Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital and T.J. Samson Community Hospital
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc., H.D. Smith LLC, Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Smith Drug Company, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Wal-Mart Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., KVK-Tech Inc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Practice Fusion Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Walgreen Co., Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Rite Aid of Kentukcy, Inc, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Tasmanian Alkaloids Pty LTD, Allergan Sales LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Noramco, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership II, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., The Kroger Co., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2020op45293
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 36 Joint Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Defendant Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc. filed by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Community Hospital. (Barrett, John)
January 13, 2021 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
January 13, 2021 Filing 34 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas)
December 28, 2020 Filing 33 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 7:20-cv-00102. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 16, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to Transfer Order filed in MDL Case Number 2804. (RCB)cc: COR & NDOH [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 31 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Dft Wal-Mart Inc.'s Motion to Stay #10 is GRANTED; 2. All proceedings in this case, including filing of responsive pleadings or motions, are STAYED pending final decision of JPML of whether to transfer cases to NDOH for consolidation with other related cases; and 3. Dfts shall provide a written status report within 30 days of entrance of this Order regarding status of decision of JPML as to whether to transfer case to NDOH. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 12/1/2020. (RCB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
October 13, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #29 Notice of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Mallinckrodt, LLC, Specgx LLC Notice of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 28 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt, LLC, Specgx LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt, LLC, Specgx LLC.. (Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: 1. Dft's Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice #23 ; R. #24 ; R. #25 ; R. #26 are GRANTED; 2. Jackson R. Sharman is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Dfts Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc. and Practice Fusion, Inc.; and 3. Lana A. Olson is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Dfts Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc. and Practice Fusion, Inc.; and 4. Lee M. Hollis is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Dfts Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc. and Practice Fusion, Inc.; and 5. Jackson E. Knouse is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Dfts Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc. and Practice Fusion, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/25/2020. (RCB)cc: COR, Sharman, Olson, Hollis, Knouse w/Registration form via U.S. mail [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 22, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Lana A. Olson re #24 MOTION for Lana A. Olson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4780038). (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 22, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jackson R. Sharman, III re #23 MOTION for Jackson R. Sharman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4779989). (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 22, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Lee M. Hollis re #25 MOTION for Lee M. Hollis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4780058). (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 22, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #23 MOTION for Jackson R. Sharman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc., #24 MOTION for Lana A. Olson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc., #25 MOTION for Lee M. Hollis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc., #26 MOTION for Jackson E. Knouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc., (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 22, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jackson E. Knouse re #26 MOTION for Jackson E. Knouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4780061). (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Jackson E. Knouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4780061) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jackson Affidavit, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stansbury, Casey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Lee M. Hollis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4780058) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hollis Affidavit, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stansbury, Casey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Lana A. Olson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4780038) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Olson Affidavit, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stansbury, Casey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Jackson R. Sharman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4779989) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sharman Affidavit, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stansbury, Casey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 1. The parties' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #21 is GRANTED; 2. Dfts Allscripts Health Care Solutions, Inc.'s and Practice Fusion, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plfs' Complaint is EXTENDED 45 days from the later of (1) a decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer to MDL No 2804, or (2) entry of an order from this Court ruling on Plf's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 9/9/2020. (RCB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 9, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stansbury, Casey) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (RCB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 4, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - Marion Hospital)(Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Caitlin McQueen re #19 Notice of Appearance; Signature on document and filer do not match; Entry by attorney; the name of the Filing User under whose login and password the document is filed must be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey C. Stansbury, Caitlin L. McQueen on behalf of Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc. (McQueen, Caitlin) Modified text on 9/2/2020 (RCB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Joseph Kramer re #18 REPLY; Error: a link was created to the Response instead of the Motion; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion, thereby placing the reply on the Judge's motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is Reply to Response to Motion. