Pate et al v. Huntington National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Margaret R. Fetter, Jerome J. Pate, John Vargo, Raymond A. Verkamp, Earl C. Snell, George Glauber, Eugene J. Verkamp, Ruth L. Singleton, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Wilhana B. Cox, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Mary Ann Schaus, Charlie R. Verkamp, Ronald Alplanalp, Doris C. Vargo, Eleanor Pawlak, Doneva G. Cole, Joanne Beifus, Cora C. Roy, Robert J. Lueken, Charles Leonhard, Kathleen Wargo, Nan Golden, Savie Klienerman, Rita Brodnik, Martha Glauber, Dennis P. Horgan, Gail Lythos, Diane K. Verkamp, Glenn A. Newton, R. Scott Shuss, Paula Palotas, Charles R. Verkamp, William E. Urban, II, Margaret Loyd, Leona Franks, Rosemary Mayhorn, Dina G. Shuss, Michael Wargo, Marie Wheeldin, Kim A. McCafferty, Francis L. Pate, Patrick M. McCafferty, Ron Fisher, Dorothy Freschly, Gary Waninger, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr., Gene L. Aungst, Clara Kreilein, G. Murray Caldwell, Renee Miller, Charles L. Davis, Virginia Collins Snider, Wilma Thyne, Gizella M. Poulos, Claude D. Cole, Norma J. Wigand, John S. Dauer, Jr., STK Ltd., Lynn Bandy, Frances Merkel, Deordorff Trust, Victor C. Miller, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Robyn R. Horgan, Bobby Wetzel, Ann M. Boldin, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Donald Irwin, Elnora Reaves, Ira Irwin, Ted W. Polka, Mary E. Enley, David C. Miller, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Joseph R. Enley, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Frances S. Devore, Arlene A. Guerin, Sewing Boutique, Pauline Lierseman, Daniel A. Warner, Samuel G. Keffer, Joseph R. Radvansky and Charles Kreilein
Defendant: Huntington National Bank, FirstMerit Bank, N.A., John Doe Banks 1-10, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., First Federal Community Bank, National Association, PNC Bank, Charter One Bank, Wachovia Bank, N.A., Key Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, N.A., John Doe Banks 11-20, Belmont National Bank, First National Bank and Fifth Third Bank
Case Number: 5:2012cv01044
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2014 Filing 97 True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming the District Court's decision re #91 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 13-3493). Date issued as mandate 4/11/14, Costs: None (Related document #96 ) (H,SP)
March 21, 2014 Filing 96 Information copy of opinion from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming the District Court's dismissal of plaintiffs' claim re #91 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 13-3493). This is not a mandate order. Circuit Judges: Norris, Cole and Gibbons. Date issued by USCA 3/20/14 (H,SP)
March 6, 2014 Filing 95 Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Denying the motion for reconsideration of this Court's order of 2/28/14 re #94 (USCA# 13-3493). Date issued by USCA 3/6/14 (H,SP)
February 28, 2014 Filing 94 Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Denying appellants' motion to continue oral argument re #91 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 13-3493). Date issued by USCA 2/28/14 (H,SP)
September 10, 2013 Filing 93 Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Denying the motion for assignment to the prior panel re #91 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 13-3493). Date issued by USCA 9/9/13 (H,SP)
April 25, 2013 Filing 92 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of #91 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 13-3493). Date filed in USCA 4/23/13. (H,SP)
April 18, 2013 USCA Appeal Fees of $455 received, receipt number 14660060228 re #91 Notice of Appeal (H,SP)
April 17, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the #89 Memorandum, Opinion and Order and #90 Judgment Entry of 3/18/13, filed by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee paid 4/18/13, receipt# 14660060228 (H,SP). Modified on 4/18/2013 for fee payment (H,SP).
