Coach, Inc. et al v. Island Rayz et al
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc. and Coach Services, Inc.
Defendant: John Does, Island Rayz, Tara K McDonald and Ray T. McDonald
Case Number: 1:2011cv00478
Filed: July 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: LAWRENCE
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JUDGMENT in a Civil Case pursuant to 46 Order entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/5/2013. (art)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying plaintiff's 41 Motion to allow its party representative to attend the hearing on plaintiff's damages scheduled for 6/12/2013 at 9:30 am by telephone. Plaintiff's representative may appear by video conference. Plaintiff shall contact the chambers for MJ Litkovitz by 6/5/2013 to make the necessary arrangements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/15/2013. (art)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and request for a hearing on damages. A hearing is hereby set for 6/12/2013 at 9:30 am in Courtroom 708. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide a copy of this Order setting notice of hearing to defendants via certified mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/11/2013. (art)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER releasing pro bono representation of defendants by J. Michael Hurst. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/23/12. (jl1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coach, Inc. et al v. Island Rayz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: Theresa Margaret Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Rayz
Represented By: Theresa Margaret Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara K McDonald
Represented By: Theresa Margaret Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray T. McDonald
Represented By: Theresa Margaret Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C O'Connell
Represented By: Theresa Margaret Bratton
Represented By: Victoria Denise Barto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa Margaret Bratton
Represented By: Victoria Denise Barto
Represented By: Matthew C O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?