Hardin County Fiscal Court et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Green County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court and Ohio County Fiscal Court
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Beverly Sackler, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Kathe Sackler, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Kroger Company, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., jonathan Sackler, Dr. Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, Rite Aid Corporation, DepoMed Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Actavis Pharma, Inc., H.D. Smith LLC, Actavis plc, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Rite Aid of Kentukcy, Inc, KVK Tech, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Walmart Inc., Matthew Bevin, Anda Inc, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Endo International plc, Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., Noramco, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Inc., David Sackler, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Mallinckrodt LLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Kentucky Pharmacy Board
Case Number: 1:2020op45063
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 155 Notice of Submission Motion to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Remand Briefing)(Grabhorn, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 154 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 3:19-cv-00068. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 5, 2020 Filing 153 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to Transfer Order filed in MDL Case Number 2804. (SCD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 152 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Attorney Update. Attorney Steven Travis Mayo for Andy Beshear in place of Matthew Bevin, added. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
January 29, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review per FRCP 25(d) - #151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE for Andy Beshear in place of Matthew Bevin. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andy Beshear in place of Matthew Bevin. (Farris, Marc) Modified text on 1/29/2020 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1. Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky's Motions to Dismiss [R. 108, Civ. No. 3:19-cv-00067-GFVT; R. 110, Civ. No. 3:19-cv-00068-GFVT] are GRANTED; 2. All claims in these matters against Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to further filing in federal court, with each party to bear itsown costs and attorney's fees;3. Defendant McKesson Corporation's Motions to Stay Proceedings [R. 106, Civ. No. 3:19-cv-00067-GFVT; R. 106, Civ. No. 3:19-cv-00068-GFVT] are GRANTED; and 4. Subsequent to Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky's dismissal, all proceedings in these cases, including the filing of responsive pleadings or motions, are STAYED pending the final decision of the JPML of whether to transfer the cases to the Northern District of Ohio for consolidation with other related cases. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/27/2020.(CBD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 149 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cabinet for Health and Family Services (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kleinert, Matthew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
January 13, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #90 MOTION for Joinder by Depomed Inc. in Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, #97 MOTION for Joinder in #76 Motion for Protective Order by McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
January 13, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #114 Notice to Attorney E. Frederick Straub - No Response (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER:the Motion to Withdraw [131 ] is GRANTED. The moving attorneys M. Stephen Pitt, S. Chad Meredith, Matthew F. Kuhn, and Brett R. Nolan are relieved of further responsibility in this action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/20/2019. (CBD)cc: COR Modified text on 1/13/2020 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #111 CORRECTED MOTION to Expedite Ruling on #110 by Commonwealth of Kentucky , #110 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Party Smith Drug Company, Inc. terminated. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: 1) All claims against Dft Smith Drug Company Inc are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE w each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. 2) Dft Smith Drug Company Inc's pending #16 Motion to Dismiss, #17 Motion and #63 Motion to Dismiss are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/16/2019. (SCD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER: 1) #142 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. 2) Christopher B. Essig is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/16/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, ECF Registration form to Christopher B. Essig [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER: 1) #143 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. 2) Scott M. Ahmad is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/16/2019. (SCD)cc: COR, ECF Registration form to Scott M. Ahmad [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Sarah B. Miller terminated. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - Sarah B Miller (Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 13, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #143 MOTION for Scott M. Ahmad to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #142 MOTION for Christopher B. Essig to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 13, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Christopher B. Essig, Scott M. Ahmad re #143 MOTION for Scott M. Ahmad to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #142 MOTION for Christopher B. Essig to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 143 MOTION for Scott M. Ahmad to Appear Pro Hac Vice by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4544029) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 142 MOTION for Christopher B. Essig to Appear Pro Hac Vice by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4543757) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #135 is GRANTED; and 2. Brien T. OConnor is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/11/2019. (CBD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #134 is GRANTED; and 2. Andrew OConnor is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form) (CBD)cc: COR, A. O'Connor via US Mail [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Sarah B. Miller by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admission Check)(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Christopher B. Essig by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admission Check)(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Scott M. Ahmad by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Admission Check)(SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #117 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.; #134 MOTION for Andrew O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #135 MOTION for Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Brien T. O'Connor re #135 MOTION for Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Andrew J. O'Connor re #134 MOTION for Andrew O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. filed by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-mail Communications)(White, Jordan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 135 MOTION for Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4541811) (Attachments: #1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 134 MOTION for Andrew O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4541802) (Attachments: #1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessalyn H. Zeigler on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Specgx, LLC (Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 10, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #131 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew Bevin , #106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 132 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Angelina Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Withdrawal of Order)(Michener, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 131 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorneys M. Stephen Pitt, S. Chad Meredith, Matthew F. Kuhn, and Brett R. Nolan by Matthew Bevin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pitt, M.) Modified on 12/10/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - MDL Order Re State Court Coordination, #2 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Stay)(Johnstone, C.) Modified on 12/5/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE by Commonwealth of Kentucky of Non-Consent to Removal (Johnstone, C.