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' separately filed motions for sanctions (Doc. Nos. #29 , #30 , #48 , #49 , #52 ) are denied without prejudice with leave to refile after the later of the time for taking an appeal from this decision has expired and no appeal has been taken, or after such time as an appeal from this dismissal, if taken, has been finally resolved. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/18/2013.(P,J)
March 18, 2013 Filing 90 Judgment Entry: The Court grants the motions to dismiss filed by defendants SunTrust Bank, Fifth Third Bank and Huntington National Bank (Doc. Nos. #62 , #63 , #64 ) and plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice. This case is closed. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/18/2013. (P,J)
March 18, 2013 Filing 89 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant depositary banks' motions to dismiss (Doc. Nos. #62 , #63 , and #64 ) are granted and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/18/2013. (P,J)
March 13, 2013 Filing 88 Defendants' Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Fifth Third Bank, Huntington National Bank, Suntrust Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bandy v. Fifth Third Bank (6th Cir. March 13, 2013))Related document(s) #64 , #63 , #62 .(Mumford, Michael)
March 4, 2013 Filing 87 Response to #85 Order to Show Cause and Motion to extend time to perfect service filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Summons Form, #2 Exhibit Proof Mailing, Return Receipt)(Morris, Daniel) Modified link on 3/5/2013 (M, S). Modified text for motion event on 3/5/2013 (R,Sh).
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiffs' motion (Doc. No. #86 ) to enlarge the time in which they have to respond to the Court's Order (Doc. No. #85 ) to show cause. Plaintiffs shall have until on or before 3/4/2013 to respond to the Court's show cause Order. No further extensions will be granted. Further, counsel for plaintiffs is cautioned that any future request for an extension should be made before the subject deadline has passed. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/1/2013.(P,J)
March 1, 2013 Filing 86 First Motion for extension of time to respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause until March 4, 2013 filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Lynn Bandy, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #85 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Counsel's ARNG drill schdule)(Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 3/4/2013 (R,Sh).
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order: In reviewing the docket there is no indication that service of the second amended complaint has been perfected upon Wells Fargo, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and L.R. 4.2. Plaintiffs are directed to show cause in writing why Wells Fargo should not be dismissed from this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) for want of prosecution due to the failure to serve the second amended complaint. Plaintiffs must file a written response on or before February 27, 2013. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/20/2013. (P,J)
February 12, 2013 Filing 84 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiffs' motion to remand is denied. (Related Doc #54 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 2/12/2013. (P,J)
February 1, 2013 Filing 83 Reply in support of #64 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Huntington National Bank. (Anastos, Thomas) Modified text on 2/4/2013 (R,Sh).
February 1, 2013 Filing 82 Reply in support of #63 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Fifth Third Bank. (Mumford, Michael) Modified text on 2/4/2013 (R,Sh).
January 15, 2013 Filing 81 Response to #64 Motion to dismiss by Huntington National Bank filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Opposition, #2 Exhibits 1-15, #3 Exhibits 16-53, #4 Exhibits 54-66)(Morris, Daniel) Modified text for double wording and to indicate exhibits are not described as required by the Initial Standing Order, re #5 on 1/16/2013 (R,Sh).
January 15, 2013 Filing 80 Response to #63 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #77 Motion for leave to file corrected response to Defendant Fifth Third's motion to dismiss instanter filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support brief in opposition, #2 Exhibits 1-15, #3 Exhibits 16-53, #4 Exhibits 54-66)(Morris, Daniel) Modified to indicate exhibits not described as required by Initial Standing Order, re #5 and for double wording on 1/16/2013 (R,Sh).
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order: The Court denies plaintiffs' motion for leave (Doc. No. #78 ) to file the attachments to their brief in opposition to SunTrust's motion to dismiss. Further, the Court grants plaintiffs' motions for leave to file instanter (Doc. Nos. #73 , #74 ) their responses to Huntington's and Fifth Third's motions to dismiss, including any exhibits thereto, but plaintiffs' oppositions shall be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. on January 15, 2013. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/11/2013.(P,J)
November 16, 2012 Filing 78 Motion for leave to file the attachments to the brief in oposition to SunTrust Bank's motion to dismiss the second amended complaint filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Lynn Bandy, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #72 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pate 2nd Amended compalint, #2 Exhibit 2nd Amended Complaint, Metz case, #3 Exhibit 2nd amended complaint, Loyd Case, #4 Exhibit 2nd amended complaint, Blair case, #5 Exhibit 2nd amended complaint, #6 Exhibit Examples of checks converted by SunTrust that the victims were not the drawers, makers or ose)(Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 11/19/2012 (R,Sh).
October 15, 2012 Filing 77 Motion for leave to file corrected response to Defendant Fifth Third's motion to dismiss instanter filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Lynn Bandy, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #63 , #74 . (Attachments: #1 Pleading Corrected Response to 5/3 Motion to Dismiss, #2 Brief in Support Brief in Opposition to 5/3 Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibits 1-15, #4 Exhibits 16-66)(Morris, Daniel) Modified text for double wording on 10/16/2012 (R,Sh).
