West Pittston, Pennsylvania v. The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: West Pittston, Pennsylvania
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Omnicare Inc., Purdue Holdings L.P., Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC, Stuart D. Baker, H.D. Smith LLC, Walgreen Co., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Bellco Drug Corp., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Walmart Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., John Doe Corporation, John Doe, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Actavis LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, David A. Sackler, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Rosebay Medical Company, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Caremark Repack, LLC, Rosebay Medical Company L.P., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, BR Holdings Associates L.P., CVS RX Services, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Value Drug Company, KVK-Tech Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Beacon Company, Cephalon Inc., BR Holdings Associates Inc., PLP Associates Holdings L.P., #1-10 John Does, Indivior Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Associated Pharmacies Inc, DEPOMED, INC., Sandoz Inc., Beverly Sackler, Allergan Sales, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Actavis Kadian LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Omnicare of New York, LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, H.D Smith Holdings, LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., H.D. Smith Holding Company and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45997
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 78 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Endo Generics Holding, Inc., filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania Related document(s) #77 . (Pearlman, Eva)
January 6, 2020 Filing 77 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Endo Generics Holding, Inc. on 12/23/2019, filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 76 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 75 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Omnicare Distribution Center LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 74 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. CVS RX Services, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 73 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Omnicare Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 72 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. CVS Indiana L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 71 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 70 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. CVS Pharmacy Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 69 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 68 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 67 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. DEPOMED, INC. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 66 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Allergan Sales, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 65 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Allergan U.S.A., Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 64 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Allergan Finance LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 63 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 62 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Rite Aid of Maryland waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 61 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 60 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Caremark Repack, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 59 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Omnicare of New York, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 58 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Sandoz Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 57 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 56 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 55 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 54 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 53 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 52 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 51 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 50 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 49 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 48 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 47 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 46 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt PLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 45 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 44 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Mylan Institutional, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 24, 2019 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 18, 2019 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 18, 2019 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Associated Pharmacies Inc waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 18, 2019 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 18, 2019 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 18, 2019 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 18, 2019 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Walgreen Co. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 18, 2019 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 13, 2019 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 13, 2019 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 9, 2019 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Indivior Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 9, 2019 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. H.D. Smith LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 9, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. H.D. Smith Holding Company waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 9, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. H.D Smith Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 9, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 9, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Anda Inc waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 9, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
December 9, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Bellco Drug Corp. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Value Drug Company waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Actavis Kadian LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Actavis Elizabeth LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Actavis Totowa LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Cardinal Health 110, LLC waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020 filed on behalf of West Pittston, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Def Actavis Laboratories, NY, Inc. n/k/a PL Developments Copiague, LLC filed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. (Pearlman, Eva)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Def Stuart D. Baker filed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. (Pearlman, Eva)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-01780. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-118) TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio per MDL 2804. (kpf) [Transferred from pamd on 11/12/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (kpf) [Transferred from pamd on 11/12/2019.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4898592), filed by West Pittston, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw) [Transferred from pamd on 11/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Pittston, Pennsylvania v. The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Holdings L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellco Drug Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebay Medical Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Repack, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebay Medical Company L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BR Holdings Associates L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BR Holdings Associates Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLP Associates Holdings L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: #1-10 John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Pharmacies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPOMED, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D Smith Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Pittston, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Bruce J. Phillips
Represented By: Louis T. Brindisi
Represented By: John Petrone
Represented By: Eva Brindisi Pearlman
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?