Cook v. J.M. Smucker Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Jessica Cook
Defendant: J. M. Smucker Company and Target Corporation
Case Number: 5:2024cv00465
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Minutes of proceedings[non-document] before Judge John R. Adams.Telephone Conference held on 4/22/24. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 15 Mins. (K,C)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Richard Fama for J. M. Smucker Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #83 ). Judge John R. Adams on 4/19/24.(K,C)
April 18, 2024 Filing 83 Motion for attorney Richard Fama to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee paid, $120.00. Receipt number 151386. Filed by Defendant J. M. Smucker Company. Document was digitally signed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Fama, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (R,AP)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order setting a Telephone Conference with case #5:24CV346 with counsel only for 4/22/2024 at 11:00 AM with Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 4/12/24. (K,C)
March 20, 2024 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by J. M. Smucker Company, Target Corporation. (Theveny, Daniel)
March 20, 2024 Notice by Clerk that J.M. Smucker Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (P,G)
March 18, 2024 Filing 80 Opposition to #73 Third Motion to Compel filed by J. M. Smucker Company, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cook - TARGET Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Cook - Target's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories, #3 Certificate of Filing and Service)(Theveny, Daniel)
March 18, 2024 Filing 79 Attorney Appearance by Daniel C. Theveny filed by on behalf of J. M. Smucker Company, Target Corporation. (Theveny, Daniel)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge John R. Adams for all further proceedings as related to Case No. 5:22-cv-00885. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/13/2024. (G,CA)
March 13, 2024 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. Judge David A. Ruiz terminated. (R,AP)
March 13, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (R,AP)
March 12, 2024 Filing 77 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,AP)
March 12, 2024 Filing 76 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of South Carolina. Case number 0:23-cv-00242. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 12, 2024 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (R,AP)
March 12, 2024 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (R,AP)
March 12, 2024 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Target Corporation are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (R,AP)
March 12, 2024 Copy of #77 Magistrate Consent Form Issued and docket sheet mailed to attorneys Andrew Richard Hand, Leigh James Leventis, Richard A. Harpootlian, Charles Albert Kinney, Jr., Dakota E. Knehans, Richard Fama, and Ronald Y. Rothstein on 3/12/2024. Related document(s) #77 . (R,AP)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by the Honorable Jacquelyn D. Austin on March 11, 2024.(ahil) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Filing 73 Third MOTION to Compel by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendants, #2 Exhibit B-Defendant Smucker's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C-Correspondence to Defendant Smucker, #4 Exhibit D-Defendant Smucker's Supplemental Responses)No proposed order.(Harpootlian, Richard) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 22, 2024 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 Second MOTION to Compel Response filed by Jessica Cook. (Harpootlian, Richard) (Main Document 71 replaced on 2/27/2024 with document provided by filer.) (ahil) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 21, 2024 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Albert Kinney, Jr on behalf of J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation (Kinney, Charles) (Main Document 70 replaced on 2/22/2024 with document provided by filer.) (ahil) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 20, 2024 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions Response filed by J.M. Smucker Company, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/27/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart)(Knehans, Dakota) (Main Document 69 replaced on 2/21/2024 with document provided by filer.) (ahil) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 15, 2024 Filing 68 FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 5/28/2024, Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/24/2024, Discovery due by 9/5/2024, Motions due by 9/16/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 12/2/2024, Mediation Due by 9/23/2024, Rule 56 Conference Deadline 9/10/2024. ( #67 MOTION to Amend/Correct #46 Scheduling Order granted). Signed by the Honorable Jacquelyn D. Austin on February 15, 2024. (ahil, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 14, 2024 Filing 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct #46 Scheduling Order, by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Harpootlian, Richard) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 14, 2024 Filing 66 TEXT ORDER directing counsel for Defendants J.M. Smucker Company and Target Corporation to respond to Plaintiff's #65 Motion to compel by close of business on February 20, 2024. Signed by the Honorable Jacquelyn D. Austin on February 13, 2024. (ahil) Modified on 2/15/2024 to edit text (ahil). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 13, 2024 Filing 65 Second MOTION to Compel by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 2/27/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Defendant Smucker's December 8, 2023 supplemental responses, #2 Exhibit B-February 1, 2024 letter to Defense counsel, #3 Exhibit C-February 1, 2024 email, #4 Exhibit D-Defendant Smucker's supplemental responses and privilege log, dated 2/5/2024, #5 Exhibit E-Defendant Target's supplemental responses, #6 Exhibit F-February 7, 2024 letter to Defense counsel, #7 Exhibit G-Defendant Smucker's supplemental responses and privilege log, dated 2/9/2024)No proposed order.(Harpootlian, Richard) (Attachments 4 and 7 replaced on 2/14/2024 to add privilege logs as requested by filer) (jtho, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 13, 2024 Filing 64 Case Reassigned to Judge Jacquelyn D Austin. Judge Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (suro, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 12, 2024 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENT by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation to #50 MOTION to Change Venue . (Knehans, Dakota) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 24, 2024 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Response filed by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. (Knehans, Dakota) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 17, 2024 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Response filed by Jessica Cook.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/24/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-December 2023 Response From Counsel)(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 3, 2024 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Response filed by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. Re-filed to correct event type and replace with corrected document. (jpet, ) (Main Document 58 replaced on 1/5/2024) (jpet, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 3, 2024 Filing 60 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Knehans, Dakota) (Main Document 60 replaced on 1/5/2024) (jpet, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 3, 2024 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #54 MOTION to Amend/Correct #47 Amended Complaint Response filed by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/10/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Knehans, Dakota) (Main Document 59 replaced on 1/5/2024) (jpet, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
