Smith v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Marcellus Smith, Jr.
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2014cv00948
Filed: December 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 48 Report and Recommendation granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/18/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant's 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted. An appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 3/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/28/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation 24 ; dismissing the Warden; dismissing the amended complaint against defendants Peters, Davis, & Payne. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 12/11/15. (mb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying plaintiff's 15 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/26/2015. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying plaintiff's 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; and denying plaintiff's 10 Motion to issue service. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this Order on the Office of the Ohio Attorney General, Corrections Litigati on section. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/25/2015. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. Also, copy mailed as directed to Ohio Attorney General Corrections Litigation secition.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcellus Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?