Rico v. Lordstown Motors Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Rico, Robert Palumbo, Jesse Brury, Sulayman Zuod and Raymond Romano
Defendant: Stephen S. Burns, Rich Schmidt, Julio Rodriguez, Lordstown Motors Corp., Michael Fabian, David T. Hamamoto, Shane Brown, Darren Post, Andrew C. Richardson, Steven R. Hash, Judith A. Hannaway, Caimin Flannery and Lordstown EV Corporation
Petitioner: Joshua Betof, Globestar Systems Inc., FNY Managed Accounts LLC, Ethan Fingerer, Kenneth Davenport, Kin San Chan, Dari Tehrani, Ashith Pabbathi, Randy Slipher, Robert Miller, Daniel Tavares, Mario Guerrero, Steven Terry, Simha & Pnina Cohen, George Troicky, M.R.S. Leasing Corporation LTD, Carole Cooper, Kevin Levent, Eskandar Tehrani, John H Jenkins, Mohammed Chowdhury and Gurpreet Singh
Case Number: 4:2021cv00616
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Memorandum of Opinion and Order: Plaintiffs' Motion for a Partial Lifting of the PSLRA Discovery Stay Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3)(B) is DENIED. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/30/21. (LC,S) re #63
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Shane Brown, Shane Brown, Stephen Burns, Caimin Flannery, David Hamamoto, Lordstown EV Corporation, Lordstown Motors Corp., Darren Post, Julio Rodriguez, Rich Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration of Douglas W. Greene in Support, #5 Exhibit 1 - (excerpted) - DPHC Proxy Materials, #6 Exhibit 2 - (excerpted) - Proxy Prelim 14a, #7 Exhibit 3 - Lordstown's Form 8-K, #8 Exhibit 4 - Lordstowns Form 8-K, #9 Exhibit 5 - Lordstown's Press Release, #10 Exhibit 6 - (excerpted) Lordstowns 2020 Form 10-K, #11 Exhibit 7 - Transcript, #12 Exhibit 8 - Lordstowns Form 8-K, #13 Exhibit 9 - (excerpted) DPHC's Schedule 14A, #14 Exhibit 10 - Press Release 10/23/20, #15 Exhibit 11 - Lordstowns Form 8-K, #16 Exhibit 12 - Lordstowns Form 8-K, #17 Exhibit 13 - Press Release 1/11/21, #18 Exhibit 14 - Press Release 1/28/21, #19 Exhibit 15 - Lordstowns Form 8-K, #20 Exhibit 16 - (excerpted) Lordstowns Form S-1, #21 Exhibit 17 - Form 4, #22 Exhibit 18 - Press Release 6/14/21, #23 Exhibit 19 - Yahoo!Finances full stock price history, #24 Certificate of Service)(Greene, Douglas)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Reply in support of #63 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Partial Lifting of the PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by George Troicky. (Villegas, Carol)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Agreed Motion to Extend Page Limits is granted. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/3/21. (LC,S) (Related Doc #68 )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Consent Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Shane Brown, Shane Brown, Stephen Burns, Caimin Flannery, David Hamamoto, Lordstown EV Corporation, Lordstown Motors Corp., Darren Post, Julio Rodriguez, Rich Schmidt. (Shively, Douglas)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Lead Plaintiff George Troicky's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Brian Schall is granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #64 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/1/21.(LC,S)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order and Joint Stipulation Regarding Service. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/29/21. (LC,S) re #65
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Opposition to #63 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Partial Lifting of the PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas L. Shively, #2 Exhibit A: Karma Action Defendants' Opposition Brief, #3 Exhibit B: Karma Action Order)(Shively, Douglas)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Joint Proposed Stipulation Regarding Service filed by George Troicky. (Villegas, Carol)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Motion for attorney Brian Schall to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11107327, filed by Movant George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Villegas, Carol)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Partial Lifting of the PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by FNY Managed Accounts LLC, Globestar Systems Inc., Ashith Pabbathi, Daniel Tavares, George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Carol C. Villegas, #3 Exhibit A - Karma Order, #4 Exhibit B - Karma First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Durre Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #6 Exhibit D - Huan Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #7 Proposed Order)(Villegas, Carol)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Supplement to Amended complaint,, - Certification of Ashith Pabbathi, filed by George Troicky. Related document(s) #61 . (Villegas, Carol)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Caimin Flannery and Lordstown EV Corporation f/k/a Lordstown Motors Corp.. Filed by FNY Managed Accounts LLC, Globestar Systems Inc., Ashith Pabbathi, Daniel Tavares, George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Lordstown Motors Mirage, #2 Exhibit B - Troicky Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Tavares Certification, #4 Exhibit D - Globestar Systems Inc. Certification, #5 Exhibit E - FNY Managed Accounts LLC Certification, #6 Summons for Caimin Flannery, #7 Summons for Darren Post, #8 Summons for David T. Hamamoto, #9 Summons for Lordstown EV Corporation, #10 Summons for Shane Brown) (Villegas, Carol)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Globestar Systems Inc.. (Rosenthal, James)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Motion of Movant Ashith Pabbathi for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Steve W. Berman is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #57 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/10/21. (LC,S)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Motion of Movant Ashith Pabbathi for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Lucas E. Gilmore is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #58 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/10/21. (LC,S)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Motion of Movant Ashith Pabbathi for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Reed R. Kathrein is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #59 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/10/21. (LC,S)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Motion for attorney Reed R. Kathrein to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Verified Statement and Oath. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11026853, filed by Movant Ashith Pabbathi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Karon, Daniel)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Motion for attorney Lucas E. Gilmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Verified Statement and Oath. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11026707, filed by Movant Ashith Pabbathi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Karon, Daniel)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Motion for attorney Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Verified Statement and Oath. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11026535, filed by Movant Ashith Pabbathi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Karon, Daniel) .
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Movants Globestar Systems Inc. and Daniel Tavares' Motion for Admission of attorney Daniel Tyre-Karp, Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #56 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/9/21. (LC,S)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Movants Globestar Systems Inc. and Daniel Tavares' Motion for Admission of attorney Phillip C. Kim, Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #55 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/9/21. (LC,S)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Motion for attorney Daniel Tyre-Karp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11024539, filed by Globestar Systems Inc., Daniel Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenthal, James)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Motion for attorney Phillip Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11024518, filed by Globestar Systems Inc., Daniel Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenthal, James)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $402.00 refunded on 07/02/2021 for receipt BOHNDC-10769327. (K,Ve)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint Stipulation and Scheduling Order. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/6/21. (LC,S) re #48
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Motion for Admission of David J. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lead Plaintiff George Troicky is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #50 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/30/21. (LC,S)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Motion for Admission of Jake Bissell-Linsk to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lead Plaintiff George Troicky is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #49 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/30/21. (LC,S)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Motion for Admission of Carol C. Villegas to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lead Plaintiff George Troicky is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #51 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/30/21. (LC,S)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Motion for Admission of Charles Farrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lead Plaintiff George Troicky is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #53 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/30/21. (LC,S)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Motion for Admission of Christine M. Fox to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lead Plaintiff George Troicky is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #52 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/30/21. (LC,S)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Motion for attorney Charles M. Farrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10909824, filed by Movant George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Motion for attorney Christine M. Fox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10909809, filed by Movant George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Motion for attorney Carol C. Villegas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10909793, filed by Movant George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Motion for attorney David J. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10909777, filed by Movant George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Motion for attorney Jake E. Bissell-Linsk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10909732, filed by Movant George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Joint Proposed Stipulation and Scheduling Order filed by George Troicky. (McConville, Francis)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order: This matter is a consolidated class action securities fraud case involving Lordstown Motor Corporation ("Lordstown'). A number of parties move the Court to be appointed lead plaintiff in this case. For the reasons that follow, the Court appoints George Troicky as lead plaintiff and approves Labaton Sucharow LLP ("Labaton Sucharow") as lead plaintiffs' counsel. The Court reminds counsel of the Court's April 13, 2021 scheduling Order. Within ten days ofthe entry of this Order, the Lead Plaintiff and Defendants must submit to the Court a proposed schedule for (i) Lead Plaintiff's filing of a consolidated complaint or designating a previously filed complaint as operative and (ii) Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint. As an initial matter, four plaintiffs filed motions for appointment as lead plaintiff, but later withdrew those motions. Accordingly, the following motions are MOOT: (1) Motion of Eskandar Tehrani and Dari Tehrani for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel (Doc. #15 ). This motion was withdrawn in its entirety pursuant to Doc. #28 . (2) Mohammed Chowdhury and Simha & Pnina Cohen's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel (Doc. #16 ). This motion was withdrawn in its entirety pursuant to Doc. #29 . (3) Motion of John H. Jenkins and Robert Miller