Hosea Project Movers, LLC et al v. Waterfront Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hosea Project Movers, LLC and Hosea Demolition Movers, LLC
Defendant: Waterfront Associates, Inc. and C&B Marine, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00799
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 95 Report and Recommendation granting 91 Motion to Dismiss on the basis the Court lacks jurisdiction. This matter is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/31/19. (ba)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Waterfront Associates Inc's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction 91 be GRANTED and that this case be dismissed without prejudice. Only in the alternative, should the pres iding district judge determine that the Court has discretion, and further exercise that discretion to retain supplemental jurisdiction over the breach of contract claim, does the undersigned recommend that Waterfront's renewed motion for summary judgment be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/24/2018. (km)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 72 Defendant Waterfront Associates, Inc's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Waterfront shall promptly file its overdue response to U.S. Fire's motion for summary judgment, not later than 12/28/2017. Waterfront is forewarned that this deadline will not be further extended. U.S. Fire may, in its discretion, file a supplemental reply memorandum in support of its motion for summary judgment, on or before 1/12/2018. Pursuant to the parties' amended Rule 26(f) report concerning expert discovery, the parties shall identify experts and general topics to be addressed by 12/15/2017, produce expert reports by 1/17/2018, and disclose rebuttal experts (including their reports) by 3/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/19/2017. (km)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 61 Defendant Waterfront Associate Inc's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/18/2017. (km)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 43 Report and Recommendation granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 17 Motion to Dismiss; denying 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/2/17. (ba)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by C&B Marine, LLC, 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Waterfront Associates, Inc., 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Waterfront A ssociates, Inc. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Waterfront's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of subject matter jurisdiction 18 be DENIED; that C&B Marine's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 17 be GRANTED; and that Waterfront Associates' Motion for Summary Judgment 32 be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, consistent with this Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 7/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/14/2017. (km)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPINION AND ORDER granting Third Party Defendant C&B Marine, LLC's Motion to Consolidate Cases (doc. 61 in case no. 1:15-cv-00046). The Clerk shall consolidate Case No. 1:15-cv-46 into the later filed case, Case No. 1:15-cv-799, with all further documents to be filed in Case No. 1:15-cv-799. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/19/2017. (km)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hosea Project Movers, LLC et al v. Waterfront Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hosea Project Movers, LLC
Represented By: Louis Howard Katz
Represented By: Scott Howard Kravetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hosea Demolition Movers, LLC
Represented By: Louis Howard Katz
Represented By: Scott Howard Kravetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfront Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&B Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?