December 27, 2023 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Change Venue Response filed by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. (Knehans, Dakota) (Main Document 57 replaced on 12/28/2023) (jpet, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
December 27, 2023 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Response filed by Jessica Cook.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/3/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
December 20, 2023 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Change Venue Response filed by Jessica Cook.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/27/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consolidated Class Complaint)(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
December 20, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct #47 Amended Complaint by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Amended Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B-December 20, 2023 Response from Counsel)No proposed order.(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
December 8, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Knehans, Dakota) (Main Document 53 replaced on 12/13/2023) (jpet, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/13/2023) (jpet, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
December 1, 2023 Filing 52 TEXT ORDER granting #51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #47 Amended Complaint and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 MOTION to Change Venue. Defendants' answer to #47 Amended Complaint is due by 12/8/2023. Plaintiff's response to #50 MOTION to Change Venue due by 12/20/2023. (Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/1/2023. (jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
November 28, 2023 Filing 51 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #47 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 MOTION to Change Venue ( Response to Motion due by 12/12/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. Re-filed for event type and to replace with corrected document. (jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
November 22, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION to Change Venue by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. Response to Motion due by 12/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Supporting Documents Dec of Jackie Welch ISO Motion to Transfer Venue)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Knehans, Dakota) See #63 Supplement. (jpet, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
November 16, 2023 Filing 49 TEXT ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ronald Rothstein. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/16/2023.(jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
November 15, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Y. Rothstein ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11430737) by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. Response to Motion due by 11/29/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Knehans, Dakota) Modified to rearrange documents and rename first attachment on 11/16/2023 (jpet, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
November 14, 2023 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT against J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation, filed by Jessica Cook. Service due by 2/12/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Target Receipt, #2 Exhibit B-Target Email) (Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
November 7, 2023 Filing 46 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/26/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/25/2024, Discovery due by 6/7/2024, Motions due by 6/14/2024, Jury Selection due September/October 2024 term of court, Mediation Due by 6/21/2024. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/7/2023. (jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint filed by Jessica Cook. (Amended Complaint due by 11/14/2023) Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/7/2023. (jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #26 MOTION to Compel filed by Jessica Cook. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/7/2023. (jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
November 2, 2023 Filing 43 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2023 re #26 MOTION to Compel filed by Jessica Cook, #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint filed by Jessica Cook. Court extends all deadlines by 90 days and grants motions #26 and #27 ; written orders forthcoming. Court Reporter Kathleen Richardson. (jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
October 13, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint and #26 MOTION to Compel: Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2023 10:00 AM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
October 2, 2023 Filing 41 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion to Seal Document. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/2/2023.(jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
September 8, 2023 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Compel Response filed by Jessica Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant JM Smucker's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit B - Curtis v. Time Warner Case, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Responses to Discovery, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's letter dated August 21, 2023, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's letter dated July 13, 2023)(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
September 7, 2023 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint Response filed by Jessica Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Smucker_000086-0104-submitted in camera)Re-filed for event type.(jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
August 29, 2023 Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint and #26 MOTION to Compel. Replies due by 9/8/2023. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 8/29/2023.(jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
August 29, 2023 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, #34 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint Response filed by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/31/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Responses to Def. RTA)(Knehans, Dakota) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal Document by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)No proposed order.(Knehans, Dakota) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
August 23, 2023 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Compel Response filed by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/30/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Food History Questionnaire, #2 Exhibit B-ESI Protocol Stipulation, #3 Exhibit C-The J.M. Smucker Co. Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D- The J.M. Smucker Co. Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production, #5 Exhibit E-Plaintiff's Response to The J.M. Smucker Co.'s First Request for Production, #6 Exhibit F-The J.M. Smucker Co.'s Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production, #7 Exhibit G-Target'sSupplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit H-Target's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production, #9 Exhibit I-Correspondence with Plaintiff's Counsel, #10 Exhibit J-Plaintiff's Response to The J.M. Smucker Co.'s Request for Admission, #11 Exhibit K-The J.M. Smucker Co.'s Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #12 Exhibit L-Plaintiff's Response to the J.M. Smucker Co.'s First Set of Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit M-Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to The J.M. Smucker Co.'s First Set of Interrogatories, #14 Exhibit N-Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute)(Knehans, Dakota) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 33 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. (Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/27/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/27/2023, Discovery due by 3/1/2024, Motions due by 3/8/2024, Jury Selection Deadline: July/August term of court,, Mediation Due by 3/15/2024,) Motion granted: #32 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Scheduling Order, filed by Jessica Cook. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 8/21/2023. (jpet, ) Modified to edit text on 8/21/2023 (jpet, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Scheduling Order,, by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 9/1/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