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 28, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #8 MOTION to Remand by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Commun (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to #8 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand filed by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Community Hospital. (Kramer, Joseph) Modified link on 8/28/2020 (RCB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: 1. The partie' Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time #16 is GRANTED; 2. Dft Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED 45 days from the later of (1) a decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer to MDL No 2804, In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, or (2) entry of an order from this Court ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/26/2020. (RCB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: 1. Dft H.D. Smith's Motion to Join Motion #7 is GRANTED; 2. Dfts Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC and Amneal Pharaceuticals of New York, LLC's Motion to Join #11 is GRANTED; 3. Wal-Mart's Motion for Extension of Time #5 is GRANTED; and 4. The deadline for properly served dfts to answer or otherwise respond to Plf's complaint is EXTENDED to 45 days from the later of (1) a decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer of this case to the Opiate MDL, or (2) entry of an order from this Court ruling on Plf's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 8/25/2020. (RCB)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 21, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #14 Notice re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Commun filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - City of Orlando, #2 Exhibit J - City of Fairfax)(Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Community Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MDL Order regarding remands, #2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Order on Remand, #3 Exhibit 3- Remand Order County of Dallas, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Denying Motion to Stay - Weber County UT, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Denying Motion to Stay - Unitah County UT, #6 Exhibit 6 - Remand Order County of Greenville, #7 Exhibit 7 - Remand Order County of Spartanburg, #8 Exhibit 8 - Order Denying Motion to Stay - Brooke Co. Comm., #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Denying Motion to Stay - City of Worcester, #10 Exhibit 10 - Remand Order - County of Van Zandt, #11 Exhibit 11 - Remand Order - County of Lexington, #12 Exhibit 12 - Transcript of 12.13.17 Teleconference re Remands)(Kramer, Joseph) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 14, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #11 MOTION for Joinder #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Joinder #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Thomas) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 10, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Questions, #2 Exhibit B - Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit C - Order, #4 Exhibit D - Memorandum & Order, #5 Exhibit E - Noble City Order, #6 Exhibit F - Jim Hogg Order, #7 Exhibit G - Takoma Order, #8 Exhibit H - Seminole County Order, #9 Proposed Order)(Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 5, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP; #7 MOTION for Joinder by H.D. Smith, LLC (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Community Hospital (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Joseph) Modified text on 7/30/2020 (RCB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 30, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #8 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand by Flaget Healthcare, Inc., Hardin Memorial Hospital, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., Jackson Hospital Corporation, Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC, Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., T.J. Samson Community Hospital (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by H.D. Smith, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.) Modified text on 7/30/2020 (RCB). [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc... (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC.. (Simpson, W.) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Clerk's Note re #1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel & S. Vrolijk notified by e-mail with a copy of notice of removal, complaint & docket sheet. (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Conflict Check run. (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00151, filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4730656) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Pleading, #4 Exhibit D - Stay Order, #5 Exhibit E - Transfer Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB) [Transferred from kyed on 12/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Evelina Norwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Erin Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Andrew L. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: David Arlington
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Represented By: Scott D. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practice Fusion Inc.
Represented By: Jackson R. Sharman, III
Represented By: Caitlin McQueen Tubbesing
Represented By: Casey C. Stansbury
Represented By: Lee M. Hollis
Represented By: Jackson E. Knouse
Represented By: Lana A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jackson R. Sharman, III
Represented By: Casey C. Stansbury
Represented By: Lee M. Hollis
Represented By: Caitlin McQueen Tubbesing
Represented By: Jackson E. Knouse
Represented By: Lana A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Erin Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Andrew L. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Kentukcy, Inc
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Elisa P. McEnroe
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Coleen M. Meehan
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasmanian Alkaloids Pty LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Evelina Norwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Represented By: Gabriele Wohl
Represented By: Jennifer B. Hagedorn
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Evelina Norwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Represented By: Brandan J. Montminy
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Represented By: Catherine Stivers Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny A. Hergenrother
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Represented By: Cari K. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Represented By: Gabriele Wohl
Represented By: Jennifer B. Hagedorn
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Fazal A. Shere
Represented By: Gabriele Wohl
Represented By: Jennifer B. Hagedorn
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Evelina Norwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Ana Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Joseph Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospital of Louisa, Inc.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paintsville Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flaget Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardin Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.J. Samson Community Hospital
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?