for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Co-Lead Plaintiffs, and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Doc. #24 ). This motion was withdrawn in its entirety pursuant to Doc. #31 . (4) Motion of the Lordstown Shareholder Group for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Doc. 25). This motion was withdrawn in its entirety pursuant to Doc. #30 . Based on the foregoing, the Court rules as follows on the outstanding motions: (1) The Motion of George Troicky for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel is GRANTED in PART and MOOT in PART (Doc. #21 ). The motion is GRANTED to the extent George Troicky is appointed as Lead Plaintiff. It is further GRANTED to the extent it seeks approval of the selection of Labaton Sucharow as lead counsel. The motion is MOOT to the extent it seeks consolidation, as the Court previously consolidated all cases. (2) The Motion of the RIDE Investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Doc. #13 ) is DENIED. (3) The Motion of FNY Managed Accounts LLC for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel (Doc. #14 ) is DENIED. (4) The Motion of Daniel Tavares and Globestar Systems, Inc. to (1) Consolidate Related Actions; (2) Appoint Lead Plaintiffs; and (3) Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel (Doc. #18 ) is DENIED in PART and MOOT in PART. The motion is DENIED to the extent it seeks the appointment of lead plaintiff and approval of counsel. It is MOOT to the extent it seeks consolidation, as the Court previously consolidated all cases. (5) The Motion of Kenneth Davenport and Joshua Betof for (1) Appointment as Co-Lead Plaintiffs and (2) Approval of Selection of Counsel (Doc. #19 ) is DENIED. (6) The Motion of Gurpreet Singh for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel (Doc. #22 ) is DENIED. (7) The Motion to Consolidate the Related Actions, Appoint Ashith Pabbathi as Lead Plaintiff and Approve the Selection of Lead Counsel (Doc. #23 ) is MOOT in PART and DENIED in PART. The motion is MOOT to the extent it seeks consolidation, as the Court previously consolidated all cases. It is DENIED to the extent is seeks appointment of lead plaintiff and approval of counsel. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/17/21. (LC,S)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Notice to #22 Motion for appointment of counsel And Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, #14 Motion for appointment of counsel And the Appointment of FNY Managed Accounts LLC as Lead Plaintiff, #15 Motion for appointment of counsel Motion to consolidate cases and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, #21 Motion to consolidate cases and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff Motion for appointment of counsel , #24 Motion for appointment of counsel MOTION OF JOHN H. JENKINS AND ROBERT MILLER FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSELMotion to consolidate cases, #23 Motion for appointment of counsel , #16 Motion for appointment of counsel and for appointment as lead plaintiff, #18 Motion to consolidate cases Motion for appointment of counsel and Lead Plaintiffs, #19 Motion Appointment as Lead Co-Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #13 Motion Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #25 Motion to consolidate cases Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Stephen Burns, Lordstown Motors Corp., Julio Rodriguez, Rich Schmidt. (Greene, Douglas)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Francis P. McConville for George Troicky. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #20 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/9/21.(LC,S)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Reply in support of #21 Motion to consolidate cases and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff Motion for appointment of counsel . Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of George Troicky's Unopposed Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by George Troicky. (McConville, Francis)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Supplemental Notice of Availability to Serve as Co-Lead Plaintiff for Section 14(a) Claims filed by Raymond Romano. (Simpkins, Scott)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Reply in support of #18 Motion to consolidate cases Motion for appointment of counsel and Lead Plaintiffs filed by Globestar Systems Inc., Daniel Tavares. (Rosenthal, James)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Reply in support of #14 Motion for appointment of counsel And the Appointment of FNY Managed Accounts LLC as Lead Plaintiff filed by FNY Managed Accounts LLC. (Flynn, William)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Reply to response to #21 Motion to consolidate cases and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff Motion for appointment of counsel Notice of Nonopposition to Troicky's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Ashith Pabbathi. (Karon, Daniel)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney David R. Kaplan for Plaintiffs Robert Palumbo and Raymond Romano. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #36 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/2/21.(LC,S)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Notice of Non-Opposition of the RIDE Investor Group to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions filed by Kin San Chan, Randy Slipher, Steven Terry. (Cummins, James)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Opposition to #23 Motion for appointment of counsel , #13 Motion Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel . Memorandum of Law in Further Support of George Troicky's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel;and in Opposition to All Competing Movants, filed by George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis P. McConville, #2 Exhibit A - Labaton Sucharow - Professional Profiles)(McConville, Francis)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Notice of Availability to Serve as Co-Lead Plaintiff for Section 14(a) Claims filed by Raymond Romano. