Wyoming, Pennsylvania v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wyoming, Pennsylvania
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, John Doe, John Does, or John Doe Corporation, Being a Fictitious Name(s) Used to Designate a Person, Persons, Partnership, Sole Proprietorship, Corporation or other Entity Responsible for Developing,, Actavis Kadian LLC, Belko Drug Corp., CVS RX Services, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Actavis LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Omnicare Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., H.D. Smith LLC, CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Walgreen Co., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Caremark Repack, LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, CVS Indiana L.L.C., H.D Smith Holdings, LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Indivior Inc., Depomed Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Omnicare of New York, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC, SpecGX LLC, Associated Pharmacies Inc, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Value Drug Company, Walmart Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., H.D. Smith Holding Company, Sandoz Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2020op45087
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 74 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Sandoz Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 17, 2020 Filing 73 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Walgreen Co. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 17, 2020 Filing 72 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 14, 2020 Filing 71 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Value Drug Company waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 14, 2020 Filing 70 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 69 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 68 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. waiver sent on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 67 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 66 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 65 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 64 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 63 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Mylan Institutional, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 62 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 61 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Belko Drug Corp. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 60 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 59 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 58 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 57 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 56 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 55 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 54 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 53 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 52 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 51 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt PLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 13, 2020 Filing 50 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 49 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Associated Pharmacies Inc waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 48 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 47 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 46 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 45 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Indivior Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 44 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Caremark Repack, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Omnicare of New York, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Omnicare Distribution Center LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Omnicare Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. CVS RX Services, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. CVS Indiana L.L.C. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. CVS Pharmacy Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Allergan Sales, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Allergan Finance LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 10, 2020 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Allergan U.S.A., Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 1, 2020 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
April 1, 2020 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Rite Aid of Maryland waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 30, 2020 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. H.D. Smith LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 30, 2020 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. H.D Smith Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 30, 2020 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. H.D. Smith Holding Company waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Cardinal Health 110, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Anda Inc waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Actavis Totowa LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Actavis Kadian LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Actavis Elizabeth LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. Depomed Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020 filed on behalf of Wyoming, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case number 3:20-cv-00255. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE (CTO 138 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER) from MDL Panel, ORDERING case be transferred to Northern District of Ohio; (ep) [Transferred from pamd on 3/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: pdf of Complaint and Docket Sheet from case emailed to: panelmdl@jpml@uscourts.gov (ep) [Transferred from pamd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Associated Pharmacies, Inc., Belko Drug Corp., CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Caremark Repack, LLC., Cephalon, Inc., Depomed, Inc., Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Holding Company, H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, H.D. Smith, LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Indivior, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John Doe, John Does, or John Doe Corporation, Being a Fictitious Name(s) Used to Designate a Person, Persons, Partnership, Sole Proprietorship, Corporation or other Entity Responsible for Developing,, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC., Omnicare of New York, LLC, Omnicare, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Specgx, LLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Value Drug Company, Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep) [Transferred from pamd on 3/4/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Associated Pharmacies, Inc., Belko Drug Corp., CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Caremark Repack, LLC., Cephalon, Inc., Depomed, Inc., Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Holding Company, H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, H.D. Smith, LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Indivior, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John Doe, John Does, or John Doe Corporation, Being a Fictitious Name(s) Used to Designate a Person, Persons, Partnership, Sole Proprietorship, Corporation or other Entity Responsible for Developing,, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC., Omnicare of New York, LLC, Omnicare, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Specgx, LLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Value Drug Company, Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-5007957), filed by Wyoming, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep) [Transferred from pamd on 3/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyoming, Pennsylvania v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, John Does, or John Doe Corporation, Being a Fictitious Name(s) Used to Designate a Person, Persons, Partnership, Sole Proprietorship, Corporation or other Entity Responsible for Developing,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belko Drug Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Specialty Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Repack, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D Smith Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Pharmacies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Louis T. Brindisi
Represented By: John Petrone
Represented By: Eva Brindisi Pearlman
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Represented By: Samuel M. Sanguedolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?