Hunter v. Hamilton County et al
Plaintiff: Tracie M. Hunter
Defendant: Hamilton County, Hamilton County Board of Commissioners, John M. Williams, Curt Kissinger, Constance Murdock, Dwayne Bowman, Laura Wickett, Joseph Deters, Hamilton County Public Defender Commission, Norbert Nadel, Beth Meyers, Scott Croswell, Merlyn Shiverdecker, Sylvia Sieve Hendon, Penelope Cunningham, Patrick Dewine, Patrick Dinkelacker, Lee H. Hildebrant, Firooz Namei and James Bogen
Case Number: 1:2015cv00540
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 102 Report and Recommendation denying 98 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/25/17. (ba)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant Bogen's 98 MOTION for Sanctions be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 1/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/3/2017. (art)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING 82 , 84 , 85 , 86 , 87 , and 88 REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Croswell and Shiverdecker is GRANTED (Doc. 37 ); 2. The Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Nadel is GR ANTED (Doc. 39 ); 3. The Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Cunningham, Dewine, Dinkelacker, Hendon and Hildebrant is GRANTED (Doc. 19 ); 4. The Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Myers is GRANTED (Doc. 40 ); 5. The Motions to Dismiss of Defendants Bog en and Namei are GRANTED (Docs. 30 , 36 ); 6. The Motions to Dismiss of the County Defendants for Lack of Prosecution are GRANTED (Docs. 49 , 80 ); 7. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is DENIED (Doc. 73 ); 8. All other pending motions (Docs. 38 , 41 , 42 , 43 , 44 , 45 , 52 , 81 , 83 ) are DENIED as moot; and 9. This matter is TERMINATED from the docket of the Court. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/15/16. (eh)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the motions to dismiss of defendants Bogen 30 and Namei 36 be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 5/27/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/10/2016. (art)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants Judges of the First District Court of Appeals of Ohio's 19 MOTION to Dismiss be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 5/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/28/2016. (art)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 37 MOTION to Dismiss of defendants Croswell and Shiverdecker be Granted as they are entitled to absolute immunity for the actions alleged by plaintiff in her complaint. Objections to R&R due by 5/13/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/26/2016. (art)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Hamilton County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie M. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Williams
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Kissinger
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Murdock
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Bowman
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Wickett
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Deters
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Public Defender Commission
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norbert Nadel
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Meyers
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Croswell
Represented By: Karl Herbert Schneider
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlyn Shiverdecker
Represented By: Karl Herbert Schneider
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Sieve Hendon
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Brodi J. Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penelope Cunningham
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Brodi J. Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dewine
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Brodi J. Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dinkelacker
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Brodi J. Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee H. Hildebrant
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Brodi J. Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firooz Namei
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bogen
Represented By: Pamela J Sears
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?