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Kaplan, #2 Exhibit A - Saxena White Firm Resume)(Simpkins, Scott)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Opposition to #14 Motion for appointment of counsel And the Appointment of FNY Managed Accounts LLC as Lead Plaintiff, #21 Motion to consolidate cases and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff Motion for appointment of counsel , #19 Motion Appointment as Lead Co-Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #13 Motion Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Ashith Pabbathi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Danielle Smith, #2 Exhibit Estimated Losses and Damages of George Troicky, #3 Exhibit Publicly Available Records Concerning Globestar Systems, Inc.)(Karon, Daniel)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Motion for attorney David R. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Verified Statement and Oath. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10862773, filed by Plaintiff Raymond Romano. (Simpkins, Scott)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Non-Opposition to the Competing Motion of George Troicky for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Gurpreet Singh. Related document(s) #22 , #21 .(Nolan, Chris)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Joshua Betof, Kenneth Davenport. Related document(s) #19 .(Kranz, Michelle)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Response to #13 Motion Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by FNY Managed Accounts LLC. (Wayne, Richard)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of Non-Opposition of movants to competing motion of George Troicky for appointment as lead Plaintiff and selection of lead counsel, filed by Globestar Systems Inc., Daniel Tavares. (Rosenthal, James)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of withdrawal of motion of John H. Jenkins and Robert Miller for consolidation of related actions, appointment as lead plaintiffs, and approval of selection counsel (Related Document #24 ) filed by John Jenkins, Robert Miller. (Wagoner, Robert)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Withdrawal of the Motion seeking: (1) consolidation of related actions; (2) appointment as Lead Plaintiff; and (3) approval of their selection of lead and liaison counsel for the class. filed by Carole Cooper, Ethan Fingerer, Mario Guerrero, Kevin Levent, M.R.S. Leasing Corporation LTD. Related document(s) #25 .(Perez, Juan)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Notice of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion filed by Mohammed Chowdhury, Simha & Pnina Cohen. Related document(s) #16 .(Murray, Joseph)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Eskandar and Dari Tehrani for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel filed by Dari Tehrani, Eskandar Tehrani. Related document(s) #15 .(Ferguson, Katherine)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order: The following two cases were recently transferred as related to the above-captioned case: 21 CV 994 and 21 CV 1021. Pursuant to the consolidation Order entered by this Court on April 13, 2021 (Doc. #9 ), the recently filed actions are consolidated with Case No. 21 CV 616. All filings must be made solely in Case No. 21 CV 616 and need only contain the case caption for that case. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/19/21. (LC,S)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by M.R.S. Leasing Corporation LTD. (Perez, Juan)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Motion to consolidate cases of related cases and Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Ethan Fingerer, Kevin Levent, M.R.S. Leasing Corporation LTD, Mario Guerrero, Carole Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Counsel, and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #2 Affidavit of Juan Jose Perez, #3 Exhibit A-G in to Declaration of Juan Jose Perez, #4 Proposed Order)(Perez, Juan). AddedMotion for appointment of counsel on 5/18/2021 (L,Ja). ).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Motion to consolidate of related cases Motion for appointment of counsel filed by John H Jenkins, Robert Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Damages Analysis, #2 Exhibit PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit Certifications and Schedule A, #4 Exhibit Declaration, #5 Exhibit Pomerantz Firm bio, #6 Exhibit Wagoner Resume, #7 Proposed Order Proposed order)(Wagoner, Robert). AddedMotion to consolidate cases on 5/18/2021 (L,Ja). Modified on 5/18/2021 (L,Ja).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Movant Ashith Pabbathi. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration in Support including (1) Movant's Certification, (2) Movant's Loss Chart, (3) Movant's Declaration, (4) Notice, and (5) counsel's resumes, #3 Proposed Order)(Karon, Daniel)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Motion for appointment of counsel And Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Gurpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kim E. Miller, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration - Singh Certification, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration - Singh Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration - PSLRA Notice, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration - Singh Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration - KSF Resume, #8 Proposed Order)(Nolan, Chris)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion to consolidate cases and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Movant George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Francis P. McConville, #3 Exhibit A - Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, #5 Exhibit C - Notice, #6 Exhibit D - George Troicky Declaration, #7 Exhibit E - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, #8 Proposed Order)(McConville, Francis)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion for attorney Francis P. McConville to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10837827, filed by Movant George Troicky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Motion Appointment as Lead Co-Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Kenneth Davenport, Joshua Betof. