Troche v. Morgan
Plaintiff: Shannon Earl Troche
Defendant: Donald Morgan
Case Number: 1:2012cv00176
Filed: March 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: MAHONING
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Presiding Judge: S Arthur Spiegel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/30/2017. (art)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER following 85 Informal Discovery Conference held on 1/24/2017. The parties are Ordered to file a proposed protective order by Fri., 1/27/2017. The parties are Ordered to file a joint proposed revised scheduling order by Mon., 1/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/25/2017. (art)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECISION AND ENTRY: (1) ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. 55 ); (2) GRANTING DEFENDANT MICHAEL CRABTREE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 45 ); AND (3) TERMINATING THIS CASE IN THIS COURT. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/10/2015. (mr1)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant Crabtree's 45 First MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted and this case be dismissed on the docket of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/12/2015. (art)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that plaintiff's 38 response to the 8/21/2013 32 order to show cause is well-taken and the Court finds that Leaman does not require dismissal of plaintiff's federal claims. Consequently, defendant's 43 Motion to Stay the Court's calendar order is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/28/2014. (art)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 Report and Recommendation, granting 24 Defendant Donald Morgan's Motion to Dismiss. The federal constitutional claims alleged against Defendant Morgan pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 are DI SMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the state tort claim of assault and battery is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff Troche's claims against Defendant Crabtree are not the subject of the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, and thus they remain. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 3/4/2014. (km1)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant Morgan's 24 MOTION TO DISMISS be Granted and that plaintiff's Sec. 1983 claims against defendant Morgan be Dismissed with prejudice and that his state law claims against defendant Morgan be Dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/21/2013. (art)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 Report and Recommendation, denying as moot 11 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendant is free to re-file the motion or any other motion attacking Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 3/21/2013. (km1)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that plaintiff's 16 MOTION to Amend his complaint is Granted. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant's 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings be Denied as Moot. ( Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/12/2013. (art)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troche v. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Earl Troche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?