Altus City of v. Cephalon Inc et al
Plaintiff: Altus City of
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Walgreen Co., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Activas PLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda Inc, Harvard Drug Company, LLC, McKesson Corp., GCP Pharma LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co LLC and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021op45046
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 42 Notice of Withdrawal of Susan E. Huntsman filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration. (Huntsman, Susan)
April 1, 2021 Filing 41 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:20-cv-01180. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 31, 2021 Filing 40 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Ohio Northern for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (knt) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Altus City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 130, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 232)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/20/2021. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (to file Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy) Modified on 1/20/2021 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Expedite of Motion to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 32 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - CTO 177, #8 Exhibit 8 - WI Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - CA Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - JPML 5737, #17 Exhibit 17 - JPML 6100, #18 Exhibit 18 - JPML 6538, #19 Exhibit 19 - Transfer Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - JPML 7403, #21 Exhibit 21 - JPML 7543, #22 Exhibit 22 - JPML 7573, #23 Exhibit 23 - JPML 7713, #24 Exhibit 24 - JPML 8583, #25 Exhibit 25 - Harmon Transfer Order, #26 Exhibit 26 - Alameda CA Stay Order, #27 Exhibit 27 - City of Portland v. Purdue, #28 Exhibit 28 - EDVA Stay Order, #29 Exhibit 29 - WDVA Stay Order, #30 Exhibit 30 - CA Stay Order, #31 Exhibit 31 - IL Stay Order, #32 Exhibit 32 - FL Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Expedite by Altus City of. (Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Remand by Altus City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Elliot P Anderson on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Anderson, Elliot) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Defendant, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/3/2020. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/2/2020. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/30/2020. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan Limited f/k/a Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/30/2020. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Notice of Removal by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 27, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Corrected) (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Notice of Removal by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet - Jackson Co, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Summons-Anda Pharma, #4 Exhibit Summons-Amerisourcebergen, #5 Exhibit Summons-Actavis LLC, #6 Exhibit Summons-Actavis Pharma Inc, #7 Exhibit Summons-Actavis PLC, #8 Exhibit Summons-Allergan PLC, #9 Exhibit Summons-Anda Inc, #10 Exhibit Summons-Cardinal, #11 Exhibit Summons-Cephalon, #12 Exhibit Summons-CVS Health Corp, #13 Exhibit Summons-Pharmacy, #14 Exhibit Summons-Endo Health Inc, #15 Exhibit Summons-Endo Pharma Inc, #16 Exhibit Summons-Harvard, #17 Exhibit Summons-J&J, #18 Exhibit Summons-Janssen Pharma Inc, #19 Exhibit Summons-Janssen Pharma Inc, #20 Exhibit Summons-Keysource, #21 Exhibit Summons-McKesson, #22 Exhibit Summons-Morris & Dickson, #23 Exhibit Summons-OK CVS, #24 Exhibit Summons-Ortho-McNeil, #25 Exhibit Summons-Quest, #26 Exhibit Summons-Teva Pharma USA, #27 Exhibit Summons-Walgreens Boots, #28 Exhibit Summons-Watson Labs Inc, #29 Exhibit Summons-Watson Pharma Inc, #30 Exhibit Summons-Watson Pharma, #31 Exhibit Order Granting Mot for Ext, #32 Exhibit Appearance-McKesson, #33 Exhibit Appearance-Quest, #34 Exhibit Appearance-Harvard, #35 Exhibit Appearance-McKesson, #36 Exhibit Appearance-Cardinal, #37 Exhibit Mot for Extension, #38 Exhibit Order Granting Mot for Ext, #39 Exhibit Motion-Special Appearance, #40 Exhibit Mot for Extension, #41 Exhibit Order Granting Mot for Extension, #42 Exhibit Order Granting Mot for Extension, #43 Exhibit Special Appearance and Mot for Extension, #44 Exhibit LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 11/25/2020 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 24, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3400928. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Jackson County, case number CJ-20-91 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Service of Process Documents, #2 Exhibit 2- State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3- Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- Summons to Cephalon Inc, #5 Exhibit 5- Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #6 Exhibit 6- Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #7 Exhibit 7- Summons to Johnson and Johnson, #8 Exhibit 8- Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #9 Exhibit 9- Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #10 Exhibit 10- Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #11 Exhibit 11- Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #12 Exhibit 12- Summons to Allergan PLC, #13 Exhibit 13- Summons to Actavis PLC, #14 Exhibit 14- Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #15 Exhibit 15- Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #16 Exhibit 16- Summons to Actavis Pharma Inc, #17 Exhibit 17- Summons to Watson Pharma Inc, #18 Exhibit 18- Summons to Actavis LLC, #19 Exhibit 19- Summons to McKesson Corp, #20 Exhibit 20- Summons to Cardinal Health Inc, #21 Exhibit 21- Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #22 Exhibit 22- Summons to Anda Inc, #23 Exhibit 23- Summons to Keysource Medical Inc, #24 Exhibit 24- Summons to Morris and Dickson Co LLC, #25 Exhibit 25- Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #26 Exhibit 26- Summons to The Harvard Drug Group LLC, #27 Exhibit 27- Summons to CVS Health Corporation, #28 Exhibit 28- Summons to CVS Pharmacy Inc, #29 Exhibit 29- Summons to Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #30 Exhibit 30- Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance dba Walgreen Co, #31 Exhibit 31- Summons to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, #32 Exhibit 32- Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Quest, #33 Exhibit 33- Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Quest, #34 Exhibit 34- Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson, #35 Exhibit 35- Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by McKesson et al, #36 Exhibit 36- Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal, #37 Exhibit 37- Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Harvar, #38 Exhibit 38- Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by McKesson et al, #39 Exhibit 39- Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Quest, #40 Exhibit 40 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by CVS et al, #41 Exhibit 41- Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by CVS et al, #42 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) [Transferred from okwd on 4/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altus City of v. Cephalon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Represented By: Caleb S McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Represented By: Elliott P. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Represented By: Caleb S McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Amy D. White
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D. White
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activas PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Company, LLC
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Amy D. White
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altus City of
Represented By: Todd A. Court
Represented By: Tony G. Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?