CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Crawford

Defendant: Todd Christopher Crawford
Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00714
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Report and Recommendation, granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Reference. This matter shall now proceed before this Court. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 6/20/2012. (km1)
March 26, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS (Doc. 16 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/26/2013. (mr1)
May 22, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.: that the motion be GRANTED. That CitiMortgage should be required to re-file a copy of the foreclosure complaint, the class action counterclaim, and any other pertinent pleadings originally filed in state court and removed to Bankruptcy Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/22/12. (jl1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Christopher Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Harry William Cappel
Represented By: Kara Ann Czanik
Represented By: John Michael Debbeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.