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 27, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #76 MOTION for Protective Order by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., CVA Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 128 REPLY to #101 , #76 in Support of Their Motion for Protective Order filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - West-Ward US Headquarters, #2 Exhibit B - West-Ward Acceptance & Signature, #3 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION for Protective Order by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., CVA Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. filed by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Clerk's Note: Notice to Attorney James E. Looper, Jr. #113 was sent in error and counsel may disregard this notice. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Beverly Sackler; MOTION to Continue by Beverly Sackler; MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Beverly Sackler, #16 MOTION to Dismiss; #17 MOTION TO HOLD DISCOVERY IN ABEYANCE; #63 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint; #65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and, MOTION for Stay of Discovery; #87 MOTION to Expedite. (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion re #110 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 124 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anda, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Anda, Inc... (Johnson, Paige) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 123 RESPONSE to Motion re #111 CORRECTED MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anda, Inc.. (Johnson, Paige) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION to Expedite by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion re #106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 25, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #86 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Donald J. Kelly for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Christopher B. Essig for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Scott M. Ahmad for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., added. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 118 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp... (White, Jordan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jordan) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Brien O'Connor by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Sheet)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Andrew O'Connor by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Sheet)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY E. Frederick Straub, Jr. by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Form)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY James Looper, Jr. by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Attorney Admission Packet, #3 PHV Info, #4 Data Form)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 21, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 111 CORRECTED MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Consideration of motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - MDL Order, #3 Proposed Order tendered Corrected Order Granting Expedited Consideration of Motion to Dismiss)(Johnstone, C.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 110 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - MDL Order, #3 Proposed Order Corrected tendered Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Johnstone, C.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 109 INCORRECTLY FILED - MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order tendered Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing)(Johnstone, C.) See #111 for the correct entry of this pleading. Modified on 11/20/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 108 INCORRECTLY FILED - MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnstone, C.) See #110 for the correct entry of this pleading. Modified on 11/20/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Kentucky Complaints Redline, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of S. Ahmad, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Interest of US, #5 Exhibit 5 - J. Polster Withdrawal of Order, #6 Proposed Order)(Michener, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order in Takoma Regional Hospital Case, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order in Belcher Case, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order in Lac Courte Case, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order in Robinson Rancheria Case, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order in Seminole County Case, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order in Alameda County Case, #8 Exhibit 8 - Order in Portland Case, #9 Exhibit 9 - Order in Alexandria Case, #10 Exhibit 10 - Order in Galax Case, #11 Exhibit 11 - Order in San Mateo Case, #12 Exhibit 12 - Order in Melrose Case, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order in Jacksonville Case, #14 Exhibit 14 - Order in Delaware County Case, #15 Exhibit 15 - Order in Pawnee County Case, #16 Exhibit 16 - Order in Osage County Case, #17 Exhibit 17 - Order in Noble County Case, #18 Exhibit 18 - Order in Jim Wells Case, #19 Proposed Order)(Michener, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Expedite by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Michener, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: 1. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #73 is GRANTED; and 2. Julia Kavanagh is ADMITTED pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/18/2019. (CBD)cc: COR, Julia Kavanagh w/ ECF Reg. Form via US Mail [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION for Extension of Time by H.D. Smith, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 102 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amerisource Bergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC.. (Simpson, W.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 101 RESPONSE to Motion re #76 MOTION for Protective Order by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., CVA Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc., #90 MOTION for Joinder by Depomed Inc. in Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, #97 MOTION for Joinder in #76 Motion for Protective Order by McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Joseph A. Wright for H.D. Smith, LLC, added. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Kennedy Simpson on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Simpson, W.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Second Amended Order)(Mauldin, Timothy) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 8, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #98 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 8, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Conor Brendan O'Croinin re #98 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4515171). (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Conor Brendan O'Croinin for CVS Health Corporation LLC, Conor Brendan O'Croinin for CVS Health Corporation LLC, added. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4515171) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for Joinder in #76 Motion for Protective Order by McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moad, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/1/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 96 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (McCauley, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (McCauley, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 31, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #94 NOTICE of MOOTNESS of PENDING MOTIONS re #17 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #63 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss, #16 MOTION to Dismiss (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 31, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #93 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO SMITH DRUG COMPANY, INC. