Building Trades Benefit Plan v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, David A. Sackler, Rite Aid Corp., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Cephalon Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreen Co., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Wal Mart Stores, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Anda Inc, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Miami Luken, Inc. and Stuart D. Baker
Case Number: 1:2020op45239
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 Return of Service by personal service executed upon CVS Health Corporation on 10/12/2020, filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without prejudice as to Defendant Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Only filed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. (Kassan, Randi)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Anda Inc waiver sent on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Stuart D. Baker on 9/25/2020, filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC waiver sent on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan (Kassan, Randi)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Western. Case number 1:20-cv-00992. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by John W. Nichols,Clerk of the Panel on 8/14/2020. (MD) [Transferred from nywd on 8/24/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Allergan Plc f/k/a Actavis Plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Stuart D. Baker, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., HD Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Kroger Co., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Wal-Mart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (JD) [Transferred from nywd on 8/24/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD) [Transferred from nywd on 8/24/2020.]
August 3, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD) [Transferred from nywd on 8/24/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD) [Transferred from nywd on 8/24/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Proposed Summons against All Defendants, filed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from nywd on 8/24/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3921930, filed by Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from nywd on 8/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Building Trades Benefit Plan v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Tier Building Trades Benefit Plan
Represented By: Randi A. Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?