Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. Ohio Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Defendant: Ohio Department of Transportation, Ohio Department of Budget and Management, Internal Revenue Service and Cosmos Industrial Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00284
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADOPTING 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full but for the minor clarifications set forth in this Order at p. 3. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 43) is GRANTED. Defendant's motion for summary judgment 45 is DENIED. The funds previously deposited with this Court pursuant to Local Rule 77.2 (see Doc. 42) shall be releasedin their entirety to Plaintiff, subject to the handling fees outlined in Local Rule 77.2(c). This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/30/18. (sct)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, 45 Defendant Internal Revenue Service's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT F&Ds motion for summary judgment 43 be GRANTED, and that the cross-motion of the IRS for summary judgment 45 be DENIED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED THAT if this R&R is adopted by the Court, the Funds on deposit with this Court shall be released in their entirety to F&D, and this case should be closed. Objections to R&R due by 12/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/22/2017. (km)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : Accordingly, the motion of defendants Ohio Department of Transportation and Ohio Office of Budget and Management to Deposit Fund (Doc. 25) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Ohio defendants are permitted to deposit $589,049.49 into the Registry of this Court under Local Rul 77.2 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67(a) and are simultaneously dismissed from this litigation. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 5/25/2017. (jlw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. Ohio Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: David Conrad Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Budget and Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmos Industrial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?