NECA-IBEW Pension Fund v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: NECA-IBEW Pension Fund
Defendant: Cincinnati Bell Inc., Craig F Maier, Alex Shumate, Lynn A Wentworth, John M Zrno, John F. Cassidy, Gary J Wojtaszek, Christopher J Wilson, Towers Watson & Co., Phillip R Cox, Bruce L. Byrnes and Jakki L Haussler
Case Number: 1:2011cv00451
Filed: July 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER APPROVING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (DOC. 80 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/18/12. (mr1)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY (DOC. 75 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/12/12. (mr1)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE AMENDED VERIFIED SHAREHOLDERS COMPLAINT (DOC. 72 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/6/12. (mr1)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER - Counsel for the individual Defendants shall advise the Court of the status of the state court settlement and its possible preclusive effects on this litigation by February 24, 2012. Plaintiff's counsel may respond by March 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/17/12. (mr1)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 44 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/22/11. (lk)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER TO THE ATTORNEYS OF PLAINTIFF NECA-IBEW PENSION FUND TO APPEAR IN COURT ON DECEMBER 21, 2011 AT 1:00 PM TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THEY SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/5/11. (mr1)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. 8). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/26/11. (mr1)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/20/11. (mr1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NECA-IBEW Pension Fund v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Bell Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Edward Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig F Maier
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Shumate
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn A Wentworth
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Zrno
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Cassidy
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary J Wojtaszek
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J Wilson
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towers Watson & Co.
Represented By: James Eugene Burke
Represented By: Jason J Mendro
Represented By: Andrew Tulumello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip R Cox
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce L. Byrnes
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jakki L Haussler
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Represented By: Grant Spencer Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NECA-IBEW Pension Fund
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?