October 15, 2012 Filing 76 Motion for leave to file a corrected response to Defendant Huntington National Bank's motion to dismiss instanter filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Lynn Bandy, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #64 , #73 . (Attachments: #1 Pleading Response to Motion, Instanter, #2 Brief in Support Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibits 1-15, #4 Exhibit 16-66)(Morris, Daniel) Modified text for double wording on 10/16/2012 (R,Sh).
October 15, 2012 Filing 75 Reply in support of #62 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim filed by Suntrust Bank, N.A.. (Smith-Rivera, Kimberly) Modified text on 10/16/2012 (R,Sh).
October 7, 2012 Filing 74 Motion for leave to file a reponse to Fifth Third's motiont to dismiss instanter filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Lynn Bandy, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #63 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Opposition 5-3 motion)(Morris, Daniel)
October 7, 2012 Filing 73 Motion for leave to file repsonse to motion to dismiss Instanter filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Lynn Bandy, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #64 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Opposition HNB motion)(Morris, Daniel) Modified text second motion to clarify selected in error on 10/9/2012 (R,Sh).
October 2, 2012 Filing 72 Response to #62 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Morris, Daniel)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #68 plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time in which to respond to the pending motions to dismiss (Doc. Nos. #62 , #63 , #64 ). Plaintiffs shall have 30 additional days to file their responses to the motions as follows: opposition to Doc. No. #62 due on or before 10/2/12; oppositions to Doc. Nos. #63 and #64 due on or before 10/4/12. No further extensions will be granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/27/2012.(P,J)
August 24, 2012 Filing 71 Reply to Opposition to #54 First Motion to remand to State Court filed by Huntington National Bank, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support reply brief, #2 Exhibit stipulation of damages) Related document #71 (Morris, Daniel) Modified text for links to correct documents on 8/27/2012 (R,Sh).
August 24, 2012 Filing 70 Reply to Opposition to #54 First Motion to remand to State Court filed by Fifth Third Bank, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support reply brief, #2 Exhibit Stipulation to damages) Related document #66 .(Morris, Daniel) Modified text to link to correct documents on 8/27/2012 (R,Sh).
August 24, 2012 Filing 69 Reply to Opposition to #54 First Motion to remand to State Court filed by Suntrust Bank, N.A., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit Binding Stipulation) Related document #65 . (Morris, Daniel) Modified to link to correct entries on 8/27/2012 (R,Sh).
August 24, 2012 Filing 68 First Motion for extension of time to file responses to pending motions to dismiss until 10/1/2012 and 10/3/2012 filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Lynn Bandy, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #63 , #64 , #62 . (Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 8/27/2012 (R,Sh).
August 10, 2012 Filing 67 Opposition to #54 First Motion to remand to State Court filed by Huntington National Bank. (Anastos, Thomas)
August 10, 2012 Filing 66 Opposition to #54 First Motion to remand to State Court filed by Fifth Third Bank. (Mumford, Michael)
August 10, 2012 Filing 65 Opposition to #54 First Motion to remand to State Court filed by Suntrust Bank, N.A.. (Smith-Rivera, Kimberly)
August 6, 2012 Filing 64 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Huntington National Bank. Related document(s) #61 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Metz v. Unizan Bank, 649 F.3d 492 (6th Cir. 2011), #2 Exhibit B. 5/6/04 Order Granting Class Certification, #3 Exhibit C. Chart of Plaintiffs)(Anastos, Thomas) Modified text on 8/7/2012 (R,Sh).
August 6, 2012 Filing 63 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Related document(s) #61 . (Swanson-Haan, Karen)
August 3, 2012 Filing 62 Motion and Brief Statement of Issues to dismiss for failure to state a claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Suntrust Bank, N.A.. Related document(s) #61 . (Smith-Rivera, Kimberly) Modified text on 8/6/2012 (R,Sh).
July 20, 2012 Filing 61 Second Amended complaint (unsigned)with jury demand against All Defendants adding Lynn Bandy, plaintiff, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., defendant and terminating various plaintiff and defendant parties. Filed by Jerome J. Pate. (Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 7/23/2012 (R,Sh).
