Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc, McKesson Corporation, Dillon Companies, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Michael Babich, Actavis, Inc., Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Janssen Phamaceutica, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Walmart Stores East, LP, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Does 1-1000, Walmart Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Janssen Pharamaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, SpecGX LLC, John Kapoor, Cardinal Health 110, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, McQueary Brothers Drug Company, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020op45263
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 79 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas. Case number 6:20-cv-01262. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 14, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated.(sz) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 78 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 176). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/13/2020. (sz) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dillon Companies, LLC identifying The Kroger Co. as corporate parent . (Dower, Thomas) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 76 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas A. Dower on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLC. (Dower, Thomas) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 75 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC identifying Mallinckrodt plc as corporate parent . (Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation identifying Novartis AG as corporate parent . (Bernstein, Robert) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. identifying Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd as corporate parent (Nelson, Todd) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cephalon, Inc. identifying Cupric Holding Co., Inc.; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd as corporate parent (Nelson, Todd) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Orvet UK; Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V.; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd; Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A.; IVAX LLC as corporate parent (Nelson, Todd) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 69 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sean M. Sturdivan on behalf of Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Sturdivan, Sean) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. identifying Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC as corporate parent . (Waugh, Tyler) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 67 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Tyler Waugh on behalf of Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Waugh, Tyler) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 66 RETURN OF SERVICE of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc filed by Plaintiff Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners (White, Gary) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 65 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners upon Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (White, Gary) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying AmerisourceBergen Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation as corporate parent . (Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 63 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kara Trouslot Stubbs on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Walsh, Sean) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 61 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sean D. Walsh on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Walsh, Sean) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 60 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/29/2020 for Defendant John Kapoor to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/06/2020. (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 59 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/20/2020 for Defendants Allergan USA, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/06/2020. (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 58 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/20/2020 for Defendants Actavis LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/06/2020. (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 57 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/28/2020 for Defendants Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/06/2020. (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 56 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/20/2020 for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/06/2020. (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 55 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/20/2020 for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/06/2020. (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 54 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robert H. Bernstein on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Bernstein, Robert) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 53 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Todd A. Nelson on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Nelson, Todd) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 52 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC (Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 51 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mary Anne Mellow on behalf of Actavis, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary Anne) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Supplemental Notice of Removal by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(DeGraffenreid, Jeff) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 49 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreen Co. - trial to be held in Wichita. (DeGraffenreid, Jeff) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Co. identifying Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. as corporate parent . (DeGraffenreid, Jeff) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 47 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeff P. DeGraffenreid on behalf of Walgreen Co., Walgreen Co.. (DeGraffenreid, Jeff) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 46 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/20/2020 for Defendants Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/06/2020. (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 45 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/20/2020 for Defendant Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/05/2020. (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 43 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/20/2020 for Defendants McQueary Bros. Drug Company, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, 100, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/05/2020. (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, 100, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc. identifying Cardinal Health, Inc. as corporate parent . (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 41 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, 100, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO MYLAN DEFENDANTS. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/23/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Michael Babich served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/22/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- John Kapoor served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/22/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Johnson & Johnson served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/22/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cephalon, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/22/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Dillon Companies, LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- WalMart Stores East, LP dba Walmart Supercenter #372 served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- WalMart Stores East, LP served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Walmart Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Walgreen Co. dba Walgreens #7817 served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Walgreen Co. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cardinal Health 414, LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cardinal Health 200, LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cardinal Health 132, LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cardinal Health 122, LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cardinal Health 110, LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cardinal Health, 100, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cardinal Health, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- McQueary Bros. Drug Company, LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- McKesson Corporation served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.)(mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- AmerisourceBergen Corporation served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Actavis Pharma, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Actavis LLC served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Allergan USA, Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Ford County District Court on 9/21/2020.) (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson identifying None as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from 16th Judicial District, Ford County, Kansas. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson - trial to be held in Wichita. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 16th Judicial District, Ford County, Kansas, case number 2020-cv-000090 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5272443.), filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 10/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Phamaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharamaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McQueary Brothers Drug Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?