City of Dublin et al v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Dublin, The People of the State of Calfiornia and City of Murrieta
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Does 1-100, inclusive, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Walgreen Co., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Thrifty Payless Inc., Mylan Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Endo International plc, SpecGX LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Allergan Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Case Number: 1:2020op45255
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 31 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central. Case number 8:20-cv-01202. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2020 Filing 30 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2804, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Ohio and assigned to Honorable Honorable Dan A. Polster. Case transferred electronically. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT re Transfer Order filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING JPML HEARING. All pending hearing dates are VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court finds the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #17 is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 8/31/2020 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on this date and time. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from August 31, 2020 to the Later of the Court's Ruling on either (1) Motion to Stay (Docket No. #16 ) or (2) Motion to Remand (Docket No. #17 ) Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #19 filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Continuance of August 31, 2020 Scheduling Conference)(Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #17 filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James W. Spertus, #2 Exhibit 1)(Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Finalization of Its Conditional Transfer Order Transferring This Case #16 filed by Plaintiffs City of Dublin, City of Murrieta, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Boucher, Raymond) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 22 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Finalization of Its Conditional Transfer Order Transferring This Case #16 filed by Plaintiffs City of Dublin, City of Murrieta, The People of the State of California. (Boucher, Raymond) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: G-11 prepared in error. The proposed order is attached to the request for judicial notice at [18-7], RE #20 . (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (rrp) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #17 filed by Plaintiffs City of Dublin, City of Murrieta, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - El Monte Statement of Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Moratorium Order, #3 Exhibit C - Arlington Remand Order, #4 Exhibit D - Boston, #5 Exhibit E - WV Order, #6 Exhibit F - Order Withdrawing Remand Order, #7 Proposed Order)(Boucher, Raymond) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs City of Dublin, City of Murrieta, The People of the State of California. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Boucher, Raymond) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Finalization of Its Conditional Transfer Order Transferring This Case filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James W. Spertus in Support of Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804, dated July 15, 2020, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order, Lac Courte Oreilles Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians v. McKesson Corporation, et al., No. 3:18-cv-00286, dated May 25, 2018, #4 Exhibit 3 - Order, Robinson Rancheria v. McKesson Corporation, et al., No. 18-cv-02525-VC, dated July 16, 2018, #5 Exhibit 4 - Order, Commonwealth of Kentucky v. McKesson Corporation, No. 3:18-cv-00010, dated Apr. 12, 2018, #6 Exhibit 5 - List of over 110 cases removed on federal question grounds and transferred to the Opiate MDL, #7 Exhibit 6 - List of over 80 cases removed on Class Action Fairness Act grounds and stayed or transferred to the Opiate MDL, #8 Exhibit 7 - Order, City of Orlando, Florida v. CVS Health Corporation, et al., No. 6:20-cv-00736-RBD-EJK, dated June 15, 2020, #9 Exhibit 8 - Order, Takoma Regional Hospital, et al. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., et al., No. 2:19-cv-00157-HSM-CHS, dated Oct. 4, 2019, #10 Exhibit 9 - Orders, City of Henderson, Kentucky, et al. v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al., No. 3:19-cv-00067-GFVT, and Hardin County Fiscal Court, et al., v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al., No. 3:19-cv-00068, dated Jan. 27, 2020, #11 Exhibit 10 - Order, Dallas County Hospital District Parkland Memorial Hospital, et al. v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., 4:19-cv-04834, dated Jan. 28, 2020, #12 Proposed Order Granting Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Motion to Stay) (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #12 , Notice (Other) #14 , Order #13 served on July 16, 2020. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #12 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 , Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #8 via USPS served on July 13, 2020. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Notice (Other) #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on July 9, 2020. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02154-DOC-ADS. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01202-DOC-ADS. Signed by Judge David O. Carter. (rrp) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Notice in State Court filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Notice of Filing of Removal)(Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 7, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs City of Murrieta, City of Dublin, and The People of the State of California in Orange County Superior Court on 5/26/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on July 7, 2020. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT CVS Pharmacy, Inc., identifying Parent CVS Health Corporation and other potentially interested parties. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California for the County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01140064-CU-FR-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-27108521 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James W. Spertus, #2 Exhibit A - Superior Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Superior Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - Superior Court Summons, #5 Exhibit D - Superior Court Case Assignment, #6 Exhibit E - Superior Court Order dated June 23, 2020, #7 Exhibit F - Superior Court Clerk's Certificate of Service, #8 Exhibit G - Superior Court Docket as of July 7, 2020) (Attorney James W Spertus added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spertus, James) [Transferred from cacd on 10/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Dublin et al v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Christa L Culver
Represented By: James W Spertus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Dublin
Represented By: Maria L Weitz
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Shehnaz M Bhujwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of Calfiornia
Represented By: Maria L Weitz
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Shehnaz M Bhujwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Murrieta
Represented By: Maria L Weitz
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Shehnaz M Bhujwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?