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order addressing the Court's expectations regarding the management of this case and other issues, including notice of the potential for sanctions for unprofessional conduct; SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS; further directing that the Court will resolve first plaintiffs' motion to remand (Doc. No. #54 ) and will expect responses to the motion by 8/10/12 and replies by 8/24/12; further, denying Doc. No. #59 , Plaintiffs' motion for a ruling, for a case management conference, and for a briefing schedule; granting in part Doc. No. #57 , Plaintiffs' motion to amend (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS); denying without prejudice to renewal or refiling all of defendants' pending motions to dismiss (Doc. Nos. #17 , #32 , #33 , #35 , #38 , #40 , #42 ); and holding in abeyance all further briefing on the pending motions of the defendants for sanctions (Doc. Nos. #29 , #30 , #48 , #49 , #52 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 07/18/2012. (H,KR) (Main Document 60 replaced on 7/19/2012 with grammatical changes. NEF regenerated.) (P, S).
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] Pursuant to Civ.R. 41(a)(1)(A), plaintiffs have filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of the following defendants: Belmont National Bank; First National Bank; J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.; FirstMerit Bank, N.A.; Key Bank; and PNC Bank. (Doc. No. #55 .) Court action is unnecessary to effect the dismissal of these parties, yet the plaintiffs filed their "notice" on ECF using a "motion" event. Since the notice effects the dismissal, the Clerk's office is directed to administratively terminate the "motion." Judge Sara Lioi on 07/18/2012. (H,KR)
July 18, 2012 Filing 59 Motion for Ruling on Plaintiffs' motion to further amend the complaint and for a case management conference and for a Partial Briefing Schedule filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #43 . (Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 7/19/2012 (R,Sh).
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiffs' motion (Doc. #56 ) for an extension of time in which to respond to the motions for sanctions filed by defendants Sun Trust, Fifth Third, and Charter One. The Court finds good cause for the requested extension solely on the basis that it previously granted a similar extension with regard to several other pending motions for sanctions and in light of plaintiffs' counsel's representation that he requires more time to prepare plaintiffs' responses due to his scheduled summer reserve military duty. The Court expresses no opinion, however, as to plaintiffs' characterizations of defendants' motions as frivolous or as brought solely to harass counsel. Further, counsel shall refrain from such unnecessarily argumentative and inflammatory portrayals of an opposing party's motions when requesting enlargement of the time to respond to such motions, as the Court finds such gratuitous attacks unprofessional. That said, plaintiffs shall have until 8/13/2012 to file their responses to defendants' motions for sanctions (Docs. #48 , #49 and #52 ). No further extensions will be granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 07/18/2012. (H,KR)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order: Because plaintiffs' motion is unopposed and this case is still in the early stages of litigation, and because Rule 15(a) requires that leave to amend a pleading shall be freely given, the Court will grant the plaintiffs' unopposed motion to amend the complaint. The Court does so, however, without prejudice to any statute of limitations defenses that Wells Fargo may have and without prejudice as to any argument that plaintiffs have failed to meet the prerequisites prescribed in Rule 15(c) with regard to relation back of the amendment. Judge Sara Lioi on 07/17/2012. (Related Doc #43 )(H,KR)
July 18, 2012 Filing 57 Motion for leave to file third amended complaint filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #54 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Morris, Daniel) Modified text for abbreviations on 7/19/2012 (R,Sh).
July 17, 2012 Filing 56 Motion for extension of time to respond to motions for sanctions filed by Defendants SunTrust, Fifth third and Charter One. until Monday August 13, 2012 filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #53 , #52 , #48 , #49 . (Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 7/18/2012 (R,Sh).
July 17, 2012 Filing 55 Notive of Voluntary Dismissal of Parties: Belmont National Bank, First National Bank, J.P.Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FirstMerit Bank, N.A., Key Bank, PNC Bank filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. (Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 7/18/2012. Order already filed and motion event created in error termed (R,Sh).
July 16, 2012 Filing 54 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit proposed second amended complaint)(Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 7/17/2012 (R,Sh).
July 13, 2012 Filing 53 Supplement (Exhibit 1 - Posen Complaints) to #52 Motion for sanctions filed by Charter One Bank. Related document(s) #52 . (Laubenthal, Melissa)
July 13, 2012 Filing 52 Motion for sanctions filed by Defendant Charter One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Posen Complaints ERROR Exhibit does not open see document #53 )(Laubenthal, Melissa) Modified text on 7/13/2012 (R,Sh).
