Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Defendant: Nathan Giles, Dale Smith and Janet Smith
Case Number: 3:2019cv02035
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney James T. Ball for Nathan Giles. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge James G. Carr on 11/1/19.(C,D)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney James T. Ball to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 34660011592, filed by Defendant Nathan Giles. Attachment(s) #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Cover Letter) (K,AR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #3 Affidavit Signed by James Ball) (B,R).
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants Dale Smith and Janet Smith's Answer to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company For Breach of Contract and Bad Faith of Janet Smith, Dale Smith filed by Janet Smith, Dale Smith. (Pietrykowski, Sr., William)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. Nathan Giles waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019 filed on behalf of Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company (Becker, John)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. Janet Smith waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019 filed on behalf of Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company (Becker, John)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. Dale Smith waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019 filed on behalf of Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company (Becker, John)
September 4, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Nathan Giles, Dale Smith, Janet Smith. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L)
September 4, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
September 4, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (M,L)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9505233. Filed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #6 Exhibit 2 - Insurance Policy, #7 Exhibit 3 - 2019.01.16 Correspondence to Mr Smith, #8 Exhibit 4 - 2019.02.04 Correspondence from Mr. Ball, #9 Exhibit 5 - 2019.02.13 Correspondence to Mr Smith, #10 Exhibit 6 - 2019.02.13 Correspondence to Mr Ball, #11 Exhibit 7 - 2019.02.28 Email from Mr Pietrykowski, #12 Exhibit 8 - 2019.04.19 Correspondence to Mr Smith, #13 Exhibit 9 - 2019.06.19 Correspondence from Mr Ball, #14 Exhibit 10 - 2019.06.20 Email from Mr Pietrykowski) (Becker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Giles
Represented By: James T. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Smith
Represented By: William F. Pietrykowski, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Smith
Represented By: William F. Pietrykowski, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Represented By: John W. Becker
Represented By: John M. Heffernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?