Carpenter v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Holly Janelle Carpenter
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Anda Inc, Henry Schein Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.), Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (n/k/a Actavis, Inc.), Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.), Allergan PLC (fka Actavis PLC), Allergan Finance, LLC (fka Actavis, Inc. fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Indivior, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Indiana, LLC, The Kroger Co., Kroger Limited Partnership II, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (dba Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.), Rite Aid Corp., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walgreens Eastern Co., Walgreen Co., Wal-Mart Inc. (fka Walmart Stores, Inc.), Costco Wholesale Corporation and Doe 1-100, being those persons, firms, corporations, agents, servants and/or employees who authorized, ordered and/or committed the acts described in this Complaint and whose names when ascertained wi
Case Number: 1:2021op45131
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
February 11, 2022 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
February 11, 2022 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
February 11, 2022 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
February 10, 2022 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (dba Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Henry Schein Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
January 13, 2022 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Carpenter. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Holly Carpenter (Onder, James)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Allergan Finance, LLC (fka Actavis, Inc. fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Allergan PLC (fka Actavis PLC), Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,, Anda Inc, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.), CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Doe 1-100, being those persons, firms, corporations, agents, servants and/or employees who authorized, ordered and/or committed the acts described in this Complaint and whose names when ascertained wi, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Henry Schein Inc., Indivior, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Kroger Limited Partnership II, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.), Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (dba Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.), TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., The Kroger Co., Wal-Mart Inc. (fka Walmart Stores, Inc.), Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walgreens Eastern Co., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (n/k/a Actavis, Inc.). Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11185633. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-dap. Filed by Holly Carpenter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Onder, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Janelle Carpenter
Represented By: James Onder
Represented By: James G. Onder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (n/k/a Actavis, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC (fka Actavis PLC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC (fka Actavis, Inc. fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (dba Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc. (fka Walmart Stores, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1-100, being those persons, firms, corporations, agents, servants and/or employees who authorized, ordered and/or committed the acts described in this Complaint and whose names when ascertained wi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?