July 9, 2012 Filing 51 Response to #30 Motion for sanctions filed by First Fed'l Comm'y Bank filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Plaintiffs Brf.-in-Sppt., #2 Exhibit Amended Compalint, Pte, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, Loyd, #4 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, Metzssss)(Morris, Daniel)
July 9, 2012 Filing 50 Response to #29 Motion for sanctions by Hungtington Nat'l Bank et al. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Plaintiffs' Brf.inSppt., #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint Pate, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint Lyd, #4 Exhibit 2d Amend)(Morris, Daniel)
July 6, 2012 Filing 49 Motion for sanctions filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Metz v. Unizan Bank, 649 F.3d 492 (6th Cir. 2011)., #2 Exhibit B - Metz v. Unizan Bank, 655 F.3d 485 (6th Cir. 2011)., #3 Exhibit C - Metz Am. Mem. Op. and Order, #4 Exhibit D - Metz Order Adopting R&R, #5 Exhibit E - Loyd Mem. Op. and Order)(Swanson-Haan, Karen)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] granting for good cause shown plaintiffs' motion (Doc. #47 ) for an extension of time in which to file a response to defendants' motions for sanctions (Docs. #29 , #30 ). Plaintiffs shall file their responses to defendants' motions on or before 7/9/2012. No further extensions will be granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 07/02/2012.(H,KR)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] granting for good cause shown plaintiffs' motion (Doc. #46 ) for an extension of time in which to respond to defendants' motions to dismiss (Docs. #17 , #32 , #33 , #35 , #38 , #40 , #42 ). Plaintiffs shall file their responses to defendants' motions on or before 7/20/2012. No further extensions will be granted. Judge Sara Lioi on 07/02/2012.(H,KR)
July 2, 2012 Filing 48 Motion for sanctions filed by Defendant Suntrust Bank, N.A.. (Smith-Rivera, Kimberly)
July 2, 2012 Filing 47 Second Motion for extension of Time to Respond to motions for sanctions until July 9, 2012 filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. (Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 7/3/2012 (R,Sh).
July 2, 2012 Filing 46 Second Motion for extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint until July 20, 2012 filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. (Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 7/3/2012 (R,Sh).
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motion (Doc. #45 ) for an extension of time in which to respond to the motions to dismiss (Docs. #17 , #32 , #33 , #35 , #38 , #40 , #42 ). Plaintiff's request for leave to file a single "global response" to all of the motions to dismiss is DENIED. Plaintiffs' request for an extension of time in which to respond to the motions to dismiss is GRANTED in part; plaintiffs shall file their separate responses to the motions to dismiss on or before 7/9/12. Judge Sara Lioi on 06/27/12.(H,KR)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motion (Doc. #44 ) for extension. Plaintiff's request for leave to file a single response to the separate motions for sanctions (Docs. #29 and #30 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' request for an extension of time in which to respond is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file their separate responses to each of the motions for sanctions on or before 7/2/2012. Judge Sara Lioi on 06/27/12.(H,KR)
June 27, 2012 Filing 45 First Motion for extension of time in which Plainitffs have to respond to the various motions to dismiss the amended complaint until July 7, 2012 filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #38 , #33 , #17 , #32 , #42 , #41 , #40 , #35 . (Morris, Daniel)
June 26, 2012 Filing 44 First Motion for extension of time to respond to motions for sanctions filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #30 , #29 . (Morris, Daniel) Modified on 6/27/2012 (R,Sh).
