4:19-cv-01654, MOE/4:19-cv-01722, MOE/4:19-cv-01911, NJ/1:19-cv-13684, NYE/2:19-cv-03800, NYN/1:19-cv-00789, NYN/8:19-cv-00782, NYW/6:19-cv-06490, OKN/4:19-cv-00380, TXS/4:19-cv-02181, TXS/4:19-cv-02256, TXS/4:19-cv-02504, VAE/1:19-cv-00778, VAE/2:19-cv-00331, VAE/3:19-cv-00457, VAE/3:19-cv-00458, VAE/3:19-cv-00459, VAE/3:19-cv-00513, VAW/3:19-cv-00037, VAW/4:19-cv-00029Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 10/2/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, HI/1:19-cv-00377, MIE/2:19-cv-11681, MIE/2:19-cv-11685, MIE/2:19-cv-11687, MOE/4:19-cv-01654, MOE/4:19-cv-01722, MOE/4:19-cv-01911, NJ/1:19-cv-13684, NYE/2:19-cv-03800, NYN/1:19-cv-00789, NYN/8:19-cv-00782, NYW/6:19-cv-06490, OKN/4:19-cv-00380, TXS/4:19-cv-02181, TXS/4:19-cv-02256, TXS/4:19-cv-02504, VAE/1:19-cv-00778, VAE/2:19-cv-00331, VAE/3:19-cv-00457, VAE/3:19-cv-00458, VAE/3:19-cv-00459, VAE/3:19-cv-00513, VAW/3:19-cv-00037, VAW/4:19-cv-00029 (CMD) Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION.(tjoh, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
October 2, 2019 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MINUTE ORDER -- TO THE TRANSFEROR JUDGES/CLERKS OF THE ASSOCIATED CASES: This transmittal is for informational purposes only. No action is required at this time. A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states...An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court. You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/2/2019.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, HI/1:19-cv-00377, MIE/2:19-cv-11681, MIE/2:19-cv-11685, MIE/2:19-cv-11687, MOE/4:19-cv-01654, MOE/4:19-cv-01722, MOE/4:19-cv-01911, NJ/1:19-cv-13684, NYE/2:19-cv-03800, NYN/1:19-cv-00789, NYN/8:19-cv-00782, NYW/6:19-cv-06490, OKN/4:19-cv-00380, TXS/4:19-cv-02181, TXS/4:19-cv-02256, TXS/4:19-cv-02504, VAE/1:19-cv-00778, VAE/2:19-cv-00331, VAE/3:19-cv-00457, VAE/3:19-cv-00458, VAE/3:19-cv-00459, VAE/3:19-cv-00513, VAW/3:19-cv-00037, VAW/4:19-cv-00029 (CMD) (tjoh, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. of Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Massie, Wade) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers terminated. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/01/2019. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by City of Fredericksburg, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion is GRANTED and this matter is STAYED pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's determination regarding transfer of this case. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 07/26/2019. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 23 Reply Memorandum in Support of Moving Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by City of Fredericksburg, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re #14 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Interest)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Stay filed by City of Fredericksburg, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by City of Fredericksburg, Virginia re #7 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Stay filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - All Stay Orders, #2 Exhibit 1 - Hilton Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Dillon Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Wave One Transfer Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - VA Wave 2 Cases, #6 Exhibit 5 - CTO-101, #7 Exhibit 6 - Rancheria, #8 Exhibit 7 - Kentucky, #9 Exhibit 8 - Diversity based removals, #10 Exhibit 9 - Federal Question, #11 Exhibit 10 - CAFA Removed Cases, #12 Exhibit 11 - La Courte Oreilles, #13 Exhibit 12 - Combined Orders, #14 Exhibit 13 - Seminole, #15 Exhibit 14 - Sargus Orders, #16 Exhibit 15 - Walker Co. Stay Order)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by City of Fredericksburg, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Mallinckrodt LLC,, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Cases)(Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Fredericksburg, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CTO-101, #2 Exhibit Hilton Order, #3 Exhibit Dillon Order, #4 Exhibit Transfer Order, #5 Exhibit Wave 2, #6 Exhibit Orders EDVA, #7 Exhibit VA Supreme Court Order)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Express Scripts Holding Company. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 CORRECTED NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc re #9 Notice of Appearance (Scott, Emily) Modified on 7/5/2019 (tjoh, ). [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (jsau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The undersigned judge RECUSES himself from presiding over this case because he has a conflict in the matter. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the Clerk reassign this case to another United States District Judge in accordance with the Clerk's standard assignment procedure. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 6/28/19. (jsau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand With Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by City of Fredericksburg, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.. (smej, ) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC,, Specgx LLC. (Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6699269), filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Sarah) [Transferred from vaed on 10/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Fredericksburg, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Fredericksburg, Virginia
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?