Rheinfrank et al v. Abbott Laboratories Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Rheinfrank
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc., Abbvie Inc. and Abbott Laboratories
Case Number: 1:2013cv00144
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: WARREN
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 348 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER denying 259 Motion for Relief from Order Pursuant to Rule 60 Based Upon Fraud, Misrepresentation and Misconduct; denying 259 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 10/2/2015. (jlw)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER Ruling on Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER denying 112 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 113 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 12 defendant's partial Motion to Dismiss. signed by Chief Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rheinfrank et al v. Abbott Laboratories Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Rheinfrank
Represented By: Janet Gilligan Abaray
Represented By: Barry David Jacobson Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?