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 31, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #81 MOTION for Extension of Time by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of MOOTNESS of PENDING MOTIONS re #17 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #63 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss , #16 MOTION to Dismiss by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified text on 10/31/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO SMITH DRUG COMPANY, INC. by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified text on 10/31/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 92 RESPONSE to Motion re #75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer by Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION for Extension of Time by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Joinder by Depomed Inc. in Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed as DE #76 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sadler, Kevin) Modified text/link on 10/30/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney M. Trent Spurlock for Actavis LLC, M. Trent Spurlock for Actavis Pharma, Inc., M. Trent Spurlock for Cephalon, Inc., M. Trent Spurlock for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., M. Trent Spurlock for Watson Laboratories, Inc., added. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 29, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #87 MOTION for Expedited Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion 86 to Remand (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 89 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc... (Johnson, Paige) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of M. Trent Spurlock and Paige N. Johnson by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Johnson, Paige) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for Expedited Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion #86 to Remand by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL County Cases, #2 Exhibit B - West-Ward Service, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 85 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt PLC. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mallinckrodt PLC. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 28, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #68 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint by KVK Tech, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #55 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures - No Response (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD; Error: The notice to a pro se filer was incorretly filed in this case; Entry by docket clerk; Correction: The entry has been deleted; No action is required by counsel. cc: COR (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney John M. Ghaeline for Commonwealth of Kentucky, Charles Wesley Rowland for Commonwealth of Kentucky, added. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Charles R. Hughes terminated. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Jeffrey Steven Moad for McKesson Corporation, added. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 25, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer by Commonwealth of Kentucky (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Fazal A. Shere on behalf of Kroger Company (Shere, Fazal) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Michener, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kuhn, Matthew) Modified text on 10/25/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cabinet for Health and Family Services. (Kleinert, Matthew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions, and, MOTION for Stay of Discovery filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for Protective Order by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., CVA Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stopher Ltr dated 10-7-2019, #2 Exhibit B - 10-07-2019 Email re Extensions, #3 Exhibit C - E.Gray Ltr dated 10-18-2019 re meet and confer, #4 Exhibit D - Email dated 10-23-2019 from Will Nefzger, #5 Proposed Order)(Gray, Elisabeth) Modified on 10/24/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Tendered order Extending Time to Answer)(Johnstone, C.) Modified on 10/24/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE by Commonwealth of Kentucky Special Limited Entry of Appearance (Johnstone, C.) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #73 MOTION for Julia Kavanaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Julia Kavanaugh re #73 MOTION for Julia Kavanaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Julia Kavanaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt, #4 Cover Letter)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 71 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Looper, Jr on behalf of Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Response to Requests for Admissions by Smith Drug Company, Inc. (Harrison, Lucas) Modified on 10/23/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Purcell, Carolyn) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDER ENJOINING THE CONTINUATION OF THIS PROCEEDING AS TO THE INDIVIDUAL FORMER DIRECTORS by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Amended Preliminary Injunction Order, #2 Exhibit 2 Excerpted copy of Exhibits to the Complaint for Injunctive)(Mauldin, Timothy) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC, Kroger Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Enlargement of Time for the Pharmacy Defendants to file Answers or Other Responsive Pleadings)(Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Motions and MOTION for Stay of Discovery by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fultz, Benjamin). Added MOTION to Stay on 10/18/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Bevin. (Kuhn, Matthew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 63 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Steven Doom Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - License, #4 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lucas) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Respond, #32 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KVK Tech, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KVK Tech, Inc. , #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint by KVK Tech, Inc. filed by Hardin County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time for the Former Directors to Answer or otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint, to Oppose Motion for a Temporary Injunction, and to Conduct the 26(F) Planning Conference by Ilene Sackler, et al filed by Hardin County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 60 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC.. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Gene L. Humphreys. #53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Mallinckrodt LLC and SpecGx LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint by KVK Tech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 57 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC.. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 56 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Health Corporation LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Health Corporation LLC.. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #48 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4491952), #49 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492074) (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to John A. McCauley, James K. O'Connor re #49 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492074), #48 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4491952). (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Charles Hughes. #47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Kroger Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 54 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc... (Ogrosky, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Gene L. Humphreys by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx, LLC. (Humphreys, Gene) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by John Kirk Ogrosky on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Ogrosky, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Lucas Harrison by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Richardson, Melissa) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Melissa Thompson \by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Harrison, Lucas) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for James K. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4492074) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, James) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for John A. McCauley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4491952) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(McCauley, John) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Charles R. Hughes by Kroger Company. (Hughes, Charles) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 46 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Noramco, Inc.. (Kingsley, Meredith) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 45 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Polczynski, Ryan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 44 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson. (Polczynski, Ryan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Meredith Jones Kingsley by Noramco, Inc.. (Kingsley, Meredith) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 42 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc.. (Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Louis Sparks on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Robert E. Stopher, Robert D. Bobrow by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (Stopher, Robert) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 39 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreen Co. