Barfield v. Erdos et al
Plaintiff: |
Edward Barfield |
Defendant: |
Ron Erdos, William Kool, Larry Greene, Walter Sammons, Luke Vansickle, Cynthia Davis, Capt. Bell, Capt. Howard, Lt. Bowee, Sgt. Felts, Sgt. Bare and C.O. Patrick |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00696 |
Filed: |
October 26, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
SCIOTO |
Presiding Judge: |
Sandra S Beckwith |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen L. Litkovitz |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 22, 2017 |
Filing
74
DECISION AND ENTRY: (1) ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 70 ); (2) OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS (Doc. 72 ); and (3) TERMINATING THIS CASE FROM THE DOCKET. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/22/17. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 6, 2017 |
Filing
70
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants' 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted and that plaintiff's claims be Dismissed without prejudice for failure to properly exhaust his administrative remedies. In the alternative, if the Co urt declines to adopt the recommendation as to exhaustion, it is recommended that defendants' motion for summary judgment be Granted as to plaintiff's excessive force claim but Denied as to plaintiff's conditions of confinement claim. Objections to R&R due by 2/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/6/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
November 8, 2016 |
Filing
65
ORDER denying [49 & 53] Plaintiff's fifth & sixth motion to amend complaint; adopting Report and Recommendation 55 ; overruling 57 plaintiff's objections. Signed by Judge Sandra S. Beckwith on 11/8/16. (mb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing
55
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 49 and 53 MOTIONS for leave to amend his complaint should be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/22/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 16, 2016 |
Filing
51
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's fourth 46 MOTION to Amend his complaint should be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 9/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/16/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing
48
ORDER & REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's third 43 MOTION for leave to amend the complaint be Denied. Further, it is ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file a motion for summary judgment and motion to compel discovery are Denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/28/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing
40
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation 14 ; Plaintiff's objections to the R&R are overruled. Plaintiff's claims of excessive force against defendants Vansickle and Patrick, and his conditions of confinement claim against defendants Felt s, Bell, Kool, Howard, Mahlman, and Sammons will proceed. The balance of Plaintiff's claims alleged in his complaint and first amended complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is denied. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 3/23/16. (mb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 12, 2016 |
Filing
26
ORDER denying plaintiff's 20 and 21 Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/12/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?