Marion Hospital Corporation et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Marion Hospital Corporation doing business as Heartland Regional Medical Center, Massac Memorial, LLC doing business as Massac Memorial Hospital, Galesburg Hospital Corporation doing business as Galesburg Cottage Hospital, Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Red Bud Regional Hospital, Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Metrosouth Medical Center, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. doing business as Crossroads Community Hospital, Anna Hospital Corporation doing business as Union County Hospital, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Vista Medical Center East and City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Gateway Regional Medical Center
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharamaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Actavis Totowa LLC, Henry Schein, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, DepoMed Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., AbbVie, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration, Actavis Mid-Atlantic LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Par Parmaceuticals Companies, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Anda Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Watson Pharma Inc. (DE), KVK-Tech, Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. (PA), Mallinckrodt, LLC (DE), CVS Pharmacy Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership II, Walmart, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East LP, The Kroger Co., Allergan USA, Inc. and H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Case Number: 1:2020op45266
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 43 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern. Case number 1:20-cv-04111. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2020 Filing 42 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio the electronic record. (lma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 41 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of Ohio. (lma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mallinckrodt, LLC (DE), SpecGx, LLC (DE) by Nicholas Martin Berg (Berg, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kroger Limited Partnership I (OH), Kroger Limited Partnership II (OH), The Kroger Co. (OH) by Jessica Gomez-Feie (Gomez-Feie, Jessica) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Kroger Co. (OH) by Kenneth M. Battle (Battle, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kroger Limited Partnership I (OH), Kroger Limited Partnership II (OH), The Kroger Co. (OH) by Winnefred A. Monu (Monu, Winnefred) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kroger Limited Partnership I (OH), Kroger Limited Partnership II (OH) by Kenneth M. Battle (Battle, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing previously set for 9/11/20 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) by Conor B. O'Croinin (O'Croinin, Conor) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant'sMotion to appear pro hac vice #30 is granted. Attorney Conor B. O'Croinin is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s motion to stay pending decision of whether to transfer this case to the opioids multidistrict litigation #19 is granted. Accordingly, the Court strikes the briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' motion to remand #12 . Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s motion for leave to file a reply in support of its motion to stay #31 is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/25/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) for leave to file reply in support of motion to stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Reply ISO Motion to Stay)(Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17349059. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions)(O'Croinin, Conor) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Hearing Session by Multidistrict Litigation Panel (bg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH) by Anita Maria Kidd (Kidd, Anita) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH) by Sarah E. Harmon (Harmon, Sarah) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smith Drug Company (SC) by John J. Haggerty (Haggerty, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. has filed a motion to stay these proceedings pending likely transfer to the opioids multidistrict litigation #19 , and Plaintiffs have filed a memorandum in opposition #24 . The Court will rule on the motion electronically. Additionally, Defendants who have been served in this matter separately filed an unopposed motion to confirm that the deadline to file their responsive pleadings is stayed, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1450. #23 . Based on the representations made by Defendants in the motion, the Court grants the motion #23 and declines to modify the state court's stay order at this time. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Anna Hospital Corporation, Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC, City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Galesburg Hospital Corporation, Marion Hospital Corporation, Massac Memorial, LLC, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc., Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC in Opposition to motion to stay #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Murphy, G.) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (NJ) The Served Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Confirm that Their Deadline to Respond to the Complaint is Stayed (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (NJ) by Sherry Ann Knutson including Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (NJ) by Brittany Lynne Weiss including Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Weiss, Brittany) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) in support of motion to stay #19 pending likely transfer to multidistrict litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17, #18 Exhibit Ex. 18)(Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) to stay pending likely transfer to multidistrict litigation (Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH) (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH) by Julie Fix Meyer EOA for Anita M. Kidd (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH) by Julie Fix Meyer EOA for Julie Fix Meyer (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH) by Julie Fix Meyer CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 014 (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH) by Julie Fix Meyer EOA for Sarah Harmon (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Anna Hospital Corporation, Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC, City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Galesburg Hospital Corporation, Marion Hospital Corporation, Massac Memorial, LLC, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc., Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC in support of motion to remand, #10 (Murphy, G.) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 9/11/20 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiffs have filed a motion to remand this case (Dkt. #10 ) and a motion for leave to file an oversized supporting memorandum (Dkt. #11 ). Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an oversized supporting memorandum is granted. The Court sets the following briefing schedule: Defendants' response shall be filed on or before 8/25/20, and Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed on or before 9/8/20.Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiffs Anna Hospital Corporation, Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC, City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Galesburg Hospital Corporation, Marion Hospital Corporation, Massac Memorial, LLC, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc., Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Murphy, G.) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs Anna Hospital Corporation, Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC, City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Galesburg Hospital Corporation, Marion Hospital Corporation, Massac Memorial, LLC, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc., Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC to remand (Murphy, G.) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anna Hospital Corporation, Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC, City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Galesburg Hospital Corporation, Marion Hospital Corporation, Massac Memorial, LLC, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc., Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC by G. Patrick Murphy (Murphy, G.) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Filing of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in the Circuit Court of Cook County (Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (lma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) by Sky Anne Emison (Emison, Sky) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) by Andrea Verney (Verney, Andrea) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) (Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 13, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) by Steven Todd Whitmer (Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020-L-006091) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17210771. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Abbott Supplemental Consent)(Whitmer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 10/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marion Hospital Corporation et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharamaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brittany Lynne Weiss
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DepoMed Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Sarah E. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid-Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Winnefred A. Monu
Represented By: Jessica Gomez-Feie
Represented By: Kenneth M. Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Parmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Brittany Lynne Weiss
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc. (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Martin Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. (PA)
Represented By: Brittany Lynne Weiss
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC (DE)
Represented By: Nicholas Martin Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Sky Anne Emison
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Steven T. Whitmer
Represented By: Andrea Verney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Winnefred A. Monu
Represented By: Jessica Gomez-Feie
Represented By: Kenneth M. Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brittany Lynne Weiss
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Winnefred A. Monu
Represented By: Jessica Gomez-Feie
Represented By: Kenneth M. Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Hospital Corporation doing business as Heartland Regional Medical Center
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massac Memorial, LLC doing business as Massac Memorial Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galesburg Hospital Corporation doing business as Galesburg Cottage Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Red Bud Regional Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Metrosouth Medical Center
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. doing business as Crossroads Community Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Hospital Corporation doing business as Union County Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Vista Medical Center East
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Gateway Regional Medical Center
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?