Price v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Price
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2008cv00015
Filed: January 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: BUTLER
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hogan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 17 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly 16 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by James Price is granted. (wam1)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the EAJA 16 fee petition filed by plaintiff's counsel be Granted and that counsel be Awarded $2451.90 in attorney fees and $350.00 in costs, for a Total Award of $2801.90. Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy S Hogan on 10/10/2009. (art)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 13 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, the decision of the Commissioner is Reversed and Remanded for further proceedings pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g) (wam1, )
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the decision of the Commissioner be Reversed and Remanded for further proceedings pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g). Objections to R&R due by 4/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy S Hogan on 3/16/2009. (art, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Price
Represented By: Gayle P Vojtush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Represented By: John J Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?