June 26, 2012 Filing 43 First Motion to amend complaint filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Morris, Daniel)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Order: [non-document] granting as unopposed plaintiffs' motion (Doc. #41 ) to enlarge the time in which to respond to defendant SunTrust Bank, N.A.'s motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their response to defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. #17 ) on or before 6/28/12. Judge Sara Lioi on 06/25/2012.(H,KR)
June 25, 2012 Filing 42 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant First Federal Community Bank, National Association. (Anderson, Steven)
June 25, 2012 Filing 41 First Motion for extension of time to response to SunTrust Bank's Motion to Dismiss until June 28, 2012 filed by Ronald Alplanalp, Gene L. Aungst, Joanne Beifus, Ann M. Boldin, Rita Brodnik, G. Murray Caldwell, Claude D. Cole, Doneva G. Cole, Thomas G. Corwin, Jr, Wilhana B. Cox, John S. Dauer, Jr, Charles L. Davis, Deordorff Trust, Frances S. Devore, Joseph R. Enley, Mary E. Enley, Margaret R. Fetter, Ron Fisher, Leona Franks, Dorothy Freschly, George Glauber, Martha Glauber, Nan Golden, Arlene A. Guerin, Eldiva P. Hawkins, Dennis P. Horgan, Robyn R. Horgan, Donald Irwin, Ira Irwin, Samuel G. Keffer, Savie Klienerman, Anne Marie Konte, Arlene Kornbau, Charles Kreilein, Clara Kreilein, Charles Leonhard, Pauline Lierseman, Margaret Loyd, Daniel L. Luebbehusen, Robert J. Lueken, Gail Lythos, Jacqueline L. Mattison, Rosemary Mayhorn, Kim A. McCafferty, Patrick M. McCafferty, Lawrence R. McCauliff, Frances Merkel, David C. Miller, Renee Miller, Victor C. Miller, Glenn A. Newton, Paula Palotas, Francis L. Pate, Jerome J. Pate, Eleanor Pawlak, Ted W. Polka, Gizella M. Poulos, Joseph R. Radvansky, Elnora Reaves, Cora C. Roy, STK Ltd., Mary Ann Schaus, Sewing Boutique, Dina G. Shuss, R. Scott Shuss, Ruth L. Singleton, Earl C. Snell, Virginia Collins Snider, St. Peter's Lutheran Church, William H. Stonecipher, Wilma Thyne, William E. Urban, II, Doris C. Vargo, John Vargo, Charles R. Verkamp, Charlie R. Verkamp, Cynthia L. Verkamp, Diane K. Verkamp, Eugene J. Verkamp, Raymond A. Verkamp, Gary Waninger, Kathleen Wargo, Michael Wargo, Daniel A. Warner, Bobby Wetzel, Marie Wheeldin, Norma J. Wigand. Related document(s) #17 . (Morris, Daniel) Modified text on 6/26/2012 (R,Sh).
June 20, 2012 Filing 40 Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant First National Bank. (Hoehler, Anthony) Modified text on 6/21/2012 (R,Sh).
June 20, 2012 Filing 39 Attorney Appearance by Anthony M. Hoehler filed by on behalf of First National Bank. (Hoehler, Anthony)
June 18, 2012 Filing 38 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Charter One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Summit Count Court of Common Pleas Order CV2000-06-2623, #2 Exhibit 2: Summit County Court of Common Pleas Complaint c2002-10-6084)(Laubenthal, Melissa) Modified text for document description per Initial Order, re #5 on 6/19/2012 (R,Sh).
June 18, 2012 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent RBS Citizens, National Association for Charter One Bank filed by Charter One Bank. (Laubenthal, Melissa)
June 18, 2012 Filing 36 Charter One's Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Charter One Bank. (Laubenthal, Melissa)
June 18, 2012 Filing 35 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Swanson-Haan, Karen)
June 18, 2012 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Fifth Third Bank. (Swanson-Haan, Karen)
June 18, 2012 Filing 33 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant FirstMerit Bank, N.A.. (Downey, Philip)
June 18, 2012 Filing 32 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Belmont National Bank, Huntington National Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Key Bank, PNC Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Metz v. Unizan Bank, 649 F.3d 492 (6th Cir. 2011), #2 Exhibit Posen 5/6/04 Class Action Order, #3 Exhibit C. Chart of Plaintiffs)(Anastos, Thomas)
June 18, 2012 Filing 31 Answer filed by First Federal Community Bank, National Association. (Anderson, Steven)
June 18, 2012 Filing 30 Motion for sanctions filed by Defendant First Federal Community Bank, National Association. (Anderson, Steven). Added Motion for sanctions on 7/18/2012 (H,KR).
June 12, 2012 Filing 29 Motion for sanctions filed by Belmont National Bank, Huntington National Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Key Bank, PNC Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Metz v. Unizan Bank, 649 F.3d 492 (Sixth Circuit 2011), #2 Exhibit May 17, 2012 Letter)(Anastos, Thomas). Added Motion for sanctions on 7/18/2012 (H,KR).
June 5, 2012 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for PNC Bank filed by PNC Bank. (Shalodi, Reem)
June 5, 2012 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent KeyCorp for Key Bank filed by Key Bank. (Shalodi, Reem)
June 5, 2012 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Shalodi, Reem)
June 5, 2012 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Bancshares Incorporated, Other Affiliate Huntington Preferred Capital, Inc. for Belmont National Bank, Huntington National Bank filed by Belmont National Bank, Huntington National Bank. (Shalodi, Reem)
June 4, 2012 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - Affiliate(s) Not Added. Attorney to Re-file. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PNC Bank. (Shalodi, Reem) Modified text on 6/5/2012 (P, S).
