Brury v. Lordstown Motors Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Brury
Defendant: Stephen S. Burns, Rich Schmidt, Lordstown Motors Corp. and Julio Rodriguez
Case Number: 4:2021cv00760
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR (wrong event used) Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically in the amount of $804.00 for extra filing fees regarding filing the initial Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jesse Brury. Related document(s) #1 . (Wagoner, Robert) Modified on 7/12/2021 (W,Jo).
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR, SEE CASE 21CV616 Notice of Non-Opposition of movants to competing motion of George Troicky for appointment as lead Plaintiff and selection of lead counsel, filed by Globestar Systems Inc., Daniel Tavares. (Rosenthal, James) Modified text on 6/2/2021 (S,SR).
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE - ATTORNEY NOTIFIED - Motion for attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number OHNDC-10821956, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Brury. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00616-PAG, 4:21-cv-00633-PAG, 4:21-cv-00720-PAG, 4:21-cv-00760-PAG(Wagoner, Robert) Modified to note filing error on 5/10/2021 (M,TL).
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE - ATTORNEY NOTIFIED - Motion for attorney Joseph Alexander Hood, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number OHNDC-10821942, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Brury. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00616-PAG, 4:21-cv-00633-PAG, 4:21-cv-00720-PAG, 4:21-cv-00760-PAG(Wagoner, Robert) Modified to note filing error on 5/10/2021 (M,TL).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Consolidation: There are currently four pending class action securities fraud cases filed against Lordstown Motors Corp. and certain individual defendants. The Court has reviewed the complaints and finds that consolidation is appropriate because the complaints allege similar instances of wrongdoing against the defendants. Consolidation will also preserve judicial resources and promote efficiency in resolving the pending matters. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the four above-captioned cases are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Any subsequent case filed before the undersigned or transferred as a related action will be subject to this Order. All filings must be made solely in Case No. 21 CV 616, i.e., the first-filed case, and need only contain the case caption for that case. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/13/21. (LC,S)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan for all further proceedings as related to Case No. 4:21CV0616. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/12/2021. (JLG)
April 12, 2021 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (D,Ju)
April 12, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. Judge Benita Y. Pearson terminated. (D,Ju)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Douglas L. Shively filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Shively, Douglas)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (D,Ju)
April 8, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
April 8, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (D,Ju)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Stephen S. Burns, Lordstown Motors Corp., Julio Rodriguez, Rich Schmidt. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10769353. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 4:21cv00616. Filed by Jesse Brury. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wagoner, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brury v. Lordstown Motors Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Brury
Represented By: Robert J. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen S. Burns
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Schmidt
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lordstown Motors Corp.
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Rodriguez
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?