Vandergriff et al v. Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees Featured Case

Claim that that library policy violates First Amendment by prohibiting religious use of its meeting room.

Plaintiff: George Vandergriff, Cathy Vandergriff and Institute for Principled Policy
Defendant: Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees
Case Number: 1:2008cv00381
Filed: June 4, 2008
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: CLERMONT
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2009 18
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Defendant Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Birck, Mary)
September 4, 2008 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2008. Motions directed to pleadings due by 12/1/2008. Status Conference set for 4/7/2009 02:00 PM in teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 10/15/2008. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/27/2009. Defendant Primary Expert due by 1/15/2009. Non-Expert (Fact) due by 10/1/2008. Discovery due by 3/31/2009. Motions not directed to pleadings due by 5/1/2009. Settlement Conference set for 6/3/2009 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Proposed Final Pretrial Order/Jury Instructions due by 10/1/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2009 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Trial set for 11/9/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/4/08. (mr1, )
August 14, 2008 16
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs George Vandergriff, Cathy Vandergriff, Institute for Principled Policy, Defendant Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Langdon, David)
July 31, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
AMENDED ORDER re 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/14/2008 for Parties to Submit Rule 26(f) Report filed by Institute for Principled Policy, George Vandergriff, Cathy Vandergriff and amending 14 Order; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/14/2008. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/31/2008. (ba1, )
July 23, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension for Parties to Submit Rule 26(f) Report filed by Institute for Principled Policy, George Vandergriff, Cathy Vandergriff; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/1/2008. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/23/2008. (ba1, )
July 19, 2008 13
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/14/2008. for Parties to Submit Rule 26(f) Report by Plaintiffs George Vandergriff, Cathy Vandergriff, Institute for Principled Policy. (Langdon, David)
July 10, 2008 11
RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Birck, Mary)
June 30, 2008 10
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs George Vandergriff, Cathy Vandergriff, Institute for Principled Policy, Defendant Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees. Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees served on 6/11/2008, answer due 7/1/2008. (Chandler, Timothy)
June 26, 2008 9
NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/31/2008. (ba1, )
June 25, 2008 8
ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Birck, Mary)
June 17, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy D. Chandler for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/17/2008. (ba1, )
June 6, 2008 6
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy D Chandler (Filing fee $ 200, Receipt number: 1707355) by Plaintiffs George Vandergriff, Cathy Vandergriff, Institute for Principled Policy. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Langdon, David) Modified on 6/6/2008 to add receipt number (ss, ).
June 5, 2008 5
Summons Issued as to Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees. (mr1, )
June 4, 2008 4
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs George Vandergriff, Cathy Vandergriff, Institute for Principled Policy. (Langdon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vandergriff et al v. Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Vandergriff
Represented By: David R Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Vandergriff
Represented By: David R Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute for Principled Policy
Represented By: David R Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clermont County Public Library Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?