August 15, 2023 Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting #30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Motion to Amend the Complaint filed by Target Corporation, J.M. Smucker Company, The. Response to motions #26 MOTION to Compel and #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint due by 8/24/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 8/15/2023. (jpet, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
August 9, 2023 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Motion to Amend the Complaint by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/23/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Knehans, Dakota) Modified to replace with corrected document provided by filing user on 8/15/2023 (jpet, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
July 31, 2023 Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion for Richard Fama to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 7/31/23.(mflo, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Fama ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11233373) by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application and Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Knehans, Dakota) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
July 26, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Defendant JM Smucker's initial discovery responses, #2 Exhibit B-Defendant JM Smucker's supplemental discovery responses, #3 Exhibit C-discovery documents provided in camera to the Court, #4 Exhibit D-Defendant Target's initial discovery responses, #5 Exhibit E-Court instructed Joint Statement)No proposed order.(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
July 24, 2023 Filing 24 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr. Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: The provisions of this Court's scheduling order require attorneys to contact the Court to request an informal telephone conference before filing a motion relating to discovery. Therefore, Plaintiff's #22 motion to compel is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/30/2023.(cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Compel by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's initial discovery requests, #2 Exhibit B-Defendant's supplemental discovery responses)No proposed order.(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
March 7, 2023 Filing 21 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/27/2023, Plaintiff ID of Expert Witness due by 8/25/2023, Defendant ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/25/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/25/2023, Discovery due by 11/27/2023, Motion in Limine due by 3/6/2024, Motions due by 12/8/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/23/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 3/27/2024, Mediation Due by 2/12/2024. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/7/2023. (cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
March 3, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION Establishing ESI Discovery Protocol by Jessica Cook. (Hand, Andrew) (Main Document 20 replaced on 3/6/2023) (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 28, 2023 Filing 19 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories and Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order)(Knehans, Dakota) Modified to edit text on 2/28/2023 (cbru, ). (Main Document 19 replaced on 3/2/2023) (cbru, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/2/2023) (cbru, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/2/2023) (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 18 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 2/10/2023. (cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Jessica Cook. Response to Motion due by 2/24/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redlined Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hand, Andrew) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
February 6, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh James Leventis on behalf of Jessica Cook (Leventis, Leigh) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 26, 2023 Filing 15 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 14. Reason: Entered erroneously by the Clerk. (cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 26, 2023 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jessica Cook.(Hand, Andrew) Modified to edit text on 1/26/2023 (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 25, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation to 4 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Knehans, Dakota) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 25, 2023 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/25/2023. (cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 25, 2023 Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 2/28/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/27/2023, Plaintiff ID of Expert Witness due by 4/25/2023, Defendant ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/25/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/25/2023, Discovery due by 7/24/2023, Motion in Limine due by 11/6/2023, Motions due by 8/8/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/23/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 11/27/2023, Mediation Due by 10/10/2023. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/25/2023. (cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 25, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation.(Knehans, Dakota) Modified to edit text on 1/25/2023 (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by J.M. Smucker Company, The.(Knehans, Dakota) Modified to edit text on 1/25/2023 (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 18, 2023 Filing 7 Supplemental Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation.(Knehans, Dakota) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/19/2023) (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 18, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendants are reminded that Local Rule 26.01 includes Interrogatory H to be answered in any an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Please file an answer to this interrogatory no later than February 1, 2023. (cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 18, 2023 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at http://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 1/25/2023) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/18/2023. (cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 18, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by J.M. Smucker Company, The, Target Corporation.(cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]
January 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-46-03728 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10898588) filed by Target Corporation, J.M. Smucker Company, The. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 3/12/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. J.M. Smucker Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Cook
Represented By: Richard A. Harpootlian
Represented By: Andrew Richard Hand
Represented By: Leigh James Leventis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. M. Smucker Company
Represented By: Dakota E Knehans
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein
Represented By: Richard Fama
Represented By: Charles Albert Kinney, Jr
Represented By: Daniel C. Theveny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein
Represented By: Charles Albert Kinney, Jr
Represented By: Dakota E Knehans
Represented By: Richard Fama
Represented By: Daniel C. Theveny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?