Johnson v. Apple Inc et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Walker Johnson
Defendant: Apple Inc, Morrison Foerster, Hogan Lovells LLP, Dreitler, True LLC, Timothy S. Black and Michael Newman
Case Number: 1:2014cv00819
Filed: October 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION and ORDER adopting 21 and 27 the Report and Recommendations; denying 19 and 23 Plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/2/15. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 23 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 7/17/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/30/2015. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 19 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/1/2015. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION and ORDER adopting 6 the Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/18/15. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Apple Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Walker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison Foerster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hogan Lovells LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreitler, True LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?