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co... (Tremper, Frank) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Mark G. Arnzen and Frank K. Tremper by Walgreen Co.. (Tremper, Frank) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 37 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Other Affiliate Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Fultz, Benjamin) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Daniel E. Hancock by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hancock, Daniel) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Scott T. Dickens by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dickens, Scott) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Benjamin C. Fultz by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fultz, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Polczynski on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Polczynski, Ryan) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 32 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KVK Tech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 31 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Depomed, Inc. for Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Arlington, Scott D. Powers, Kevin M. Sadler on behalf of Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #29 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., #27 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., #28 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Kevin M. Sadler re #29 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Scott D. Powers re #28 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Scott D. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to David T. Arlington re #27 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Browning, Carol) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by McKesson Corporation. (Browning, Carol) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith Drug Company, Inc.. (Harrison, Lucas) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Lucas Harrison. #16 MOTION to Dismiss has been filed by Smith Drug Company, Inc without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Miller, Donald) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO HOLD DISCOVERY IN ABEYANCE by Smith Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Discovery Requests, #3 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lucas) Modified on 10/11/2019 (SCD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Smith Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Steven Doom Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - License, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lucas) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Mark S. Fenzel for Rite Aid Corporation, Mark S. Fenzel for Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., added. (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time for the Former Directors to Answer or otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint, to Oppose Motion for a Temporary Injunction, and to Conduct the 26(F) Planning Conference by Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mauldin, Timothy) Modified text on 10/10/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Mauldin on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler LefCourt. (Mauldin, Timothy) Modified text on 10/10/2019 (KJR). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid Corporation. (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc... (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Donald L. Miller, II. #9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by KVK Tech, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SCD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Miller, Donald) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Matthew Bevin, Cabinet for Health and Family Services, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Kentucky Pharmacy Board; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Hardin County Fiscal Court re #6 Amended Complaint Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Commonwealth, #2 Exhibit B - Matthew Bevin, #3 Exhibit C - Ky Pharmacy Board, #4 Exhibit D - CHFS)(Grabhorn, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court.(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 Proposed Stipulation extending Responsive Pleading Time (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #4 Stipulation, Corrected for Document Heading by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME to RESPOND to the COMPLAINT by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael) Modified event on 10/3/2019 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
September 30, 2019 CLERK'S NOTE re #1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel and S. Vrolijk notified via email with a copy of the complaint and docket sheet. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: 1. Clerk DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al as 3:17-cv-70 to Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 9/22/2017. (TDA) cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
September 29, 2019 MOTION for Temporary Injunction by plaintiffs. See state court record #1 Ex. D for pdf. (TDA) Modified filer on 9/30/2019 (TDA). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
September 29, 2019 MOTION to Continue Litigation Against Defendants with Pending Bankruptcy by plaintiffs. See state court record #1 Ex. C for pdf. (TDA) Modified filer on 9/30/2019 (TDA). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
September 29, 2019 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel by plaintiffs. See state court record #1 Ex. B for pdf. (TDA) Modified filer on 9/30/2019 (TDA). [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
September 29, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]
September 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-940. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4476585), filed by Beverly Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Motion to Continue Litigation, #4 Exhibit D - Motion for Temporary Injunction, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 2/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin County Fiscal Court et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: John Mohammad Ghaelian
Represented By: Charles Wesley Rowland
Represented By: C. David Johnstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Carolyn Purcell
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Moad
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Represented By: Charles R. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp
Represented By: Scott M. Ahmad
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: Christopher B. Essig
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Powers
Represented By: David Arlington
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jonathan Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DepoMed Inc
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabinet for Health and Family Services
Represented By: Johann Frederick Herklotz
Represented By: Matthew Harold Kleinert
Represented By: Catherine Elaine York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Scott T. Dickens
Represented By: Daniel E. Hancock
Represented By: Benjamin C. Fultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Kentukcy, Inc
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bevin
Represented By: Marc Griffin Farris
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Represented By: Steven Travis Mayo
Represented By: Brett Robert Nolan
Represented By: M. Stephen Pitt
Represented By: Matthew F. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Paige N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred's Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: James E. Looper, Jr.
Represented By: Julia M. Kavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith Jones Kingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Thompson Richardson
Represented By: Lucas Ryan Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Pharmacy Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meade County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breckinridge County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardin County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio County Fiscal Court
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?