Wycoff v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Harold Wycoff
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00641
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 30 Report and Recommendation granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/4/17. (ba)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 27 First MOTION for Attorney Fees be Granted and that counsel be Awarded $15,000.00 in fees. Objections to R&R due by 11/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/18/2017. (art)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 24 Report and Recommendation reversing and remanding the decision by the Commissioner. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/30/14. (ba1)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is recommended that the decision of the Commissioner be REVERSED and REMANDED. Objections to R&R due by 12/12/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/25/14. (sct1)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to Magistrate Judges' General Order concerning social security appeals. Plaintiff's statment of errors due to be filed by 3/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/15/2014. (art)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wycoff v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harold Wycoff
Represented By: Mark Robert Naegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?