Henson v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Derryck Henson
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2012cv00602
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 41 Report and Recommendation denying certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/18/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY - It is respectfully recommended that Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 9/19/2017. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 37 Report and Recommendation denying 36 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/21/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 30 Report and Recommendation denying 29 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/20/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Amend Original Habeas Corpus Petition (ECF No. 29) is untimely and should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 11/3/2016. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 20 Report and Recommendation; declining to adopt 23 Report and Recommendation; a certificate of appealability shall issue on a limited question of whether Petitioner is entitled to equitable tolling of the ADEPA one-year statute of limitations. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/23/14. (ba1)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY - Because Henson filed no objections at all to the Merits Report, he is not entitled to appeal any issue included in that report and adopted by Judge Barrett without o bjection. Accordingly, the prior Report and Recommendations recommending that a certificate of appealability on the equitable tolling claim be issued is WITHDRAWN and the Magistrate Judge now recommends that Henson be denied a certificate of appealabity because he has waived his right to appeal any issue dealt with in the Merits Report. Objections to R&R due by 1/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 12/27/2013. (kpf1)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY - It is respectfully recommended that the Court issue a certificate of appealability limited to the question whether Henson is entitled to equitable tolling of the AEDPA one-year statute of limitations. Objections to R&R due by 12/9/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 11/21/2013. (kpf1)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 11 Report and Recommendation dismissing 1 Petition. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/29/13. (ba1)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition should be dismissed with prejudice. Because the law of equitable tolling remains in development, Petitioner should be granted a certificate of appealability on that issue should he wish to appeal. Objections to R&R due by 10/28/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 10/11/2013. (kpf1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derryck Henson
Represented By: Hal Roger Arenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Represented By: Hilda Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?