City Of Cincinnati v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee et al

Plaintiff: City Of Cincinnati
Defendant: Deutsche Bank, AG, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Treasurer of Hamilton County, Ohio
Case Number: 1:2012cv00104
Filed: February 3, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Referring Judge: J. Gregory Wehrman
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2016 155 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER & JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 6/21/16. Case Terminated (mb)
May 18, 2016 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 138 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 139 Wells Fargo's Motion for Summary Judgment. A status conference to be scheduled. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 5/18/16. (mb)
May 2, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting 34 Motion to realign. The parties are to submit a proposed briefing schedule on the motions to dismiss, etc. by: 5/12/12. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 5/2/12. (mb) Modified on 5/2/2012 (mb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Of Cincinnati v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Cincinnati
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Paula Boggs Muething
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank, AG
Represented By: Kendall Verrett Shaw
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Kendall Verrett Shaw
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Kendall Verrett Shaw
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company
Represented By: Kendall Verrett Shaw
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee
Represented By: James Eugene Burke
Represented By: Peter Dennin
Represented By: David Dunn
Represented By: Jordan Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: James Eugene Burke
Represented By: Peter Dennin
Represented By: David Dunn
Represented By: Jordan Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer of Hamilton County, Ohio
Represented By: Lawrence C Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?