Finley v. Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Thomas K. Finley
Respondent: Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2009cv00414
Filed: June 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hogan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 24 dismissed petition with prejudice. A certificate of appealability will not issue. Petitioner is denied leave to appeal IFP. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 8/9/10. (mb)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 4 . This matter is dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 8/18/09. (mb)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this matter be Dismissed for lack of prosecution. Objections to R&R due by 8/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy S Hogan on 7/21/2009. (art, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finley v. Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas K. Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Warren Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?