Alford v. Mohr et al
Plaintiff: Brian K. Alford
Defendant: Gary Mohr, Ernie Moore, J. Schweitzer, Dan Hudson, M. Westall, Rick Malott, Officer Walder, Officer Gay, Officer Whitlow, Mona Parks, George D. Crutchfield, Cynthia Hill, Lt. Nelson, Dr. Eddy, Timothy Heyd, Dr. Carlson, Brenda Tilton, Amy McIntosh, Norm Evans, R. Wingate, F. Epperson, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction and Jane/John Does
Case Number: 1:2015cv00645
Filed: October 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: WARREN
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Entry and Order Overruling 152 Objections and Adopting 149 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 04/13/2020. (kaf)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant Malott's 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted, and that this case be Closed on the docket of the Court. Any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/12/2020. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER adopting 99 Report and Recommendations: Accordingly, plaintiff's 43 MOTION to supplement the complaint be Denied; plaintiff's 48 MOTION for leave to supplement the second amended complaint be Denied; plaintiff's 67 MOTION for service on Gary Mohr and for preliminary injunction be Denied; and that plaintiff's complaint against defendants Dr. Carlson, Mona Parks, Brenda Tilton, M. Westall, R. Wingate, and George D. Crutchfield be Dismissed without prejudice for failure of service. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/12/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER that plaintiff's 95 Motion for Extension of Time to serve defendants Dr. Carlson, Mona Parks, Brenda Tilton, M. Westall, and George D. Crutchfield is Denied. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 101 MOTION for Recusal of District Judge Susan J. Dlott be Denied; plaintiff's 104 third MOTION for leave to supplement the second amended complaint be Denied; and defendants' 56 MOTION TO DISMISS the complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM be Denied as to pla intiff's 8th amendment claim against defendant Malott and Granted as to plaintiff's claim brought against all other defendants. ( Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/1/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 43 MOTION to supplement the complaint be Denied; plaintiff's 48 MOTION for leave to supplement the second amended complaint be Denied; plaintiff's 67 MOTION for service on Gary Mohr and for preliminary injunction be Denied; and that plaintiff's complaint against defendants Dr. Carlson, Mona Parks, Brenda Tilton, M. Westall, R. Wingate, and George D. Crutchfield be Dismissed without prejudice for failure of service. It is Ordered that plaintiff's 74 MOTION for documentation be Denied; plaintiff's 75 MOTION for an extension of time to file an opposing memorandum and reply memoranda is Denied as moot; plaintiff's 90 MOTION to strike the Order granti ng him leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is Denied; plaintiff's 91 & 98 MOTIONS to strike defendants' memoranda are Denied; plaintiff's 48 & 67 MOTION for appointment of counsel are Denied. This case is Stayed pendi ng further order of the Court. No party shall file any document without a showing of good cause and the Court's prior approval, with the exception of objections and responses to this Order and Report and Recommendation. No discovery shall be c onducted during the stay. The Court will establish a trial calendar after the pending motion to dismiss is resolved, if necessary. No request for reconsideration of this Order entering a stay will be entertained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/3/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying plaintiff's 52 Motion for copies, and denying as moot 66 & 68 plaintiff's motions for extension of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/9/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADOPTING 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 8/18/17. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Gary Mohr and Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction (ODRC) are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(1). Plaintiff's official capacity claims against all defendants are also DISMISSED to the extent that plaintiff seeks money damages. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/6/17. In accordance with the decision of the Sixth Circuit, plaintiff's 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED. The 20 Report and Recommendation issued 3/2/2016 is WITHDRAWN. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification and to the Cashier, London Corr. Inst.)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the full $400 fee ($350 filing fee plus $50 administrative fee) required to commence this action within thirty (30) days of this Order. Failure to pay the ful l $400 fee within this time frame will result in the dismissal of his action.. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 01/22/2016. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT:Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 3) be DENIED. Plaintiff be ordered to pay the full $400 fee ($350 f iling fee plus $50 administrative fee) required to commence this action within thirty (30) days, and that plaintiff be notified that his failure to pay the full $400 fee within thirty days will result in the dismissal of his action. See In re Alea, 286 F.3d 378, 382 (6th Cir. 2002). Objections to R&R due by 12/7/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/19/2015. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alford v. Mohr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Westall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Malott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Walder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Whitlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mona Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George D. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Heyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norm Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Wingate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Epperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?