Anthony et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David Anthony and Clarissa Anthony
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv01791
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,N)
September 1, 2019 Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on October 31, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by October 10, 2019. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by October 17, 2019. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(D,N)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on 8/23/2019 from Stark County Court of Common Pleas. Related document #6 . (S,He)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Stacie Roth for Sean Steward filed by All Plaintiffs. (Roth, Stacie) Modified on 10/2/2019 (S,He).
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 State court documents received from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CV01380. Original record returned to Stark County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Stark County Court) (E,CK)
August 19, 2019 Notice to Attorney Sean R. Steward. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
August 9, 2019 Copy of #5 Initial Order - Judge Lioi mailed to Sean Steward at 236 Third Street SW Canton OH 44702 on 8/9/2019. Related document(s) #5 . (S,SR)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Witness List, #2 Appendix B-Exhibit List) (S,SR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
August 7, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,SR)
August 7, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (S,SR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Collins, Gregory)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Collins, Gregory)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Stark County, case number 2019CV01380 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9458126.. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Collins, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory H. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Anthony
Represented By: Sean Steward
Represented By: Stacie L. Roth
Represented By: Sean R. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa Anthony
Represented By: Sean Steward
Represented By: Stacie L. Roth
Represented By: Sean R. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?