June 4, 2012 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - Affiliate(s) Not Added. Attorney to Re-file. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Key Bank. (Shalodi, Reem) Modified text on 6/5/2012 (P, S).
June 4, 2012 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - Affiliate(s) Not Added. Attorney to Re-file. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Shalodi, Reem) Modified text on 6/5/2012 (P, S).
June 4, 2012 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - Affiliate(s) Not Added. Attorney to Re-file. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Belmont National Bank, Huntington National Bank. (Shalodi, Reem) Modified text on 6/5/2012 (P, S).
June 4, 2012 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance by Reem Shalodi filed by on behalf of Belmont National Bank, Huntington National Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Key Bank, PNC Bank. (Shalodi, Reem)
June 4, 2012 Filing 19 Attorney Appearance by Thomas L. Anastos filed by on behalf of Belmont National Bank, Huntington National Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Key Bank, PNC Bank. (Anastos, Thomas)
June 1, 2012 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent National Bancshares Corporation for First National Bank filed by First National Bank. (VanSickle, Timothy) Modified text on 6/4/2012 (H,KR).
May 30, 2012 Filing 17 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Suntrust Bank, N.A.. (Smith-Rivera, Kimberly)
May 21, 2012 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent F.F.D. Financial Corporation for First Federal Community Bank, filed by First Federal Community Bank and National Association. (Anderson, Steven) Modified text on 5/22/2012 (S,HR).
May 16, 2012 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc. for Suntrust Bank, N.A. filed by Suntrust Bank, N.A.. (Smith-Rivera, Kimberly)
May 16, 2012 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance of Co-Counsel for Defendant SunTrust Bank, N.A. by Kimberly Y. Smith-Rivera filed by on behalf of Suntrust Bank, N.A.. (Smith-Rivera, Kimberly)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting for good cause shown the motion (Doc. #12 ) for an extension of time in which to move, plead, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' amended class action complaint filed by defendant First Federal Community Bank, N.A. Defendant First Federal Community Bank shall file its response to the amended class action complaint on or before 6/18/12. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/9/2012.(P,J)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting for good cause shown the motion (Doc. #11 ) for an extension of time in which to move, plead, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' amended class action complaint filed by defendant First National Bank. Defendant First National Bank shall file its response to the amended class action complaint on or before 6/21/12. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/9/2012.(P,J)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting as unopposed the motion (Doc. #10 ) for an extension of time in which to move, plead, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' amended class action complaint filed by defendant SunTrust Bank, N.A.. Defendant SunTrust Bank shall file its response to the amended class action complaint on or before 6/4/12. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/9/2012.(P,J)
May 9, 2012 Filing 13 Proposed Order granting motion filed by First Federal Community Bank, National Association. Related document(s) #12 . (Anderson, Steven)
May 9, 2012 Filing 12 Motion for extension of May 15, 2012 until June 18, 2012 filed by Defendant First Federal Community Bank, National Association. (Anderson, Steven)
May 7, 2012 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until June 21, 2012 to Move, Plead, or Othersise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant First National Bank. Related document(s) #1 . (VanSickle, Timothy)
May 7, 2012 Filing 10 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until June 4, 2012 to answer Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Suntrust Bank, N.A.. Related document(s) #1 . (Wertheim, James)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting for good cause shown the motion (Doc. #8 ) for an extension of time in which to move, plead, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' amended class action complaint filed by defendant First Merit Bank, N.A.. Defendant First Merit shall file its response to the amended class action complaint on or before 6/18/12. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/7/2012.(P,J)
May 7, 2012 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent FirstMerit Bank, N.A. for FirstMerit Bank, N.A. filed by FirstMerit Bank, N.A.. (Prewitt-Stanley, Jocelyn)
May 7, 2012 Filing 8 Motion for extension of time until June 18, 2012 to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Defendant FirstMerit Bank, N.A.. (Prewitt-Stanley, Jocelyn)
May 4, 2012 Copy of Non-Document Order granting extension of time to defendant RBS Citizens, NA dba Charter One mailed to Eleanor Pawlak and Glenn Newton on 05/04/12. (H,KR)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting for good cause shown the motion (Doc. #7 ) for an extension of time in which to move, plead, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' amended class action complaint filed by defendant RBS Citizens, NA dba Charter One. Defendant Charter One shall file its response to the amended class action complaint on or before 6/18/12. Judge Sara Lioi on 05/04/2012.(H,KR)
May 4, 2012 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until June 18, 2012 to answer Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Charter One Bank. (Laubenthal, Melissa)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting for good cause shown the motion (Doc. [6)] for extension of time in which to move, plead, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' amended class action complaint filed by defendants Belmot National Bank, Huntington National Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Key Bank, and PNC Bank. Defendants shall file their responses to the amended class action complaint on or before 6/18/12. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/2/2012.(P,J)
May 1, 2012 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until June 18, 2012 to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Belmont National Bank, Huntington National Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Key Bank, PNC Bank. (Goins, Frances)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting for good cause shown defendant Fifth Third Bank's motion (Doc. #4 ) for an extension of time to move, plead, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' amended class action complaint. Defendant Fifth Third Bank shall file its response to the amended class action complaint on or before 6/18/12. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/30/2012.(P,J)
April 30, 2012 Filing 5 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/30/2012. (P,J)
April 27, 2012 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until June 18, 2012 to answer Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Mumford, Michael)
April 27, 2012 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (C,BA)
April 27, 2012 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Burke. (C,BA)
April 27, 2012 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (C,BA)
April 27, 2012 Filing 2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington National Bank. Related document(s) #1 . (Goins, Frances)