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew M. Guiney, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration: Notice of Action, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration: Certifications by Kevin Davenport and and Joshua Betof, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration: Movants' Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration: Firm Resume for Wolf Haldenstein, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration: Proposed Order, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration: Joint Declaration, #9 Proposed Order)(Kranz, Michelle)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Motion to consolidate cases , Motion for appointment of counsel and Lead Plaintiffs filed by Daniel Tavares, Globestar Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support, #3 Rosenthal Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #5 Exhibit 2 - Movants' PSLRA Certifications, #6 Exhibit 3 - Movants' Loss Chart, #7 Exhibit 4 - RLF Firm Resume, #8 Exhibit 5 - CRK Firm Resume)(Rosenthal, James)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Affidavit/Declaration of Joseph F. Murray in Support filed by Mohammed Chowdhury, Simha & Pnina Cohen. Related document(s) #16 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit D - Joint Declaration in Support)(Murray, Joseph)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion for appointment of counsel and for appointment as lead plaintiff filed by Mohammed Chowdhury, Simha & Pnina Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Murray, Joseph)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion for appointment of counsel , Motion to consolidate cases and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Eskandar Tehrani, Dari Tehrani. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Eskandar Tehrani and Dari Tehrani for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Katherine Connor Ferguson, #3 Exhibit A - Press Release, #4 Exhibit B - PSLRA Certificate, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit D - GPM Firm Resume, #7 Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Katherine)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion for appointment of counsel And the Appointment of FNY Managed Accounts LLC as Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant FNY Managed Accounts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of William K. Flynn in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit Ex. A. to Declaration - Certification of FNY Managed Accounts LLC, #4 Exhibit Ex. B to Declaration - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit Ex. C to Declaration - Notice of Action, #6 Exhibit Ex. D to Declaration - Entwistle & Cappucci Resume, #7 Exhibit Ex. E to Declaration - Strauss Troy Resume, #8 Proposed Order)(Wayne, Richard)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Steven Terry, Kin San Chan, Randy Slipher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Declaration of James R. Cummins, #3 Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: duplicate. Receipt #: 4188391, filed by Jesse Brury. (Wagoner, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: duplicate. Receipt #: BOHNDC-10769327, filed by Jesse Brury. (Wagoner, Robert)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion for attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number OHNDC-10821956, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Brury. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00616-PAG, 4:21-cv-00633-PAG, 4:21-cv-00720-PAG, 4:21-cv-00760-PAG(Wagoner, Robert) Modified text on 5/10/2021 (M,TL).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion for attorney Joseph Alexander Hood, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number OHNDC-10821942, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Brury. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00616-PAG, 4:21-cv-00633-PAG, 4:21-cv-00720-PAG, 4:21-cv-00760-PAG(Wagoner, Robert) Modified text on 5/10/2021 (M,TL).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman for Jesse Brury. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/7/21. (Related Doc #12 )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order[non-document] Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Joseph Alexander Hood, II for Jesse Brury. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/7/21.(LC,S) Modified on 5/7/2021 (LC,S).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order: The following initial scheduling Order is hereby set: 1. Motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff's counsel are due May 17, 2021. Briefs in opposition are due 14 days thereafter and any reply brief must be filed within seven days of the filing of a brief in opposition. 2 Within ten days after this Court appoints a Lead Plaintiff, the Lead Plaintiff and Defendants will submit to the Court a proposed schedule for (i) Lead Plaintiff's filing of a consolidated complaint or designating a previously filed complaint as operative and (ii) Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint. Until such time, defendants need not respond to any complaint currently pending or subsequently filed and consolidated in this action. 3. Defendants expressly agree to accept service of process in Case Nos. 21 CV 616, 21 CV 633, and 21 CV 720. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/13/21. (LC,S)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of Consolidation: There are currently four pending class action securities fraud cases filed against Lordstown Motors Corp. and certain individual defendants. The Court has reviewed the complaints and finds that consolidation is appropriate because the complaints allege similar instances of wrongdoing against the defendants. Consolidation will also preserve judicial resources and promote efficiency in resolving the pending matters. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the four above-captioned cases are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Any subsequent case filed before the undersigned or transferred as a related action will be subject to this Order. All filings must be made solely in Case No. 21 CV 616, i.e., the first-filed case, and need only contain the case caption for that case. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/13/21. (LC,S)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants Lordstown Motors Corp., Stephen S. Burns, Julio C. Rodriguez, Rich Schmidt, and Michael Fabian's Motion for Admission of Douglas W. Greene Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc # 10). