Roland v. Convergys Customer Management Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Rachel M Roland |
Defendant: |
Convergys Customer Management Group, Inc. and Convergys Corporation |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00325 |
Filed: |
May 16, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan J. Dlott |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Labor Litigation |
Cause of Action: |
05 U.S.C. § 704 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 10, 2017 |
Filing
43
FINAL ORDER: (A) APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT UNDER FRCP 23 AND (B) APPROVING CLASS COUNSEL'S FEES AND EXPENSES. Further Ordered that on the effective date, the settlement shall become binding upon the Parties and the Settlement Class. Class Coun sel is awarded fees of thirty-three and one-third (33 1/3 %) of the gross Settlement Amount of $250,000 after (1) deducting the Class Representative's service award, and (2) reimbursing Class Counsel's out of pocket costs and expe nses, including the cost of administration, which reimbursement is capped at $20,000, to be payable exclusively from the Settlement Amount. Further Ordered that the Class Representative is awarded $7,500 in addition to her pro rata share o f the Settlement, as compensation for her service on behalf of the Settlement Class, to be payable exclusively from the Settlement Amount. Further Ordered that entry of this Order is without prejudice to the relief granted in the Preliminary Order a nd entry of this Order shall not serve to extend or stay any time of filing an appeal regarding any of the relief granted in the Preliminary Order. Further Ordered that this Court shall retain jurisdiction over all matters arising pursuant to or related to the relief granted by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/10/2017. (art)
|
March 8, 2017 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting plaintiff's 40 Motion for Leave to Appear by telephone at the March 9, 2017 (3:00 pm) Fairness Hearing before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/8/2017. (art) Modified on 3/8/2017 to correct date previously listed in docket text (art).
|
October 2, 2015 |
Filing
12
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 10/2/15. (mb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?