Howard County, Maryland v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Howard County, Maryland
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Walgreen Co., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Insys Therapeutics, John N. Kapoor, Rite Aid of Maryland, SpecGX LLC and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op46169
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 54 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 1:19-cv-02116. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 18, 2019 Filing 53 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER (MDL No. 2804) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, MDL Panel Chair. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 52 Summons Issued as to Mallinckrodt PLC. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 51 Correspondence re: Request for Re-issuance of Summons for International Defendant (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 50 QC NOTICE: #49 Correspondence filed by Howard County, Maryland was filed incorrectly. **Please refile correspondence signed by any counsel of record for plaintiff and attach the prepared summons. Sara D. Aguiniga of Motley Rice LLC is not a member of the bar of this Court. The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 49 (FILED IN ERROR) Correspondence re: Request for Re-issuance of Summons for International Defendant (Novak, Jonathan) Modified on 10/16/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING #38 Motion to Expedite Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/25/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Marginal ORDER APPROVING #46 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Howard County, Maryland. The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc. and Purdue Pharma L.P. terminated. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/16/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Howard County, Maryland (Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Support re #39 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MDL filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jenks OK Stay Order)(Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Remand filed by Howard County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Johnson County Order Granting Remand, #2 Exhibit B - City of Boston Order, #3 Exhibit C - City of Worcester Order)(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MDL filed by Howard County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Johnson County Order Granting Remand, #2 Exhibit B - City of Boston Order, #3 Exhibit C - City of Worcester Order, #4 Exhibit D - Order Regarding Remands, #5 Exhibit E - CMO 1, #6 Exhibit F - Case List)(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Hearing Order)(Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Marginal ORDER APPROVING #37 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Howard County, Maryland; Insys Therapeutics and John N Kapoor terminated. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/15/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit CTO, #3 Exhibit Statement of Interest of US, #4 Exhibit Withdrawal of Order)(Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MDL by McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Attachment CTO, #4 Attachment Wis. Stay Order, #5 Attachment Cal. Stay Order 1, #6 Attachment Ky. Stay Order, #7 Attachment Seminole Cty Stay Order, #8 Attachment Alameda CA Stay Order, #9 Attachment Portland ME Stay Order, #10 Attachment EDVA Stay Order, #11 Attachment WDVA Stay Order, #12 Attachment Cal. Stay Order 2, #13 Attachment Ill. Stay Order, #14 Attachment Fla. Deferral Order, #15 Attachment Delaware Stay Order, #16 Attachment Pawnee OK Stay Order, #17 Attachment Osage OK Stay Order)(Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand by Howard County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Howard County, Maryland (Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 36 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.(Mitchell, Michelle) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 35 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Ltd. for Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Luxton, Steven) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 34 Correspondence re: Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Dr. John N. Kapoor (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Johnson, Vernon) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 33 QC NOTICE: #29 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please refile Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement and add Corporate Parent and/or Affiliates when prompted. The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal [CORRECTED] (Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 31 (FILED IN ERROR - REFILED) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Collins, Kevin) Modified on 8/2/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by McKesson Corporation.(Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Luxton, Steven) Modified on 8/2/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 28 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC.(Trasatti, Marisa) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Anne Trasatti on behalf of Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC (Trasatti, Marisa) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation of Maryland for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc..(Prawde, Alyse) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Rite Aid Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation of Maryland for Rite Aid Corporation.(Prawde, Alyse) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand by Howard County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates L.P. for Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.; Other Affiliate Banela Corporation, Other Affiliate Linarite Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Perthlite Holdings LLC for Purdue Pharma Inc..(Smith, Patrick) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Walgreen Co. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co..(Graham, Andrew) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/26/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/26/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/26/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.5(a) Declaration in Support of Supplemental Notice of Removal by McKesson Corporation(Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by McKesson Corporation Affidavit of Service (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County) (Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by McKesson Corporation Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County) (Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by McKesson Corporation Entry of Appearance of Tim Maloney on behalf of Rite Aid of Maryland (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County) (Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by McKesson Corporation Entry of Appearance of Alyse Prawde on behalf of Rite Aid of Maryland (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County) (Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Inc. (McGeogh, Michelle) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Howard County, Maryland (Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Timothy) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Complaint,, by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGeogh, Michelle) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Complaint,, by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Prawde, Alyse) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/19/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence from Clerk to Counsel for John Kapoor re: Removal Notification Letter. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 18, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HOWARD COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cephalon, Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019; Endo Health Solutions Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/18/2019; Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/18/2019; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; McKesson Corporation served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/18/2019; Purdue Pharma Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/18/2019; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/18/2019; Rite Aid Corporation served on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; SpecGx LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/18/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/18/2019; Walgreen Co. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/18/2019.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John N Kapoor, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Walgreen Co. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John N Kapoor, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Walgreen Co., filed by Howard County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Docket Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation (Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin B Collins on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Howard County, Maryland, case number C-13-CV-19-000501. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8132651), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Attachment Complaint (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County), #6 Attachment Scheduling Order (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County), #7 Attachment Scheduling Order (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County), #8 Attachment Notice of Appearance (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County), #9 Attachment Writs of Summons (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County), #10 Attachment Affidavits of Service (filed in Circuit Court for Howard County))(Collins, Kevin) [Transferred from mdd on 12/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard County, Maryland v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Timothy McDevitt Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: David J Quigg
Represented By: Patrick C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Robert E Scott, Jr
Represented By: Marisa Anne Trasatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Kevin B. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By: David J Quigg
Represented By: Patrick C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Robert E Scott, Jr
Represented By: Marisa Anne Trasatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Timothy McDevitt Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Timothy McDevitt Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Andrew Jay Graham
Represented By: John Augustine Bourgeois
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: William Alden McDaniel, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Timothy McDevitt Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Michael Kevin Wiggins
Represented By: Michelle Renae Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Robert E Scott, Jr
Represented By: Marisa Anne Trasatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: David J Quigg
Represented By: Patrick C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard County, Maryland
Represented By: Mark W Schweitzer
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Novak
Represented By: Gary W Kuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?