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/13/21. (LC,S)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Motion for Admission of Douglas W. Greene Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/6/21. (LC,S)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order: This is a class action securities fraud case. A second class action securities fraud case, i.e., 4:21 CV 633, was filed before Judge Boyko based on the same or similar conduct. The plaintiff marked the case as related to this case. Judge Boyko and the undersigned agreed with the designation and this Court accepted Judge Boyko's case as a related action. The parties are hereby notified that the Court intends to consolidate the two cases for pretrial purposes and perhaps trial. The parties are directed to inform the Court within seven days after entry of this Order as to whether any reason exists that would counsel against consolidation. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/30/21. (LC,S)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order filed by All Defendants. (Shively, Douglas)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Shively, Douglas)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion for attorney Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10749494, filed by Stephen S. Burns, Lordstown Motors Corp., Julio Rodriguez, Rich Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Good Standing in Support of Motion for Admission of Douglas W. Greene Pro Hac Vice)(Shively, Douglas)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Douglas L. Shively filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Shively, Douglas)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion for attorney Jeffrey C. Block to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10737848, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Rico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Legando, Drew)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Jeffrey C. Block is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/24/21. (LC,S)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,Ke)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10726672. Filed by Matthew Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Lordstown, #4 Summons Burns, #5 Summons Schmidt, #6 Summons Rodriguez) (Legando, Drew)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (S,Ke)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,Ke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rico v. Lordstown Motors Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen S. Burns
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Schmidt
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Rodriguez
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lordstown Motors Corp.
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fabian
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T. Hamamoto
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Brown
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Post
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R. Hash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A. Hannaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caimin Flannery
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lordstown EV Corporation
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Douglas W. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Rico
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Palumbo
Represented By: Scott D. Simpkins
Represented By: David R. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Brury
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Robert J. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sulayman Zuod
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Romano
Represented By: Lester R. Hooker
Represented By: Scott D. Simpkins
Represented By: David R. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Betof
Represented By: Michelle L. Kranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Globestar Systems Inc.
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Represented By: Daniel I. Tyre-Karp
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FNY Managed Accounts LLC
Represented By: Richard S. Wayne
Represented By: William K. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ethan Fingerer
Represented By: Juan J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Davenport
Represented By: Michelle L. Kranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kin San Chan
Represented By: James R. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dari Tehrani
Represented By: Katherine C. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ashith Pabbathi
Represented By: Daniel R. Karon
Represented By: Lucas E. Gilmore
Represented By: Reed R. Kathrein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy Slipher
Represented By: James R. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Miller
Represented By: Robert J. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Tavares
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Represented By: Daniel I. Tyre-Karp
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Guerrero
Represented By: Juan J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Terry
Represented By: James R. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Simha & Pnina Cohen
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Troicky
Represented By: Francis P. McConville
Represented By: Carol C. Villegas
Represented By: Charles M. Farrell
Represented By: Christine M. Fox
Represented By: David J. Schwartz
Represented By: Jake E. Bissell-Linsk
Represented By: Brian Schall
Represented By: Brian J. Schall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: M.R.S. Leasing Corporation LTD
Represented By: Juan J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carole Cooper
Represented By: Juan J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Levent
Represented By: Juan J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eskandar Tehrani
Represented By: Katherine C. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John H Jenkins
Represented By: Robert J. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohammed Chowdhury
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Represented By: Chris T. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?