April 27, 2012 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Summit County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2012 03 1727 with jury demand, Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0647-5320785.. Filed by Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Original Summons, Return Receipt, Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Second Summons, Return Receipt, Amended Complaint)) (Goins, Frances)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pate et al v. Huntington National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret R. Fetter
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome J. Pate
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vargo
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Verkamp
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl C. Snell
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Glauber
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene J. Verkamp
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth L. Singleton
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence R. McCauliff
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilhana B. Cox
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L. Luebbehusen
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Schaus
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie R. Verkamp
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Alplanalp
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris C. Vargo
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Pawlak
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doneva G. Cole
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Beifus
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora C. Roy
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Lueken
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Leonhard
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wargo
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nan Golden
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savie Klienerman
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Brodnik
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Glauber
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis P. Horgan
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Lythos
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane K. Verkamp
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn A. Newton
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Scott Shuss
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Palotas
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Verkamp
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Urban, II
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Loyd
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Franks
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Mayhorn
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina G. Shuss
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wargo
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Wheeldin
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim A. McCafferty
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis L. Pate
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. McCafferty
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Fisher
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Freschly
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Waninger
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G. Corwin, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene L. Aungst
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Kreilein
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Murray Caldwell
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Miller
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L. Davis
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Collins Snider
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Thyne
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gizella M. Poulos
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude D. Cole
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma J. Wigand
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John S. Dauer, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STK Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Bandy
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Merkel
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deordorff Trust
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor C. Miller
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Peter's Lutheran Church
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Stonecipher
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldiva P. Hawkins
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn R. Horgan
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Wetzel
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann M. Boldin
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline L. Mattison
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Irwin
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elnora Reaves
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Irwin
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted W. Polka
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Enley
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Miller
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Marie Konte
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Kornbau
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Enley
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L. Verkamp
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances S. Devore
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene A. Guerin
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sewing Boutique
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Lierseman
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A. Warner
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel G. Keffer
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Radvansky
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kreilein
Represented By: Daniel G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Frances F. Goins
Represented By: Reem Shalodi Henderson
Represented By: Thomas L. Anastos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstMerit Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jocelyn N. Prewitt-Stanley
Represented By: Erin L. Dickinson
Represented By: Philip F. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Banks 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Community Bank, National Association
Represented By: Steven A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank
Represented By: Reem Shalodi Henderson
Represented By: Frances F. Goins
Represented By: Thomas L. Anastos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter One Bank
Represented By: Melissa A. Laubenthal
Represented By: Karen L. Giffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Bank
Represented By: Reem Shalodi Henderson
Represented By: Frances F. Goins
Represented By: Thomas L. Anastos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Reem Shalodi Henderson
Represented By: Frances F. Goins
Represented By: Thomas L. Anastos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Smith-Rivera
Represented By: James S. Wertheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Banks 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont National Bank
Represented By: Reem Shalodi Henderson
Represented By: Frances F. Goins
Represented By: Thomas L. Anastos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank
Represented By: Anthony M. Hoehler
Represented By: Timothy R. VanSickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Brett A. Wall
Represented By: Karen E. Swanson-Haan
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?